Positive Technologies Inc. v. Sony Electronics Inc et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Positive Technologies Inc.
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc, Hewlett-Packard Company, ACER America Corporation, Gateway Inc., Dell Inc., Asus Computer International, Lenovo (United States) Inc., MSI Computer Corporation, Amazon.com Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc., Viewsonic Corporation and Kobo Inc.
Intervenor: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02226
Filed: May 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time to File Parties proposed docket control and discovery orders from April 11, 2011 and to extend the Parties deadlines to comply with Local Patent Rules 3-1 through 3-4, concludes that this Motion should be GRANTED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/12/11. (ehs, )
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 132 Motion to Transfer. ORDERED that this case be transferred to the Northern District of California. All pending dates in this action are set aside. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/12/2011. (ch, )
April 11, 2011 Filing 136 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery and Docket Control Orders and Time for Compliance with P.R. 3-1 through 3-4 by Acer America Corporation, Amazon.com Inc., Asus Computer International, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd., Dell Inc., Gateway Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Kobo Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., MSI Computer Corporation, Positive Technologies Inc., Sony Electronics Inc, ViewSonic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Shannon)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Order. Deadline is extended to 4/11/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/11/2011. (ch, )
April 5, 2011 Filing 134 RESPONSE to Motion re 132 Opposed MOTION To Transfer and (Consent) to Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by Positive Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Denko, John)
April 4, 2011 Filing 133 NOTICE by Positive Technologies Inc. re 131 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders (Bunt, Robert)
April 1, 2011 Filing 132 Opposed MOTION To Transfer by Acer America Corporation, Amazon.com Inc., Asus Computer International, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd., Dell Inc., Gateway Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., MSI Computer Corporation, Sony Electronics Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-L)(Emerson, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
April 1, 2011 Filing 131 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Positive Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
March 3, 2011 Filing 130 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven S Baik (Baik, Steven)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 127 Motion for Extension of Time to File Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Deadlines are extended to 4/1/2011, and to extend (a) the deadline to comply with Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2to 5/16/2011, and (b) the deadline to comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 to 9/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/2/2011. (ch, )
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER - granting 126 Stipulation of Dismissal. Dft Apple Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. All parties shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/28/2011. (ch, )
February 28, 2011 Filing 127 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders and Deadlines by Positive Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
February 22, 2011 Filing 126 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Apple Inc, Positive Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
February 16, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 2/16/11. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of todays date. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
February 16, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 2/16/11. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of todays date. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (delat, )
February 15, 2011 Filing 125 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darrell Glyn Dotson on behalf of Asus Computer International (Dotson, Darrell)
February 15, 2011 Filing 124 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Joseph Nelson on behalf of Asus Computer International (Nelson, Kyle)
February 15, 2011 Filing 123 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Rochelle Coleman on behalf of Apple Inc (Coleman, Debra)
February 14, 2011 Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Augustine Phillips on behalf of Amazon.com Inc. (Phillips, Lawrence)
February 11, 2011 Filing 121 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Sony Electronics Inc (Dacus, Shannon)
February 11, 2011 Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Dell Inc. (Dacus, Shannon)
February 9, 2011 Filing 119 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher K Hu for Barnes & Noble, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-287)(ehs, )
February 9, 2011 Filing 118 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua P Jaffe for Barnes & Noble, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-287) (ehs, )
February 8, 2011 Filing 117 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Amazon.com Inc. (Siebman, Clyde)
February 8, 2011 Filing 116 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Craft, Roger)
February 8, 2011 Filing 115 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Findlay, Eric)
February 7, 2011 Filing 114 ANSWER to 111 Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd..(Tiller, Donald)
January 21, 2011 Filing 113 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan Lindsey for Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-233) (ehs, )
January 20, 2011 Filing 112 Status Conference set for 2/16/2011 10:45 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Honorable Chad Everingham. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on March 2, 2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/20/2011. (ch, )
January 20, 2011 Filing 111 Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd., filed by Positive Technologies Inc..(Bunt, Robert)
January 10, 2011 Filing 110 Positive Technologies, Inc.'s ANSWER to 102 Intervenor Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. by Positive Technologies Inc..(Bunt, Robert)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael E Jones terminated ascounsel for Barnes & Noble Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/6/11. (ehs, )
January 6, 2011 Filing 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Michael Woods on behalf of Dell Inc. (Woods, James)
January 6, 2011 Filing 107 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M Dunham on behalf of Dell Inc. (Dunham, Thomas)
January 5, 2011 Filing 106 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thompson Gorham on behalf of Positive Technologies Inc. (Gorham, Andrew)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 103 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney John Scott Denko,Bradley Dalton Coburn,Steven Joel Lauff,R James George, Jr for Positive Technologies Inc. and attorney Diamond McCarty is terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/4/2011. (ch, )
December 31, 2010 Filing 104 ANSWER to 95 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Kobo Inc. by Positive Technologies Inc..(Fulton, Jason)
December 30, 2010 Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Counsel of Record by Positive Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
December 17, 2010 Filing 102 COMPLAINT in Intervention, filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd..(ch, )
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 96 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/17/2010. (ch, )
December 16, 2010 Filing 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald E Tiller on behalf of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. (Tiller, Donald)
December 14, 2010 Filing 99 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Karen I Boyd for Asus Computer International. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-173 (ch, )
December 14, 2010 Filing 98 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua M Masur for Asus Computer International. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-173(ch, )
December 14, 2010 Filing 97 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. (Emerson, John)
December 14, 2010 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Emerson, John)
December 7, 2010 Filing 95 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Positive Technologies Inc. by Kobo Inc..(Haslam, Robert)
December 7, 2010 Filing 94 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kobo Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
December 6, 2010 Filing 93 ANSWER to 84 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Hewlett-Packard Company by Positive Technologies Inc..(Fulton, Jason)
December 6, 2010 Filing 92 ANSWER to 86 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Dell, Inc. by Positive Technologies Inc..(Fulton, Jason)
December 6, 2010 Filing 91 ANSWER to 82 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Sony Electronics, Inc. by Positive Technologies Inc..(Fulton, Jason)
December 6, 2010 Filing 90 ANSWER to 76 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Apple, Inc. by Positive Technologies Inc..(Fulton, Jason)
December 1, 2010 Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
November 30, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kobo Inc. to 12/10/2010. 33 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 29, 2010 Filing 88 Defendant's Unopposed first Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kobo Inc..( Haslam, Robert)
November 17, 2010 Filing 87 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gerald T Sekimura for Apple Inc,Gerald T Sekimura for Apple Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-128) (ehs, )
November 12, 2010 Filing 86 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Positive Technologies Inc. by Dell Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
November 12, 2010 Filing 85 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hewlett-Packard Company (Daniels, Steven)
November 12, 2010 Filing 84 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Positive Technologies Inc. by Hewlett-Packard Company.(Daniels, Steven)
November 12, 2010 Filing 83 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Electronics Inc (Dacus, Deron)
November 12, 2010 Filing 82 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Positive Technologies Inc. by Sony Electronics Inc.(Dacus, Deron)
November 12, 2010 Filing 81 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Asus Computer International identifying Corporate Parent ASUSTeK Computer, Inc. for Asus Computer International. (Stevens, Scott)
November 12, 2010 Filing 80 Asus Computer International's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Asus Computer International.(Stevens, Scott)
November 12, 2010 Filing 79 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark D Fowler for Apple Inc,Mark D Fowler for Apple Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-112) (ehs, )
November 12, 2010 Filing 78 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christine K Corbett for Apple Inc,Christine K Corbett for Apple Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-112) (ehs, )
November 11, 2010 Filing 77 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc (Albritton, Eric)
November 11, 2010 Filing 76 DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S ANSWER to 1 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Positive Technologies Inc. by Apple Inc.(Albritton, Eric)
November 8, 2010 Filing 75 ANSWER to 60 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Amazon.com, Inc. by Positive Technologies Inc..(Bunt, Robert)
November 4, 2010 Filing 74 ANSWER to 49 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of MSI Computer Corporation by Positive Technologies Inc..(Bunt, Robert)
November 4, 2010 Filing 73 ANSWER to 51 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of ViewSonic Corporation by Positive Technologies Inc..(Bunt, Robert)
November 3, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN WRONG CASE PER ATTORNEY Document # 71, Application to Appear PHV. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 2, 2010 Filing 72 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James M Glass for Sony Electronics Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-93) (ehs, )
November 2, 2010 Filing 71 ***FILED IN WRONG CASE. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anna M Ison for MSI Computer Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-92) (ehs, ) Modified on 11/3/2010 (ch, ).
November 1, 2010 Filing 70 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. Kobo Inc. served on 10/14/2010 through The Corporation Trust Co, Registered Agent, answer due 11/4/2010. (ehs, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 69 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Nelson for Sony Electronics Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-83) (ehs, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 68 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin P.B. Johnson for Sony Electronics Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-83) (ehs, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 67 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anna M Ison for Sony Electronics Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-83) (ehs, )
October 27, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hewlett-Packard Company to 11/12/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 66 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hewlett-Packard Company.(Daniels, Steven)
October 27, 2010 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Acer America Corporation, Gateway Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Acer Inc. for Acer America Corporation, Gateway Inc.. (Lin, James)
October 27, 2010 Filing 64 Defendants Acer America Corp.'s and Gateway, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Acer America Corporation, Gateway Inc..(Lin, James)
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Asus Computer International to 11/12/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 63 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Asus Computer International.( Stevens, Scott)
October 25, 2010 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of Asus Computer International (Stevens, Scott)
October 20, 2010 Filing 61 ANSWER to 34 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Barnes & Noble by Positive Technologies Inc..(Bunt, Robert)
October 14, 2010 Filing 60 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Positive Technologies Inc. by Amazon.com Inc..(Joncus, Stephen)
October 13, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sony Electronics Inc to 11/12/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 13, 2010 Filing 59 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sony Electronics Inc.( Dacus, Deron)
October 12, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
October 12, 2010 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ya-Chiao Chang on behalf of ViewSonic Corporation (Chang, Ya-Chiao)
October 12, 2010 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ya-Chiao Chang on behalf of MSI Computer Corporation (Chang, Ya-Chiao)
October 12, 2010 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Guoping Da on behalf of ViewSonic Corporation (Da, Guoping)
October 12, 2010 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Guoping Da on behalf of MSI Computer Corporation (Da, Guoping)
October 11, 2010 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Christopher Howland on behalf of ViewSonic Corporation (Howland, Mark)
October 11, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Christopher Howland on behalf of MSI Computer Corporation (Howland, Mark)
October 11, 2010 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ViewSonic Corporation (Chang, Ya-Chiao)
October 11, 2010 Filing 51 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Positive Technologies Inc. by ViewSonic Corporation.(Chang, Ya-Chiao)
October 11, 2010 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MSI Computer Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Micro-Star International Co., Ltd. for MSI Computer Corporation. (Chang, Ya-Chiao)
October 11, 2010 Filing 49 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Positive Technologies Inc. by MSI Computer Corporation.(Chang, Ya-Chiao)
October 8, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc to 11/11/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 48 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Albritton, Eric)
October 8, 2010 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Apple Inc (Albritton, Eric)
October 8, 2010 Filing 46 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. Sony Electronics Inc personally served on 9/22/2010 on Registered Agent Sue Vertrees, answer due 10/13/2010. (ehs, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 45 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. Hewlett-Packard Company personally served on 9/22/2010 Registered Agent CT Corporation on Brock Bassett, answer due 10/13/2010. (ehs, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 44 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. Dell Inc.personally served on 9/22/2010Registered Agent Corporation Service on Sue Vertrees authorized Agent to accept process service, answer due 11/12/2010. (ehs, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 43 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. Asus Computer Internationalpersonally served on 9/22/2010 on Registered Agent Kathrin Esposito, answer due 10/13/2010. (ehs, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 42 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. Apple Inc personally served on 9/22/2010 Registered Agent Brock Bassett, answer due 10/13/2010. (ehs, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 41 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. Acer America Corporation personally served on 9/22/2010 Registered Agent Brock Bassett, answer due 10/27/2010. (ehs, )
October 4, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Dell Inc. to 11/12/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 4, 2010 Filing 38 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dell Inc..( Dacus, Deron)
October 1, 2010 Filing 40 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Russell B Hill for Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (ch, )
October 1, 2010 Filing 39 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark L Blake for Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (ch, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. for Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
September 28, 2010 Filing 36 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Lenovo (United States) Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
September 27, 2010 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Barnes & Noble, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Barnes & Noble, Inc.. (Smith, Michael)
September 27, 2010 Filing 34 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Positive Technologies Inc. by Barnes & Noble, Inc..(Smith, Michael)
September 27, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Gateway Inc. to 10/27/2010; Acer America Corporation to 10/27/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 27, 2010 Filing 33 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Acer America Corporation, Gateway Inc..( Lin, James)
September 24, 2010 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E. Jones and the Potter Minton PC law firm by Barnes & Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 23, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com Inc. to 10/14/2010. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 23, 2010 Filing 31 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com Inc..( Joncus, Stephen)
September 14, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ViewSonic Corporation to 10/11/2010. 26 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 14, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MSI Computer Corporation to 10/11/2010. 26 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 14, 2010 Filing 30 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ViewSonic Corporation.( Chang, Ya-Chiao)
September 14, 2010 Filing 29 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MSI Computer Corporation.( Chang, Ya-Chiao)
September 1, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leonard A Hirsch on behalf of Positive Technologies Inc. (Hirsch, Leonard)
September 1, 2010 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
September 1, 2010 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Paul Fulton on behalf of Positive Technologies Inc. (Fulton, Jason)
September 1, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Lenovo (United States) Inc. to 9/28/2010. 31 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 1, 2010 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lenovo (United States) Inc.(Craft, Roger).
August 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ViewSonic Corporation to 9/15/2010. 19 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MSI Computer Corporation to 9/15/2010. 19 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 25, 2010 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ViewSonic Corporation.( Chang, Ya-Chiao)
August 25, 2010 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MSI Computer Corporation.( Chang, Ya-Chiao)
August 23, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ting on behalf of Acer America Corporation, Gateway Inc. (Ting, Michael)
August 23, 2010 Filing 21 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. ViewSonic Corporation served on 8/6/2010 on Registered Agent CT Corporation, answer due 8/27/2010. (ehs, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. MSI Computer Corporation served on 8/6/2010 by leaving copies with Carol Nguyen, person in charge, answer due 8/27/2010. (ehs, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. Lenovo (United States) Inc. served on 8/6/2010 Registered Agent CT Corporation, answer due 8/27/2010. (ehs, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. Gateway Inc. served on 8/6/2010 Registered Agent Corporation Trust Co, answer due 9/27/2010. (ehs, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. Barnes & Noble, Inc. served on 8/5/2010 on Registered Agent, Capitol Corporate Service Inc, answer due 9/27/2010. (ehs, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Positive Technologies Inc.. Amazon.com Inc. served on 8/9/2010 by serving Caroline Little, Customer Service Associate designated by law to accept service of process, answer due 9/29/2010. (ehs, )
August 20, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Gateway Inc. to 9/27/2010; Acer America Corporation to 9/27/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 19, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven S Baik on behalf of Acer America Corporation, Gateway Inc. (Baik, Steven)
August 19, 2010 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Acer America Corporation, Gateway Inc..( Lin, James)
August 19, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James H Lin on behalf of Acer America Corporation, Gateway Inc. (Lin, James)
August 19, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com Inc. to 9/29/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 18, 2010 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com Inc..( Joncus, Stephen)
August 16, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Barnes & Noble, Inc. to 9/27/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 16, 2010 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Barnes & Noble, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
July 29, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter Skip James Scott, Jr on behalf of Positive Technologies Inc. (Scott, Walter Skip)
July 27, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Positive Technologies Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 27, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of Positive Technologies Inc. (Parker, Robert)
July 22, 2010 NOTICE from clerk - modified the docket text on #2 to show Patent AO-120, instead of Copyright AO-121 (ch, )
July 22, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George T Scott on behalf of Positive Technologies Inc. (Scott, George)
July 22, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Sean Tautfest on behalf of Positive Technologies Inc. (Tautfest, Eric)
July 22, 2010 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Acer America Corporation, Amazon.com Inc., Apple Inc, Asus Computer International, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Dell Inc., Gateway Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Kobo Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., MSI Computer Corporation, Sony Electronics Inc, ViewSonic Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Acer America Corp, # 2 Amazon.com Inc, # 3 Apple Inc, # 4 Barnes & Noble Inc, # 5 Dell Inc, # 6 Gateway Inc, # 7 Hewlett-Packard Co, # 8 KOBO Inc, # 9 Lenovo (United States) Inc, # 10 MSI Computer Corp, # 11 Sony Electronic Inc, # 12 Viewsonic Corp)(ehs, )
July 22, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/22/2010. (ch, )
July 22, 2010 Case assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
July 22, 2010 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Positive Technologies Inc. (Bunt, Robert)
July 22, 2010 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Register of Patent. (Bunt, Robert) Modified on 7/22/2010 (ch, ).
July 22, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acer America Corporation, Amazon.com Inc., Apple Inc, Asus Computer International, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Dell Inc., Gateway Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Kobo Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., MSI Computer Corporation, Sony Electronics Inc, ViewSonic Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2585433.), filed by Positive Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Bunt, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Positive Technologies Inc. v. Sony Electronics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Positive Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Perry Reed Clark
Represented By: Bradley Dalton Coburn
Represented By: John Scott Denko
Represented By: R James George, Jr
Represented By: Steven Joel Lauff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: James M Glass
Represented By: Anna Maria Ison
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: David A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Steven Robert Daniels
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACER America Corporation
Represented By: Steven S. Baik, Esq.
Represented By: James H Lin
Represented By: Michael Ting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Inc.
Represented By: Steven S. Baik, Esq.
Represented By: James H Lin
Represented By: Michael Ting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Thomas M. Dunham
Represented By: Stephanie Renee Wood
Represented By: James Michael Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asus Computer International
Represented By: Karen I Boyd
Represented By: Darrell Glyn Dotson
Represented By: Joshua M Masur
Represented By: Kyle Joseph Nelson
Represented By: Scott English Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Represented By: Mark L. Blake
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Russell B. Hill
Represented By: Ryan Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSI Computer Corporation
Represented By: William James Brown, Jr
Represented By: Ya-Chiao Chang
Represented By: Guoping Da
Represented By: Mark Christopher Howland
Represented By: Matthew Keenan Wegner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J Joncus
Represented By: Lawrence Augustine Phillips
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Represented By: Krista Marie Carter
Represented By: Christopher K Hu
Represented By: Joshua P Jaffe
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viewsonic Corporation
Represented By: Ya-Chiao Chang
Represented By: Guoping Da
Represented By: Mark Christopher Howland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kobo Inc.
Represented By: Robert Thomas Haslam, III
Represented By: Bhanu K Sadasivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.
Represented By: Travis E. DeArman
Represented By: John Russell Emerson
Represented By: Jason Michael Gonder
Represented By: Steven Mark Levitan
Represented By: Donald E Tiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?