Kashannejad v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Petitioner: Jamshid S. Kashannejad
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Rosemary L. Melville, Alejandro Mayorkas, Janet Napolitano and Eric H. Holder
Case Number: 3:2011cv02228
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER re 198 , 199 , 200 , 201 re Parties' Status Reports. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER re 196 Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance and Request for Clarification and Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER re 191 Defendant's Status Report. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/13/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Re 189 Plaintiff's Status Report. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER re 184 , 185 , 186 Status Reports. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/26/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER denying 182 Plaintiff's Request to Stop Defendants from Issuing and Lodging the Detainer Against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/2/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Denying 180 Plaintiff's "General Challenge to the Regulation 245a.2(u)(2)(ii) on Behalf of All LTR Holders in Similar Situation[s]." Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 173 Plaintiff's Request for Clarification. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Re Status Reports 169 170 171 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/30/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Re 166 Defendants' Filing of November 6, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/6/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER re 164 Plaintiff's Filing of November 2, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/5/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Striking 162 Plaintiff's Filing of October 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER re 155 , 156 , 157 , 158 , 159 , 160 Parties' Filings from October 8 to 11, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/12/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Re 152 153 Plaintiff's Filings of October 2 and 4, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/4/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Re 149 Plaintiff's Filing of September 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/2/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER re 144 , 145 , 146 , 147 Parties' Filings of September 21, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/24/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re 133 , 134 , 135 Plaintiff's Filing of August 15, 2012 and Related Filings. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/28/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Granting 129 Plaintiff's Request for Sample of New Transportation Letter. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/9/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Re Contents of Transportation Letter 121 126 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/8/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Re July 31, 2012 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Denying 108 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider and Other Requests for Relief. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/3/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER re Supplemental Brief from Defendants. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/27/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re Plaintiff's Filing of June 24, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/25/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Re 104 Plaintiff's Supplemental Declaration. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/22/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER re Supplemental Declaration from Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/19/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Approving 92 Defendants' Proposed Transportation Letter. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/29/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Re Defendants' Response to 84 Order to Show Cause and Plaintiff's Request for Clarification and Guidance. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/18/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 , 81 Plaintiff's Request for Clarification; and ORDER to show cause. Mr. Vinet and Defendants shall file a response to the order to show cause within two weeks from the date of this order. Mr. Kashannejad may file a reply within one week thereafter. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying 75 Plaintiff's Request to Revise Order of January 23, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/2/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Plaintiff's Request for Clarification. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/2/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Re 71 Plaintiff's Report of February 29, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/1/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Re 68 Plaintiff's Brief of February 22, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/23/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/23/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re Briefing Schedule on 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for 54 Defendants' Motion for Clarification; and Enlarging Time for Defendants to Comply. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/13/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Re 51 Plaintiff's Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 44 Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Comply with Court's Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 26 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re Briefing Schedule for 27 Plaintiff's Emergency Request for Stay. The Court hereby orders Defendants to file a response to Plaintiffs motion by September 8, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on September 2, 2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kashannejad v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jamshid S. Kashannejad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rosemary L. Melville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric H. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?