T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc. v AU Optronics Corporation, et al Featured Case

T-Mobile's civil antitrust lawsuit against LCD screen manufacturers.

Plaintiff: T-Mobile USA Inc
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc, Chi Mei Corporation, CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Nexgen Mediatech Inc, Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc, Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Tatung Company, Tatung Company of America Inc, Seiko Epson Corporation, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Epson Electronics America Inc, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi LTD, Hitachi Displays Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Displays USA Inc, LG Display Co Ltd, LG Display America Inc, Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Samsung SDI America Inc, Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd, Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components Inc, Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co Ltd and Toshiba America Information Systems Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv02591
Filed: May 31, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 197 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 196 , (8619) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI re Dismissal of Toshiba Entities (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013) Modified on 9/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2013 196 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc re Dismissal of Toshiba Entities (MDL Dkt. 8619) (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 5, 2013 195 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 193 , (8466) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation of Dismissal of Philips Electronics North America Corp (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013) Modified on 9/6/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2013 194 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8444) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation of Dismissal of Tatung Company and Tatung Company of America, Inc (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 15, 2013 193 NOTICE by T-Mobile USA Inc Notice of Stipulation of Dismissal regarding Philips Electronics North America Corp filed in MDL Master Case (Dkt 8466) (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 192 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8445) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation of Dismissal of HannStar Display Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 191 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8444) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation of Dismissal of Tatung Company and Tatung Company of America, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 190 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8443) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation of Dismissal of Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., and Samsung Electronics Americas, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 189 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8442) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI re: dismissal of Samsung SDI, Samsung SDI America (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 12, 2013 188 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc re Stipulation of Dismissal of HannStar Display Corporation (MDL Dkt No. 8445) (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 12, 2013 187 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc re Stipulation of Dismissal of Tatung Company and Tatung Company of America, Inc. (MDL Dkt No. 8444) (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 12, 2013 186 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc re Stipulation of Dismissal of Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (MDL Dkt No. 8443) (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 12, 2013 185 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc re Stipulation of Dismissal of Samsung SDI Co., Ltd and Samsung SDI America, Inc. (MDL Dkt No. 8442) (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
July 8, 2013 184 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 183 , (8260) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI re Dismissal of Sanyo Consumer Electronics filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013) Modified on 7/9/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2013 183 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc re Dismissal of Sanyo Consumer Electronics (MDL Dkt. No. 8260) (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
June 13, 2013 182 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re 181 . (8055) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Dismissal of Seiko Epson Corp., Epson Imaging Devices Corp., and Epson Electronics America, Inc. filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 181 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc re Stipulation of Dismissal of Seiko Epson Corp., Epson Imaging Devices Corp., and Epson Electronics America, Inc. (MDL Dkt No. 8055) (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 180 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7841) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal of Chunghwa Picture Tubes filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 3, 2013 179 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc re Dismissal of Chunghwa Picture Tubes (MDL Dkt. 7841) (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 1, 2013 178 NOTICE by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Tatung Company of America Inc Notice of Change of Firm Name (Farmer, William) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 177 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7810) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI re Dismissal of AU Optronics Entities and LG Display Entities filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 29, 2013 176 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc re Dismissal of AU Optronics and LG Display Entities (MDL Dkt. 7810) (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 12, 2013 175 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Reconsideration re 174 . (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 4/12/2013) Modified on 4/15/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2013 174 MOTION for Reconsideration re 90 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,, PLAINTIFFS T-MOBILE U.S.A., INC.'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S ORDER DISMISSING T-MOBILE'S CARTWRIGHT ACT, UNFAIR COMPETITION LAW, AND DONNELLY ACT CLAIMS filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rubinstein, Jason) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 27, 2013 173 AMENDED MINUTES FROM 3/15/13 HEARING: ADDING THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE (NO OTHER CHANGES) T-Mobile and Defendants shall submit a stipulation to the 75 day extension, with revised dates. If T-Mobile seeks to reinstate certain indirect purchaser claims pursuant to the Ninth Circuit's AT&T Mobility LLC v. AU Optronics Corp. decision, it must submit a motion. The Court grants T-Mobile leave to submit such motion.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 22, 2013 172 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7652) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI REVISED TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER re 170 . (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) Modified on 3/25/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2013 171 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 3/19/2013). Track I(b) trial has been continued to 7/22/13 and the pretrial is continued to 7/9/13 (7-1827, 10-4572, 10-4945, 10-5452, and 12-4114)By 3/29/13, counsel shall submit a proposed pretrial scheduling order with repect to the Track I(b) cases.As to Track I(b), there will be no ATM FEE evidentiary hearing. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013)
March 14, 2013 170 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Revised Track 2 Deadlines. [MDL No.7652]. (Rubinstein, Jason) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2013 169 NOTICE by T-Mobile USA Inc of Withdrawal of Attorney David H Orozco (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 7, 2013 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Parsons Hoek (Hoek, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 4, 2013 167 Featured Case ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/13 is continued 3/15/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/1/13., Motions terminated: (102 in 3:11-cv-06241-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
March 1, 2013 166 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/1/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing (SEE TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER 7139 ) Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 23, 2013 165 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 7542 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI For Dismissal of Chi Mei Entities re 164 . (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013) Modified on 1/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2013 164 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc re Stipulation of Dismissal of Chi Mei Entities (MDL Dkt. No. 7542) (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
November 21, 2012 163 Featured Case ORDER The August 20, 2013 and September 10, 2013 deadlines for the parties to provide additional and supplemental description[s] of each issue/subject of summary judgment motions are hereby vacated and replaced with the following: August 20, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to serve proposed list of summary judgment motions (copies to be provided to the court). August 21-September 9, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to meet and confer over proposed list of summary judgment motions and schedule for same. September 10, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to file with the Court joint list of proposed summary judgment motions and proposed schedule for summary judgment filings. October 30, 2013: Last day to file supplemental list of proposed summary judgment motions based upon new information or issues raised in the reply expert reports.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 20, 2012 162 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc re Letter from Messrs. Murray and Foran re Summary Judgment on Track 2 Cases (MDL Dkt. No. 7213) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re Summary Judgment On Track 2 Cases)(Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 13, 2012 161 Featured Case TRACK 2 SCHEDULING ORDER, Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/8/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 13, 2012 160 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 11/13/2012). The ATS Claims, Dell and Nokia cases ARE CONTINUED TO 11/30/12 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (9-1115, 10-1064, 09--5609)Counsel in the Track 2 cases shall select a mediator and inform the court of the name of the person selected. The Court will file an order approving the stipulated revised schedule for Track 2 cases.The Court will issue a separate order addressing Daubert motions in the cases set for trial in January 2013, streamlining summary judgment practice in the Track 2 cases, as well as the issue of consolidating the Best Buy cases. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2012)
November 5, 2012 159 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Harrison J. Frahn, IV NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COUNSEL (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 19, 2012 158 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 157 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (7007 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 16, 2012 156 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Hitachi Displays, LTD. (n/k/a Japan Display East, Inc.), Hitachi, LTD and Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc. This document relates to case C11-2591 SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/15/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 11, 2012 155 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by T-Mobile USA Inc re Dismissal of Hitachi (MDL Dkt No. 6951) (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 10, 2012 154 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (6919) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adam Carlis in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
September 25, 2012 153 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 22, 2012 152 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS LG DISPLAY AMERICA, INC. AND LG DISPLAY CO., LTD'S COUNTERCLAIMS AND STRIKE THEIR DEFENSES RE DUPLICATIVE RECOVERY 139 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/22/2012)
September 5, 2012 151 CLERKS NOTICE : THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS ARE TAKEN OFF THE September 7, 2012 calendar. The motions are deemed submitted without argument. 7-1827, Dkt. No. 6227 , 11-2225, Dkt. No. 149, 11-2495, Dkt. No. 137, 11-2591, Dkt. No. 139, 11-3763, Dkt. No. 124, 11-4119, Dkt. No. 137, This is a docket text entry only and there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 30, 2012 150 REPLY in support of (re 139 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims ) filed byT-Mobile USA Inc. (Rubinstein, Jason) (Filed on 8/30/2012) Modified on 8/31/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2012 149 Order by Hon. Susan Illston granting (6476) Stipulation of Dismissal of Sharp Corporation and Sharp Electronics Corporation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. Associated Cases: 3:07-md-01827-SI, 3:11-cv-02591-SI(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 16, 2012 148 RESPONSE (re 139 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims ) LG Display America, Inc.'s and LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Opposition to Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike Their Defenses Concerning Duplicative Recovery filed byLG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(House, Holly) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 16, 2012 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re the Dismissal of Sharp Corporation and Sharp Electronics Corporation filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 7, 2012 146 Featured Case ORDER Granting Substitution of Counsel by CHUNGHWAY PICTURE TUBES. Signed by Judge SUSAN ILLSTON on 8/6/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) Modified on 8/7/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2012 145 Featured Case ORDER granting Substitution of Counsel by Tatung Company. Signed by Judge SUSAN ILLSTON on 8/6/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) Modified on 8/7/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2012 144 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Substitution of Counsel by Tatung Company. Signed by Judge SUSAN ILLSTON on 8/6/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 2, 2012 143 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by William S Farmer and [Proposed] Order (Farmer, William) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 142 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by William S Farmer and [Proposed] Order (Farmer, William) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 141 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by William S Farmer and [Proposed] Order (Farmer, William) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 20, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6227 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION to Dismiss , (139 in 3:11-cv-02591-SI) MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims. Responses due by 8/16/2012. Replies due by 8/30/2012. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 19, 2012 140 Declaration of Jason C. Rubinstein in Support of 139 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims filed byT-Mobile USA Inc. (Related document(s) 139 ) (Rubinstein, Jason) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 19, 2012 139 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/2/2012. Replies due by 8/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rubinstein, Jason) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 11, 2012 138 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 6, 2012, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Cutoff Hearing set for 11/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 137 Featured Case ORDER signed on 7/6/12 by Judge Illston granting ( 5861 ) Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (89) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05458-SI; granting (109) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (112) Motion in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (135) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (127) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (71) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting (111) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (92) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (27) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04116-SI; granting (122) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting (42) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting (56) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting (45) Motion in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting (15) Motion in case 3:12-cv-00335-SI; granting (14) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI; granting (13) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01599-SI; granting (11) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02214-SI; granting (8) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02495-SI (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 136 Minute Entry: Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order held on 7/6/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 7/9/2012). The Court will issue the scheduling order. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2012)
July 5, 2012 135 CLERKS NOTICE: ALL PARTIES ARE ADVISED THAT THE MOTION RE: TWO TRACK SCHEDULING WILL BE HELD STARTING AT 9:30 A.M. INSTEAD OF 9:00 A.M. TOMORROW, FRIDAY, JULY 6, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 26, 2012 134 REPLY (re 127 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) filed byT-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard Mooney)(Folse, Parker) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 26, 2012 133 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Bangasser, Hugh) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 25, 2012 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Freitas , Jason S. Angell, and Jerry Chen on behalf of HannStar Display Corp. (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 21, 2012 131 Featured Case ORDER signed on 6/19/12 by Judge Illston granting 129 Stipulation to extend time to answer to LG's counterclaims (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 20, 2012 130 OBJECTIONS to MOTION FOR PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULES IN DAP CASES (MDL 1827 #5861) by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 19, 2012 129 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 119 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, 118 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Rubinstein, Jason) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 18, 2012 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Cody Martin (Martin, Brandon) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 5, 2012 127 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/19/2012. Replies due by 6/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Folse, Parker) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
May 1, 2012 126 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS 5548 (see order for details). re 124 . Signed by Judge Illston on 4/30/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2012 125 Featured Case ORDER signed on 4/30/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting Stipulation re Schedule to Answer or Respond to LG Display's Counterclaims filed by T-Mobile USA Inc(5542) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (242) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; granting (321) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-05840-SI; granting (166) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting (117) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-03517-SI; granting (79) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04346-SI; granting (102) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (138) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00058-SI; granting (165) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00711-SI; granting (126) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (115) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02495-SI; granting (124) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (103) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (114) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI. See order for specific details (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2012 124 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Schedule to Answer or Respond to LG Display's Counterclaims filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Rubinstein, Jason) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 12, 2012 123 Featured Case ORDER granting 122 Stipulation for Plaintiffs to Answer or Respond to Defendants LG Display Co. LTD and LG Display America, Inc.s Counterclaims for Declarative Relief filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. signed by Judge Illston on 4/11/12 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 10, 2012 122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Answer or Respond to Defendants LG Display Co. LTD and LG Display America, Inc.s Counterclaims for Declarative Relief filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 4, 2012 121 RESPONSE to re 117 Notice (Other), DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION REGARDING TRIAL STRUCTURE AND DUPLICATIVE RECOVERY by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Levi, Alexander) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 4, 2012 120 Joinder in re Small Screen Direct Action Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion Re Trial Structure and for Relief to Avoid Duplicative Recovery filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 4/4/2012) Modified on 4/5/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2012 119 Answer to Amended Complaint 55 Amended Complaint,,,, Defendant LG Display America, Inc.'s Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM for Declarative Relief against T-Mobile USA Inc byLG Display America Inc. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 21, 2012 118 Answer to Amended Complaint 55 Amended Complaint,,,, Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM for Declarative Relief against T-Mobile USA Inc byLG Display Co Ltd. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 13, 2012 117 NOTICE by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc, LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd, Toshiba America Electronics Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Notice of Pending Motion and Of Issue and Claim Preclusion (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 6, 2012 116 ANSWER to Amended Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 107 and 115 byEpson Electronics America Inc, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Seiko Epson Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
March 6, 2012 115 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 116 . *** ANSWER to Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 107 byEpson Electronics America Inc, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 3/6/2012) Modified on 3/6/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2012 114 Answer to Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc.'s Amended Complaint byTatung Company. (Farmer, William) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 113 Answer to Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc.'s Amended Complaint byTatung Company of America Inc. (Farmer, William) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 112 Answer to Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc.'s Amended Complaint byChunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. (Farmer, William) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 111 Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER BY DEFENDANTS AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA TO T-MOBILES AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 110 ANSWER to Amended Complaint HannStar Display Corporation's Answer to Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief of T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc. byHannstar Display Corporation. (Emerson, Ramona) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 109 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by AU Optronics Corporation America Inc. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 108 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES OF CHI MEI CORPORATION, CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION, CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS USA, INC., CMO JAPAN CO. LTD., NEXGEN MEDIATECH, INC., AND NEXGEN MEDIATECH USA, INC. TO T-MOBILE U.S.A., INC.'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT byCHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, Nexgen Mediatech Inc, Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc. (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 107 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 116 . *** ANSWER to Amended Complaint byEpson Electronics America Inc, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 3/5/2012) Modified on 3/6/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2012 106 Answer to Amended Complaint 55 Amended Complaint,,,, of T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc. bySanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 105 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byHitachi Displays Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Displays USA Inc, Hitachi LTD. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 104 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant LG Display America, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint byLG Display America Inc. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 103 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint byLG Display Co Ltd. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 102 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer of Defendants Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc. to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint bySamsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Co Ltd. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 101 Philips Electronics North America Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief byPhilips Electronics North America Corporation. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 100 Answer to Amended Complaint 55 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.'s Answer to T-Mobile's Amended Complaint byToshiba America Electronics Components Inc. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 99 Answer to Amended Complaint 55 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s Answer to T-Mobile's Amended Complaint byToshiba America Information Systems Inc. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 98 Answer to Amended Complaint 55 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.'s Answer to T-Mobile's Amended Complaint byToshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 97 Answer to Amended Complaint 55 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba Corporation's Answer to T-Mobile's Amended Complaint byToshiba Corporation. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 96 Sharp Electronics Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint of T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc. bySharp Electronics Corporation. (Lutz, Lindsay) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 95 Sharp Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint of T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc. bySharp Corporation. (Lutz, Lindsay) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
February 21, 2012 94 ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySamsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc. (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 21, 2012 93 Featured Case ORDER granting (4823) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (91) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI signed by Judge Illston on 2/17/12 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 17, 2012 92 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Holly A. House (House, Holly) (Filed on 2/17/2012)
February 14, 2012 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and [Proposed] Order filed by Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Co Ltd. (O'Connor, Eric) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 6, 2012 90 Featured Case ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS T-MOBILE USA COMPLAINT re 60 , 61 , 62 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/6/2012) Modified on 2/7/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2012 89 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Illston signed on 2/2/12granting (4757) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (88) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 2, 2012 88 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Alexander D. Levi ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611070048.) Filing fee previously paid on 2/2/12 filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 receipt, # 2 proposed order)(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 31, 2012 87 REPLY (re 62 MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants� ) filed bySamsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Co Ltd. (Cunningham, Tyler) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
January 31, 2012 86 Joinder in 85 REPLY in support (re 61 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART AMENDED COMPLAINT ) filed bySanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 1/31/2012) Modified on 2/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2012 85 REPLY (re 61 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART AMENDED COMPLAINT ) filed byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
January 25, 2012 84 Featured Case ORDER granting withdrawal and substituion of counsel (#4650) THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED TO WITH THIS ORDER.. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/25/12. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 25, 2012 83 Featured Case ORDER granting withdrawal and substitution (#4649)THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED TO WITH THIS ORDER.. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/25/12. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 25, 2012 82 Featured Case ORDER granting withdrawal and substitution of counsel (#4648). Signed by Judge Illston on 1/25/12. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012) Modified on 1/25/2012 (tf, COURT STAFF).THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED TO WITH THIS ORDER.
January 24, 2012 81 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by William S Farmer Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel and [Proposed] Order (Farmer, William) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 24, 2012 80 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by William S Farmer Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel and [Proposed] Order (Farmer, William) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 24, 2012 79 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by William S Farmer Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel and [Proposed] Order (Farmer, William) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 20, 2012 78 Featured Case ORDER granting (4615) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:07-md-01827-SI signed by SI on 1/19/12. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 20, 2012 77 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Illston granting (4618) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (73) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 20, 2012 76 Featured Case ORDER granting 70 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 19, 2012 75 NOTICE by CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, Nexgen Mediatech Inc, Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL MICHAEL R. LIZANO (Perez-Lizano, Michael) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 17, 2012 74 RESPONSE (re 62 MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants� ) filed byT-Mobile USA Inc. (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 17, 2012 73 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal T-Mobile's Opposition to Samsung's Motion to Dismiss filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason Rubinstein, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 17, 2012 72 RESPONSE (re 61 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART AMENDED COMPLAINT ) filed byT-Mobile USA Inc. (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 17, 2012 71 RESPONSE (re 60 MOTION to Dismiss ) to Sanyo's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed byT-Mobile USA Inc. (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 17, 2012 70 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal T-Mobile's Opposition to Sanyo's Motion to Dismiss filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason Rubinstein, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 12, 2012 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Margaret Derr (Derr, Melissa) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
December 27, 2011 68 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 19, 2011 67 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re 64 . (4330) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011) Modified on 12/20/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2011 66 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/9/11, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 14, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (4327 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants� MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants� MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants�, (62 in 3:11-cv-02591-SI) MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants� MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants� MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants�. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Replies due by 1/31/2012. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 14, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 62 MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants� MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants� MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants�. Responses due by 1/16/2012. Replies due by 1/30/2012. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 14, 2011 65 NOTICE by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc Notice of Withdrawal of Document re 59 . (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 12/14/2011) Modified on 12/16/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 64 Ex Parte Application re 60 Joinder, to File Documents Under Seal filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 63 Proposed Order re 62 MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants� MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants� MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants� [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss by Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Co Ltd. (Cunningham, Tyler) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 62 MOTION to Dismiss Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Samsung SDI America, Inc.'s (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims Pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law; and (2) Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss in Part Amended Complaint filed by Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Co Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Cunningham, Tyler) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 61 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Replies due by 1/31/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 60 Joinder to 59 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss in Part Amended Complaint of T-Mobile by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 12/12/2011) Modified on 12/13/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/13/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 59 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss in Part Amended Complaint filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/20/2012. Replies due by 1/27/2012. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 7, 2011 58 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 28, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842, Joan_Columbini@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
November 8, 2011 57 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 56 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - re T-Mobile's Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 11/8/2011) Modified on 11/9/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2011 56 Featured Case ORDER granting 54 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 7, 2011 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT [REDACTED] of T-Mobile USA, Inc. against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc, CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Epson Electronics America Inc, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Displays USA Inc, Hitachi LTD, LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd, Nexgen Mediatech Inc, Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc, Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd, Seiko Epson Corporation, Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company, Tatung Company of America Inc, Toshiba America Electronics Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co Ltd. Filed byT-Mobile USA Inc. (Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 54 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re T-Mobile USA's Amended Complaint filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason Rubinstein in Support, # 2 Proposed Order Granting T-Mobile's Application to File Under Seal)(Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 2, 2011 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Arka Dev Chatterjee (Chatterjee, Arka) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Richard Perez-Lizano (Perez-Lizano, Michael) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 49 NOTICE of Appearance by James Glenn Kreissman (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
October 13, 2011 48 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion DEFENDANTS' JOINT NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 10, 2011 47 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Without Prejudice (Cunningham, Tyler) (Filed on 10/10/2011)
October 10, 2011 46 NOTICE by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd re 42 Joinder, 45 Clerks Notice,, Withdrawal of Joinder to Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile's Complaint (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 10/10/2011)
October 7, 2011 45 CLERKS NOTICE : There are two motions to dismiss in this case (T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc. v AU Optronics Corporation, et al, No. 11-2591) scheduled for hearing on October 28, 2011 (Nos. 35, 41 in 11-2591; Nos. 3592, 3602 in 07-1827). The parties recently filed a stipulation giving T-Mobile until November 7, 2011, to file an amended complaint. The stipulation did not remove the pending motions from the courts calendar. If the defendants no longer wish for their motions to be heard on October 28, 2011, they must withdraw them. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 3, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF T-MOBILE U.S.A., INC. TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc re 43 Stipulation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011) Modified on 10/4/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2011 43 STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF T-MOBILE U.S.A., INC. TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 15, 2011 42 Joinder re 35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by plaintiff T-Mobile USA, Inc. by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 41 MOTION to Dismiss T-Mobile's Claims pursuant to California's Cartwright Act and Unfair Competition Law and Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Co Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/29/2011. Replies due by 10/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Tyler) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Philips Electronics North America Corporation re 39 Request for Judicial Notice, 37 Joinder, 38 Declaration in Support (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 39 Request for Judicial Notice re 37 Joinder, filed byPhilips Electronics North America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 37 ) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 38 Declaration of Shawn Joe Lichaa in Support of 37 Joinder, filed byPhilips Electronics North America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 37 ) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 37 Joinder re 35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion to Dismiss Philips Electronics North America Corporation's Joinder to Motion to Dismiss T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc.'s Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Philips Electronics North America Corporation. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 36 Proposed Order re 35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion to Dismiss by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc, CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Epson Electronics America Inc, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Displays USA Inc, Hitachi LTD, LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd, Nexgen Mediatech Inc, Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd, Seiko Epson Corporation, Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company, Tatung Company of America Inc, Toshiba America Electronics Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co Ltd. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Motion to Dismiss filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Inc, CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Epson Electronics America Inc, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Displays USA Inc, Hitachi LTD, LG Display America Inc, LG Display Co Ltd, Nexgen Mediatech Inc, Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd, Seiko Epson Corporation, Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company, Tatung Company of America Inc, Toshiba America Electronics Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/29/2011. Replies due by 10/6/2011. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 34 CLERKS NOTICE: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT the Court is no longer accepting new motions to be noticed for Friday, November 4, 2011. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
August 24, 2011 33 Featured Case ORDER re: extension to time to respond to complaint in 11-3856 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 10, 2011 32 Order Re: Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, Waiver of Service, and [Proposed] Order by Philips Electronics North America Corporation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 4, 2011 31 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF T-MOBILE'S MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING T-MOBILE TO SERVE DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND TATUNG CO. THROUGH THEIR U.S. COUNSEL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 30 STIPULATION re 25 Stipulation, 26 Order Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, Waiver of Service, and [Proposed] Order by Philips Electronics North America Corporation. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
July 29, 2011 29 RESPONSE/Opposition to 28 Order on Motion for AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND TATUNG CO. THROUGH THEIR U.S. COUNSEL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011) by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd, Tatung Company. (Ahern, Patrick) (Filed on 7/29/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2011 28 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF T-MOBILE'S MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND TATUNG CO. THROUGH THEIR U.S. COUNSEL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 1, 2011 27 MOTION Motion by T-Mobile USA, Inc. for Order Authorizing Plaintiff to Serve Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd. and Tatung Company Through Their U.S. Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2011 09:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 7/15/2011. Replies due by 7/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brooke Taylor, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Brooke) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 28, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER re: #25 STIPULATION re Joint Corrected Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, Waiver of Service, and [Proposed] Order by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Folse, Parker(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 23, 2011 25 STIPULATION re Joint Corrected Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, Waiver of Service, and [Proposed] Order by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Folse, Parker) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 20, 2011 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 23 Featured Case ORDER in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (19) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (18) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 17, 2011 21 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, Waiver of Service and [Proposed] Order by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Folse, Parker) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 13, 2011 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jason C. Rubinstein ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611060966.) filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 receipt, # 2 proposed order)(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 2, 2011 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael R. Scott ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611060570.) filed by CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, Nexgen Mediatech Inc, Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 receipt, # 2 proposed order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Ewart ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611969561.) filed by CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION, CMO Japan Co Ltd, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc, Nexgen Mediatech Inc, Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 receipt, # 2 proposed order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 31, 2011 17 Featured Case Pretrial ORDER #1. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/7. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 16 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:11-cv-00664. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 18, 2011 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14) in re TFT-LCD (Flat Panel) Antitrust Litigation (RS)
May 16, 2011 14 MDL 1827 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 14); in re TFT-LCD (Flat Panel) Antitrust Litigation; Northern District of CA; assigned to Judge Susan Yvonne Illston. Case transferred electronically. (RS)
May 2, 2011 13 TEXT ONLY NOTICE FROM MDL PANEL; MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-14) Finalized on 5/2/11. Please see pleading ( 197 in MDL No. 1827, 3 in WAW/2:11-cv-00664).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 5/2/2011. Associated Cases: MDL No. 1827, WAW/2:11-cv-00664 (DLS) (RS)
April 27, 2011 12 STATEMENT of T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc. re Rule 7.1 by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Folse, Parker)
April 21, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER re 7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel B Rapport for T-Mobile USA Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 21, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER re 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Hallie B. Levin for T-Mobile USA Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 21, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER re 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Edward A. Friedman for T-Mobile USA Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 21, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David H. Orozco for T-Mobile USA Inc, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 21, 2011 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel B. Rapport FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2405114. (Taylor, Brooke)
April 21, 2011 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Hallie B. Levin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2405111. (Taylor, Brooke)
April 21, 2011 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Edward A. Friedman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2405109. (Taylor, Brooke)
April 21, 2011 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David H. Orozco FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2405093. (Taylor, Brooke)
April 21, 2011 3 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Tag-Along Action in the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ; filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Taylor, Brooke)
April 19, 2011 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE)
April 18, 2011 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-2401397), filed by T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit to Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons to All Defendants, # 4 Exhibit to Summons)(Folse, Parker)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T-Mobile U.S.A., Inc. v AU Optronics Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T-Mobile USA Inc
Represented By: Parker C Folse, III
Represented By: Parker C. Folse, III
Represented By: Edward A. Friedman
Represented By: Hallie B. Levin
Represented By: David H. Orozco
Represented By: Daniel B Rapport
Represented By: Jason C Rubinstein
Represented By: Brooke Ashley-May Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA Inc
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan Co Ltd
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgen Mediatech Inc
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc
Represented By: Michael Jacob Ewart
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seiko Epson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannstar Display Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Displays USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronics Components Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?