Plevin et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Plevin and Teresita Torres
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco and S. A. Navarro
Case Number: 3:2011cv02359
Filed: May 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion for Attorney Fees (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 75 MOTION for Attorney Fees DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPERT FEES filed by S. A. Navarro, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/10/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 89 Stipulation to Continue Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expert Costs. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 84 Stipulation to Continue Defendants' Motion For Attorneys Fees and Expert Costs. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 52 Motion for Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/11/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 50 Stipulation to Extend Dates for Filing and Hearing Dispositive Motions. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 48 Stipulation to Extend Date For Filing Motion for Summary Judgment. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 45 Stipulation to extend dates for discovery, expert disclosure and continue trial. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re: Parties' Settlement Conference Statements. See order for details. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/2/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/21/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE UPON CONSENT AND SETTING CERTAIN CASE MANAGEMENT DATES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plevin et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Plevin
Represented By: William Edward Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresita Torres
Represented By: William Edward Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Joanne M. Hoeper
Represented By: Warren Metlitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. A. Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?