CNA Insurance Company v. The Coca-Cola Company
Plaintiff: CNA Insurance Company
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv02075
Filed: April 27, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 21, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/9/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from August 5, 2011 to September 9, 2011. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than September 2, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 15, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT BCI COCA-COLA BOTTLING COMPANY TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 5, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION THAT BCI COCA-COLA BOTTLING COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED AND CONSOLIDATED SHOULD BE GRANTED. The following cases are related and consolidated: Farmers Ins. Exchange v. Coca-Cola Co., CV 11-2042; Farmers Ins. Exchange v. Coca-Cola, CV 11-2424; CNA Ins. Co. v. Coca-Cola Cola, CV 11-2075; Alemu v. Coca-Cola Co., CV 11-2323. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 23, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CNA Insurance Company v. The Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNA Insurance Company
Represented By: David Dewart Brisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Represented By: Matthew Alan Hickey
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?