The Commonwealth of Virginia v. McKesson Corporation et al

Plaintiff: The Commonwealth of Virginia
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Robert James and Greg Stephen Yonko
Case Number: 3:2011cv02782
Filed: June 8, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/4/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
September 20, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 102 105 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
August 15, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO EXCHANGE PROPOSED TRIAL EXHIBITS AND RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
June 21, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 91 Stipulation Regarding Outstanding Discovery Disputes filed by McKesson Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
May 1, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - MODIFIED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER filed by McKesson Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 9, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed on 4/3/13 by Judge Susan Illston granting 72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Adele M. Neiburg (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
March 28, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 57 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
December 13, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UNTIL DECEMBER 18, 2012 AT 10:00 A.M. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
August 29, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Pretrial Preparation Order filed by McKesson Corporation. Jury Trial set for 7/8/2013 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pret rial Conference set for 6/25/2013 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 4/19/2013. Replies due by 4/26/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on August 29, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
October 13, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
September 14, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2011 02:30 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Commonwealth of Virginia v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Lelia Palmore Beck
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jennifer F. Connolly
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Barbara A. Mahoney
Represented By: Lelia P. Winget-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Stephen Yonko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?