Valverde v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Bryan J. Valverde
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and ETS Services, LLC Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02423
Filed: May 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER VACATING ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/15/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 12 Motion to Strike ; granting 13 Motion to Dismiss; granting 22 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 30 Ex Parte Application for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT, DECLARATION IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE IN SUPPORT, PROPOSED ORDER AND COMPLAINT filed by Bryan J. Valverde (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valverde v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan J. Valverde
Represented By: Vernon L. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Viddell Lee Heard, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETS Services, LLC Inc.
Represented By: Megan Catherine Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?