Orosa v. Therakos, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charo Orosa
Defendant: Therakos, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02143
Filed: April 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER SETTING LIMITED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE re 71 Statement filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Charo Orosa, Therakos, Inc. Motion for leave to amend complaint due by 4/24/2013. Responses due by 5/8/2013. Replies due by 5/15/2013. Fur ther Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL, AS TO DISPOSITIVE MOTION AND STATUS CONFERENCE DEADLINES filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Therakos, Inc. Dispositive Motions due by 3/14 /2013. Status Report due by 4/11/2013. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Status Conference set for 4/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Therakos, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 MODIFYING FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER, AS TO DISCOVERY CUTOFF DATE AND OTHER DIRECTLY RELATED DATES filed by Charo Orosa. Discovery due by 1/14/2013. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orosa v. Therakos, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charo Orosa
Represented By: Michael Timothy Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Therakos, Inc.
Represented By: L. Julius M. Turman
Represented By: Megan Barry Borovicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Barry Borovicka
Represented By: L. Julius M. Turman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?