Angelesco v. Day Zimmerman Security Services et al
Plaintiff: Ralph A. Angelesco
Defendant: Day Zimmerman Security Services and JDSU
Case Number: 3:2011cv02393
Filed: May 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 36 Stipulation filed by Ralph A. Angelesco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE TO 12/31/11 re 33 Stipulation filed by Day Zimmerman Security Services. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEF. JDSU ONLY re 20 Stipulation filed by Day Zimmerman Security Services. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/15/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 11 Stipulation filed by Day Zimmerman Security Services. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/19/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angelesco v. Day Zimmerman Security Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph A. Angelesco
Represented By: Richard M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Day Zimmerman Security Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDSU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?