Marchand Womack v. City and County of San Francisco
Plaintiff: Marchand Womack
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco and San Francisco Police Department
Case Number: 3:2011cv02455
Filed: May 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF DISMISSAL.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/6/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/18/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED (26 in 3:11-cv-02455-JSW) STIPULATION Modifying Scheduling Order to Reset Date for Dispositive Motions and Request for Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2012. Further Case Management Confer ence set for 6/22/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Settlement Conference re (19 in 3:11-cv-02457-JSW) Stipulation filed by Tai Greer Settlement Conference Continued to 1/31/2012 10:00 AM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/1/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER Taking Settlement Conference off Calendar. re (17 in 3:11-cv-02457-JSW) Stipulation filed by Tai Greer. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/29/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 Stipulation TO ALLOW FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSOLIDATED ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/6/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING (14 in 3:11-cv-02455-JSW) Stipulation TO CONSOLIDATE CASES.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/1/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO A RANDOMLY ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/24/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marchand Womack v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marchand Womack
Represented By: Dennis Julian Roberts
Represented By: Paul Raymond Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?