Marsh v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Naomi Fawn Marsh
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2011cv02096
Filed: April 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order Denying Motion for Attorney's Fees by Judge Charles R. Breyer (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015).
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order Remanding to the ALJ with Instructions by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/9/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Reset Deadlines as to 41 MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act. Responses due by 8/27/2015. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/20/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 29 Motion to Alter Judgment. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/7/2012. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER for a second extension of time - until 2/27/2012 - to file motion, memmorandum in support of cross-motion and in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/30/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for extension re 19 Stipulation, filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Remand (with alternative proposed orders). Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/27/2012. Responses to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due by 1/27/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/4/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marsh v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Fawn Marsh
Represented By: James Hunt Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?