Whittenburg et al v. Kohl's Corporation
Plaintiff: Rhonda Whittenburg and Stefani Concepcion
Defendant: Kohl's Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv02320
Filed: May 11, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINAL ORDER and JUDGMENT. Motions terminated: (21 in 3:12-cv-00119-CRB) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses and Incentive Fees filed by Carla Burdewick, (22 in 3:12-cv-00119-CRB) MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Carla Burdewick. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/11/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer staying proceedings on 30 Motion to Certify Class.(crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 22 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER continuing CMC re 14 Stipulation, filed by Kohl's Corporation Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/17/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whittenburg et al v. Kohl's Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Whittenburg
Represented By: Gene J. Stonebarger
Represented By: Richard David Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefani Concepcion
Represented By: Richard David Lambert
Represented By: Gene J. Stonebarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Corporation
Represented By: Scott Richard Hatch
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?