Spalding et al v. City Of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Spalding, Katharine Loncke, Danielle Lopez Green and Adrian Drummond-Cole
Defendant: City Of Oakland, County of Alameda, Anthony Batts, Howard Jordan, Jeff Israel, Eric Breshears, Edward Tracey, Anthony Toribio, David Downing, Ersie Joyner, Mike Poirier, Darrin Allison and Gregory Ahern
Case Number: 3:2011cv02867
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER OF EXONERATION AND TO SEAL AND DESTROY ARREST RECORD. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/30/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting final approval of class action settlement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/09/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 95 Joint motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement. Claim forms and objections due by 08/05/13. Parties to file joint statement by 08/19/13. Final Approval Hearing set for 09/09/13 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/13/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, SET HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND FURTHER STAY DISCOVERY AND LITIGATION PENDING HEARING ON MOTION Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/13/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Stay Discovery and Litigation. Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/01/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Stay Discovery and Litigation Pending Finalization of Tentative Settlement. Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/29/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Stay Discovery and Litigation Pending Further Settlement Conference re 79 : Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/13/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 12/19/2012 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/8/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Stay Discovery and Litigation Pending Further Settlement Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/05/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANANGEMENT CONFERENCE AND STAY DISCOVERY AND LITIGATION PENDING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/05/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RE FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (JUDGE BEELER, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re 42 permitting Defendant Gregory Ahern to participate in settlement conference via telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/14/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER EXCUSING ASSISTANT CHIEF ANTHONY TORIBIO AND DEPUTY CHIEF ERIC BRESHEARS FROM ATTENDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; re 55 Declaration in Support filed by City Of Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/21/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson re: class notice. 53 Joint proposal is approved with modifications. Plaintiffs' counsel shall file a declaration that class notice has been disseminated by 05/21/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 6/18/2012 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/10/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to June 13, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Please report to 450 Golden Gate Avenue, 15th Floor, Courtroom C, San Francisco, CA. Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler - granting 47 Ex Parte Application. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER directing response from Plaintiffs re: Defendants' requests to appear by telephone at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/29/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 30 Plaintiffs' motion for class certification. Parties shall meet and confer re: class notice and file a stipulation and proposed order by 04/27/12 or include a discussion in the joint case management conference statement due on 04/30/12 if agreement is not reached by that date. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/14/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 9/19/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spalding et al v. City Of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Oakland
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Kee
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Batts
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Kee
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Jordan
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Kee
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Israel
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Kee
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Breshears
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Kee
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Tracey
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Kee
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Toribio
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Kee
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Downing
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Kee
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ersie Joyner
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Kee
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Poirier
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Kee
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Allison
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Kee
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Spalding
Represented By: Mara Verheyden-Hilliard
Represented By: Bobbie Fay Stein
Represented By: Carol A. Sobel
Represented By: Carl Messineo
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katharine Loncke
Represented By: Mara Verheyden-Hilliard
Represented By: Bobbie Fay Stein
Represented By: Carol A. Sobel
Represented By: Carl Messineo
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Lopez Green
Represented By: Carl Messineo
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Carol A. Sobel
Represented By: Bobbie Fay Stein
Represented By: Mara Verheyden-Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Drummond-Cole
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Carl Messineo
Represented By: Carol A. Sobel
Represented By: Bobbie Fay Stein
Represented By: Mara Verheyden-Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?