Jackson v. Fischer et al
Plaintiff: Suzanne D. Jackson
Defendant: Sazani Beach Hotel, Monvia LLC, Mani Koolasuriya, Joshua Rosen, Upper Orbit, LLC, Specigen, Inc., Brian Campion, Lonnie Bookbinder, Chetan Narsude, William Fischer, Jon Sabes, Steven Sabes, David Goldsteen, Marvin Siegel, NotebookzmInc., Ileonardo.com Inc., New Moon LLC and Peer Dreams Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02753
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S White on 2/24/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING 80 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss and to Reply. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING 61 Stipulation for Leave to Exceed Page Limits Established by the Court's Civil Standing Orders. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING 63 Stipulation of Continuance. Signed by Judge James Ware for Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 11, 2012. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 59 Stipulation TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS ESTABLISHED BY THE COURTS CIVIL STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 56 Stipulation to file First Amended Complaint and extend date by which defendants must respond. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING 51 Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Continuing Case Management Conference: Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2012. Replies due by 12/16/2011. Responses due by 11/28/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/21/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 49 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/18/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 38 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/16/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Fischer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sazani Beach Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monvia LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mani Koolasuriya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upper Orbit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specigen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Bookbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chetan Narsude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Sabes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sabes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Goldsteen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NotebookzmInc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ileonardo.com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Moon LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peer Dreams Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne D. Jackson
Represented By: Alan H. Kaufman
Represented By: Robert John Stumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?