Makreas v. First National Bank of Northern California et al
Plaintiff: Nick Makreas
Defendant: T.D. Service Company, Kathy Castor, Randy Brugioni, County of San Mateo, San Mateo County Sheriff's Office, Greg Munks, Stephen Duvall, Hoss, Valencia and First National Bank of Northern California
Case Number: 3:2011cv02234
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND MOTION TO AMEND THE JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 251 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 252 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting in part and denying in part 254 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 260 Motion for Attorney Fees (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 251 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by T.D. Service Company, 254 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kathy Castor, Randy Brugioni, First National Bank of Northern California, 260 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Nick Makreas, 252 MOTION to Amend/Correct Judgment filed by Kathy Castor, Randy Brugioni, First National Bank of Northern California. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER CLARIFYING CIVIL MINUTES ISSUED ON DECEMBER 4, 2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 9, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER REGARDING THE ADMISSIBILITY OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER WITHDRAWING PARTIAL JUDGMENT re 162 Objection filed by Nick Makreas. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 7, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER RE: CROSS-MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 117 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; 118 Motion for Summary Judgment; 137 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Toll Statute of Limitations filed by Nick Makreas. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 1, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 108 Discovery Letter Brief.(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 98 Discovery Letter Brief without prejudice. The witnesses' depositions shall take place on January 10, 2013. Defendant FNBNC to serve amended responses by January 9, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING 99 STIPULATION re Request to Extend Deadline for Filing Motions for Summary Judgment.Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2013. Opposition due by 2/15/2013. Replies due by 3/8/2013. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/3/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Fact Discovery to be completed by 1/9/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING 83 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT TO TOLL STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. Whit e on 10/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING e 80 STIPULATION re Request to Extend Time to Complete Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING 75 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Request for Telephonic Appearance. Counsel shall supply this Court's Courtroom Deputy with a direct land line telephone number by no later than noon on Thursday, June 28, 2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/26/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER REGARDING T. D. SERVICE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING 63 STIPULATION to Toll Statute of Limitations. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/7/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING 51 Stipulation RE: First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation To Vacate Entry of Default and Take January 6, 2012 Motion to Dismiss Off Calendar. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/21/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 32 Stipulation To Dismiss Certain Defendants. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makreas v. First National Bank of Northern California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.D. Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Castor
Represented By: John Norman MacLeod
Represented By: John F. Friedemann, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Brugioni
Represented By: John Norman MacLeod
Represented By: John F. Friedemann, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Represented By: Eugene Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Eugene Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Munks
Represented By: Eugene Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Duvall
Represented By: Eugene Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoss
Represented By: Eugene Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valencia
Represented By: Eugene Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Northern California
Represented By: John Norman MacLeod
Represented By: John F. Friedemann, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Makreas
Represented By: Nelson W. Goodell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?