M.H. v. County of Alameda et al
Plaintiff: Martin Harrison, Jr., Michelle Henshaw, Tiffany Harrison, M.H., Joseph Harrison and Krystle Harrison
Defendant: Corizon Health Inc, Ryan Madigan, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde, Zelda Sancho, County of Alameda, Gregory J. Ahern, Harold Orr, Roberto Martinez, Zachary Litvinchuk, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, Joshua Swetnam, Megan Hast, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda and Shawn Sobrero
Intervenor: Kristy Kite
Case Number: 3:2011cv02868
Filed: June 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Filing 458 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Matthew M. Grigg (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 20, 2016 Filing 457 NOTICE of Change of Address by J. Randall Andrada (Andrada, J.) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER GRANTING KRISTY KITE'S MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #448 Motion to Intervene. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER CORRECTING ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE re #443 REQUEST FOR CORRECTION TO ORDER APPROVING MINORS COMPROMISE filed by M.H.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
January 6, 2016 Filing 454 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/6/2016. Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/6/2016)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #448 MOTION to Intervene filed by Kristy Kite. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 4, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 28, 2015 Filing 452 REPLY (re #448 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byKristy Kite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Torres, Javier) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 22, 2015 Filing 451 RESPONSE (re #448 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byCorizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 22, 2015 Filing 450 Statement of Non-Opposition re #448 MOTION to Intervene filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Related document(s) #448 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 449 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING HEARING DATE as to #448 MOTION to Intervene. The hearing on this motion will be held on 1/14/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/23/2015. Replies due by 12/30/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 9, 2015 Filing 448 MOTION to Intervene filed by Kristy Kite. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2016 02:00 PM before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/23/2015. Replies due by 12/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torres, Javier) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
October 28, 2015 Filing 447 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/28/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco.Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/28/2015)
October 28, 2015 Filing 446 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by M.H. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
September 28, 2015 Filing 445 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. Due to a change in the Court's availability, the status conference previously set for 10/21/2015 is continued to 10/28/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE re #443 MOTION REQUEST FOR CORRECTION TO ORDER APPROVING MINORS COMPROMISE filed by M.H. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 21, 2015 Filing 443 REQUEST FOR CORRECTION TO ORDER APPROVING MINORS COMPROMISE filed by M.H.. Responses due by 10/5/2015. Replies due by 10/13/2015. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A-Clarification to Order Approving Minor's Compromise, #(2) Exhibit B-Quote for Structured Settlement Annuity) (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 442 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT re #437 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF SETTLEMENT filed by Martin Harrison, Jr., Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Joseph Harrison. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 27, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 441 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re #438 Stipulation filed by Martin Harrison, Jr., Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Joseph Harrison. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 27, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re #436 Stipulation filed by Martin Harrison, Jr., Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Joseph Harrison. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 27, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 26, 2015 Filing 439 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Settlement Conference held on 2/26/2015. Further settlement conference held. Terms of settlement as to injunctive relief component finalized and efiled. (Not Reported)(lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/26/2015)
February 26, 2015 Filing 438 STIPULATION PARTIALLY DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST CERTAIN DEFENDANTS filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 26, 2015 Filing 437 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER OF SETTLEMENT filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 26, 2015 Filing 436 STIPULATION Dismissing Individual Defendants filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 23, 2015 Filing 435 NOTICE by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. of Unavailability of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
February 20, 2015 Filing 434 CLERK'S NOTICE: Settlement Conference set for 2/26/2015 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. The court will allot two hours for the conference. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER REGARDING RETENTION OF EXHIBITS AND RETRIEVAL OF TRIAL MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 18, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 15, 2015 Filing 432 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/09/2015, before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 1:45 p.m. - 1:55 p.m. = 10 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2015. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 2/15/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 431 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Koss, Catherine) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 430 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 428 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 427 COURT EXHIBIT LIST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 426 JURY TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 425 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 2/10/2015. Counsel for Alameda County informed the court that the Board approved the settlement this morning. The parties will file the necessary stipulated dismissals and settlement agreement with the district court shortly. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/10/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 424 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Settlement Conference held on 2/10/2015. Case settled pending agency approval. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/10/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 429 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Settlement Conference held on 2/9/2015. Amendment to Minute Order to reflect FTR Time 1:45-1:55. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 423 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING FEBRUARY 10, 2015 TRIAL DATE. Jury trial in this matter scheduled for Tuesday, February 10, 2015 is vacated. Trial will be dark on that date and resume on Wednesday, February 11, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 6, 2015 Filing 422 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING FEBRUARY 9, 2015 TRIAL DATE. Jury trial in this matter scheduled for Monday, February 9, 2015 is vacated. Trial will be dark on that date and resume on Tuesday, February 10, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
February 6, 2015 Filing 421 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Further In-Person Settlement Conference for 2/9/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
February 5, 2015 Filing 420 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Settlement Conference held on 2/5/2015. Settlement conference held. Further discussion to be held Friday, February 6, 2015 at approximately 12:30 p.m. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2015)
February 5, 2015 Filing 419 Transcript of Proceedings Volume 4 held on 2/5/2015, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn and Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #369 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #415 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2015. (Related documents(s) #369 , #415 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 5, 2015 Filing 418 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Jury Trial held on 2/5/2015. Court Reporters: Lydia Zinn; Rhonda Aquilina. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2015)
February 4, 2015 Filing 417 Transcript of Proceedings Volume 3, held on 02/04/2015, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn and Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #369 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #415 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2015. (Related documents(s) #369 , #415 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
February 4, 2015 Filing 416 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Jury Trial held on 2/4/2015. Court Reportera: Lydia Zinn; Rhonda Aquilina. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/4/2015)
February 4, 2015 Filing 415 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
February 3, 2015 Filing 414 Transcript of Proceedings Volume 2, held on 02/03/2015, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn and Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #369 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2015. (Related documents(s) #369 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 3, 2015 Filing 413 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Jury Trial held on 2/3/2015. Court Reporters: Lydia Zinn; Rhonda Aquilina. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/3/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION RE DEFENDANT ZELDA SANCHO, L.V.N.The Court adopts the parties' stipulation regarding the California Board of Vocational Nursing and Psychiatric Technicians fine, ECF No. 365, and adopts it as the Court's order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER REGARDING TRIAL SCHEDULECounsel will arrive in the courtroom by 8:00 a.m. each day that trial is in session, so that any matter that requires the Court's participation, and that must be conducted outside the presence of the jury, can be completed before the jury begins hearing evidence at 8:30 a.m.(Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 2, 2015.)(Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT COUNTY OF ALAMEDA'S MOTION TO ALLOW DEMONSTRATIVE EXHIBITS re #404 Notice filed by County of Alameda. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 2, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 409 PROPOSED PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 2, 2015. (Entered 2/2/15)(Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 408 Transcript of Proceedings Vol. 1, held on 02/02/2015, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #369 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2015. (Related documents(s) #369 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 407 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Jury Selection held on 2/2/2015. Court Reporter Name: Lydia Zinn. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER REGARDING JUROR HARDSHIP REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 2, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 405 [Proposed] Order Allowing Demostrative Exhibits including Taser into the Courtroom filed by County of Alameda. (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 404 NOTICE by County of Alameda Re Motion to Allow Demostrative Exhibits into the Courtroom including a Taser (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for 3/19/2015 - 4/16/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 1, 2015 Filing 402 TRIAL BRIEF Re Objection To Unpleaded Claim by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/1/2015)
February 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 401 FURTHER ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINESigned by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 1, 2015.(Filed on 2/1/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 403 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Settlement Conference held on 1/29/2015 and 1/30/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 400 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Use Of Corizon Website filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. Responses due by 2/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Grigg)(Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 399 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION OF FIST DAY OF JURY SELECTION. The first day of Jury Selection will begin as previously scheduled on 2/2/2015 at 8:30 AM, but will be held in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor of the San Francisco Courthouse. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 398 MOTION in Limine re Preclusion of Uncited Discovery Responses filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. Responses due by 2/2/2015. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 397 Declaration of Julia Sherwin in Support of #396 Pretrial Memorandum, #375 Pretrial Memorandum (Supplemental) filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Deposition transcript of Kathryn Burns, M.D., #2 Exhibit B-1, Kathryn Wild, R.N. Power Point, Part 1, #3 Exhibit B-2, Kathryn Wild, R.N. Power Point, Part 2)(Related document(s) #396 , #375 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 396 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM; (REPLY TO CORIZON DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS 5 - 7) filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 29, 2015 Filing 395 Declaration of Genevieve K. Guertin in Support of #394 Opposition/Response to Motion, in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Corizon Defendants' Motion in Limine Re: Preclusion of Use of Terms "PMK," "PMQ," "Person Most Qualified," and "Person Most Knowledgeable" filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gilbert PMK Dep, #2 Exhibit B - Granlund PMK Dep, #3 Exhibit C - Orr PMK Dep, #4 Exhibit D - Back PMK Dep, #5 Exhibit E - Sass PMK Dep)(Related document(s) #394 ) (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 29, 2015 Filing 394 RESPONSE to (re #389 MOTION in Limine); Opposition to Corizon Defendants' Motion in Limine Re: Preclusion of Use of Terms "PMK," "PMQ," "Person Most Qualified," and "Person Most Knowledgeable" filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER RE JURY QUESTIONNAIREPlaintiffs' counsel is directed to provide 250 copies of the juror questionnaire for use during jury selection. The questionnaire shall be in the same form it appears at ECF No. 298, but without the caption page and with the following footer: CASE NO. 11-CV-2868 JST: JURY QUESTIONNAIRE.(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST RE AUDIO-VISUAL EQUIPMENTThe parties' stipulated request for an order allowing audio-visual equipment for trial, ECF No. 390, is granted.(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (wsn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/29/2015 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2015 Filing 391 Exhibit List (AMENDED) by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr... (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 28, 2015 Filing 390 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO-VISUAL EQUIPMENT FOR TRIAL filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 28, 2015 Filing 389 MOTION in Limine filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. Responses due by 2/11/2015. Replies due by 2/18/2015. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 388 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Settlement Conference held on 1/27/2015. Case did not settle. Counsel to contact the court at any time if further facilitated settlement conversations would be fruitful. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 387 TRIAL BRIEF (UPDATED FOR 2015) filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 386 RESPONSE to re #375 Pretrial Memorandum filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER GRANTING COUNTY OF ALAMEDA'S RENEWED REQUEST TO EXCUSE PERSONAL ATTENDANCE OF DEFENDANT BARENO AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND NO OBJECTION HAS BEEN FILED: Re #384 Notice filed by County of Alameda. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/26/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 384 NOTICE filed by County of Alameda of Renewed Request to Excused Personal Appearance of Defendant Bareno at Settlement Conference and No Objection from Plaintiffs (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER REGARDING NUMBER OF JURORS, JURY QUESTIONNAIRE, VOIR DIRE, AND PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES re #299 Proposed Voir Dire filed by Martin Harrison, Jr., Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Joseph Harrison, #300 Proposed Voir Dire filed by Zelda Sancho, #298 Proposed Voir Dire filed by Martin Harrison, Jr., Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Joseph Harrison, #305 MOTION in Limine in Omnibus Form Per Court Order filed by Martin Harrison, Jr., Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Joseph Harrison. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 25, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 382 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TIME ONLY: Settlement Conference reset to 1/27/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER regarding settlement conference. Plaintiffs have made a demand. The court appreciates that defendants recount their past responses but directs the defendants to submit a current response to the current demand (broken out by defendant if appropriate) and email it to the court's orders box at lbpo@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday at noon. In addition, if they have not done so already, the defendants must provide their fees and costs to date and their additional fees and costs through trial. Finally, if the parties have any concerns that the appropriate people are not attending, they must notify the court by noon on Monday by email to the orders box. (This is a text entry order generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 1/23/2015) Modified on 1/26/2015 (lsS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2015 Filing 380 OBJECTIONS to re #375 Pretrial Memorandum by Zelda Sancho. (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 21, 2015 Filing 379 RESPONSE to (re #355 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE COUNTY AND CORIZON'S UNDISCLOSED WITNESSES); County Defendants' Objection and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude County and Corizon Defendants' Undisclosed Witnesses filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Koss, Catherine) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER: Defendants must check with plaintiffs about their position. Re: #374 Notice (Other) filed by County of Alameda. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/20/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST THAT THE PERSONAL ATTENDANCE OF DEFENDANT MEGAN HAST AT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BE EXCUSED: Re: #373 Notice (Other) filed by County of Alameda. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/20/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 17, 2015 Filing 376 Declaration of Julia Sherwin in Support of #375 Pretrial Memorandum filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, California Correctional Medical Services Scope of Practice, #2 Exhibit B, CNA Bulletin on RN and LVN Scope of Practice, #3 Exhibit C, Deposition Transcript of Robert Jones, M.D., #4 Exhibit D, Deposition Transcript of Kathryn Wild, R.N.)(Related document(s) #375 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 1/17/2015)
January 17, 2015 Filing 375 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' SPECIAL INSTRUCTIONS 5, 6, AND 7 filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 1/17/2015)
January 17, 2015 Filing 374 NOTICE by County of Alameda; Request that the Personal Appearance of Defendant Michael Bareno be Excused at Settlement Conference (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/17/2015)
January 17, 2015 Filing 373 NOTICE by County of Alameda; Request that Personal Appearance by Defendant Megan Hast at Settlement Conference be Excused (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/17/2015)
January 16, 2015 Filing 372 RESPONSE to (re #355 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE COUNTY AND CORIZON'S UNDISCLOSED WITNESSES) filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration)(Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR MS. SANCHO TO ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 10:00 a.m. TO/UNTIL APPROXIMATELY 12:30 p.m.: Re #364 Notice (Other) filed by Zelda Sancho. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/16/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 16, 2015 Filing 370 OBJECTIONS to re #362 Statement, #366 Statement (Re: Defendants' Proposed Statements of the Case) by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 15, 2015 Filing 369 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by County of Alameda. (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 15, 2015 Filing 368 Joinder in re #367 Objection to Plaintiffs' Amended Jury Instruction 1.2 (Docket No. 367) filed by Zelda Sancho. (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 14, 2015 Filing 367 OBJECTIONS to re #363 Proposed Jury Instructions by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 14, 2015 Filing 366 Statement of the Case (Proposed) filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr, Zelda Sancho. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 14, 2015 Filing 365 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER CONCERNING CALIFORNIA BOARD OF VOCATIONAL NURSING AND PSYCHIATRIC TECHNICIANS FINE IMPOSED ON DEFENDANT ZELDA SANCHO, L.V.N. filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 14, 2015 Filing 364 NOTICE by Zelda Sancho of Amended Request that the Personal Attendance of Zelda Sancho at the 1/27/15 Settlement Conference Be Excused and Declaration in Support (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 14, 2015 Filing 363 [Proposed] Jury Instructions by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. -PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED JURY INSTRUCTION 1.2, CLAIMS AND DEFENSES (STATEMENT OF THE CASE). (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 14, 2015 Filing 362 Statement of the Case filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Andrada, J.) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST THAT THE PERSONAL ATTENDANCE OF HAROLD ORR, JR., M.D., AT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BE EXCUSED: Re #359 Notice filed by Harold Orr, Corizon Health Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/13/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
January 12, 2015 Filing 360 STIPULATION Pursuant To Order On Corizon Defendants' Motion In Limine No. 2 filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 12, 2015 Filing 359 NOTICE by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr re 352 Clerk's Notice; -Request that Personal Attendance of Dr. Orr at Settlement Conference Be Excused (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 12, 2015 Filing 358 REPORT Upon Status of County Motion in Limine Number 3 filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Andrada, J.) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER DENYING REQUEST THAT THE PERSONAL ATTENDANCE OF ZELDA SANCHO AT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BE EXCUSED: Re #353 Notice filed by Zelda Sancho. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/12/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 12, 2015 Filing 356 Declaration of Julia Sherwin in Support of #355 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE COUNTY AND CORIZON'S UNDISCLOSED WITNESSES, AND FOR DEPOSITION OF JEFF SHOLEY filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Corizon Defendants' Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B, County Defendants' Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit C, Corizon Defendants' Expert Disclosures, #4 Exhibit D, County Defendants' Expert Disclosures, #5 Exhibit E, Defendant Sancho's Expert Disclosures, #6 Exhibit F, Kathryn Wild, RN Deposition Transcript, #7 Exhibit G, Terri Granlund, RN Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit H, ACSO Sergeant Cynthia Sass Deposition Transcript)(Related document(s) #355 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 12, 2015 Filing 355 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE COUNTY AND CORIZON'S DEFENDANTS' UNDISCLOSED WITNESSES, AND FOR DEPOSITION OF JEFF SHOLEY filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Responses due by 1/16/2015. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 354 NOTICE by Zelda Sancho of Lodging of Exchanged Settlement Conference Statement and Confidential Settlement Conference Statement (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 353 NOTICE filed by Zelda Sancho - Request that Personal Attendance at Settlement Conference Be Excused (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 352 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE on January 14, 2015 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Settlement Conference reset to 1/27/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. The Order Setting Settlement Conference on 1/6/2015, ECF No. 349 remains in affect. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 8, 2015 Filing 351 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/05/2015, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number 415-264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #350 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2015. (Related documents(s) #350 ) (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
January 6, 2015 Filing 350 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by County of Alameda for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 349 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/6/2015. The court sets the settlement conference on January 14, 2015, at 9:30 a.m., which is the first date that it has. The requirements for the settlement conference (including contents of the exchanged and/or confidential settlement conference statements, the necessity of a monetary demand and response, and required attendees) are in the attached order. If the date does not work for the parties, they must schedule a call with all counsel on one line on Friday, January 9, 2015, with courtroom deputy Lashanda Scott to set another time. They may arrange a time for that call by email to the court's orders box at lbpo@cand.uscourts.gov or by telephone to Ms. Scott at 415-522-3140. The parties should know that accommodating a different date may necessitate the court's rescheduling other settlement conferences. The court's view is that given the output of time to prepare for trial, getting in earlier rather than later makes the most sense. The parties also should review the other side's list of attendees and identify any other relevant decision makers who should attend. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 6, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 5, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
January 5, 2015 Filing 347 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/5/2015; Motion Hearing held on 1/5/2015 re #309 MOTION in Limine by Defendants in Omnibus Format filed by County of Alameda; #340 MOTION to Continue Trial Based on Scheduling Conflict filed by County of Alameda; #305 MOTION in Limine in Omnibus Form Per Court Order filed by Martin Harrison, Jr., Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Joseph Harrison; denying #340 Motion to Continue. Court Reporter Name: Rhonda Aquilina. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/5/2015)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE re #309 MOTION in Limine by Defendants in Omnibus Format filed by County of Alameda, #305 MOTION in Limine in Omnibus Form Per Court Order filed by Martin Harrison, Jr., Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Joseph Harrison. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 2, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER RE JANUARY 5, 2015 PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCEThe parties are ordered to bring copies of the photographs that are the subject of the County Defendants' Motion in Limine Number Three to the pre-trial conference on January 5, 2015. (This order corrects an error in a prior order, which described the motion in question as Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine Number Three.)(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER RE JANUARY 5, 2015 PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCEThe parties are ordered to bring a copy of the photographs that are the subject of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Number Three to the pre-trial conference on January 5, 2015, so the Court can view them. (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE 17 AND CORIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE 1 re #309 MOTION in Limine by Defendants in Omnibus Format filed by County of Alameda; #317 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Martin Harrison, Jr., Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Joseph Harrison. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 1, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
December 31, 2014 Filing 342 RESPONSE to (re #340 MOTION to Continue Trial Based on Scheduling Conflict, Notice of Conflict & Request to be Heard at Pre-Trial Conference on 1/5/2015) filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 31, 2014 Filing 341 Declaration of William W. Drury in Support of #340 MOTION to Continue Trial Based on Scheduling Conflict, Notice of Conflict & Request to be Heard at Pre-Trial Conference on 1/5/2015 filed byCounty of Alameda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #340 ) (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 31, 2014 Filing 340 MOTION to Continue Trial Based on Scheduling Conflict, Notice of Conflict & Request to be Heard at Pre-Trial Conference on 1/5/2015 filed by County of Alameda. (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 26, 2014 Filing 339 Exhibit List by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr.. (Ho, Carol) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 26, 2014 Filing 338 Pretrial Conference Statement by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr Joint Statement. (Ho, Carol) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 26, 2014 Filing 337 Witness List by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. (Plaintiffs' Updated Witness List). (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 26, 2014 Filing 336 Joinder re #331 Objection by Zelda Sancho. (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 26, 2014 Filing 335 Joinder re #330 Witness List by Zelda Sancho. (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 26, 2014 Filing 334 Joinder re #329 Trial Brief by Zelda Sancho. (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 26, 2014 Filing 333 Proposed Jury Instructions by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. (Plaintiffs' Updated Jury Instructions). (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 24, 2014 Filing 332 OBJECTIONS to PLAINTIFFS' UPDATED OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' EXHIBITS by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 12/24/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 331 OBJECTIONS to re #327 Exhibit List by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 330 Witness List by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr . (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 329 TRIAL BRIEF by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 14, 2014 Filing 327 PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED Exhibit List filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr... (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 12/14/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 326 RESPONSE to (re #309 MOTION in Limine by Defendants in Omnibus Format); County Defendants in Opposition to Defendant Corizon and Orr's Motion in Limine #11 (Excluding One of County of Alameda's and Hast's Two Expert Forensic Pathologist filed by County of Alameda. (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 325 Declaration of Catherine Koss, Esq. in Support of #323 Declaration in Support of Defendant Alameda County's Motion in Limine Responsive to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine filed by County of Alameda. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A thru F, #(2) Exhibit G, #(3) Exhibit H thru L)(Related document(s) #323 ) (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 324 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by County of Alameda Re-Filing Declaration of Catherine Koss with Exhibits Attached Thereto (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 323 Declaration of Catherine Koss, Esq. in Support of Defendant Alameda County's Motion in Limine Responsive to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine filed by County of Alameda. (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 322 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Defendants Responsive Motion in Limine Responsive to Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion in Limine; --DECLARATION of Nancy E. Hudgins in Support of Defendants Dr. Orr and Corizon's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine- filed by County of Alameda. (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2014) ..Modified on 12/12/2014 (tnS).
December 10, 2014 Filing 321 AFFIDAVIT in Support re Defendants Motion in Limine Responsive to Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion in Limine; --Exhibit D to Declaration of Matthew M. Grigg in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Klatsky- filed byCounty of Alameda. (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2014)..Modified on 12/12/2014 (tnS).
December 10, 2014 Filing 320 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #319 MOTION in Limine; Responsive to Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion in Limine; -Declaration of Matthew M. Grigg in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine NO. 9 to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Klatsky filed by County of Alameda. (Related document(s) #319 ) (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 319 RESPONSE re Responsive to Plaintiffs Omnibus #305 Motion in Limine filed by County of Alameda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A thru F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H thru L)(Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2014) Modified on 12/29/2014 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2014 Filing 318 Declaration of Julia Sherwin in Support of #317 Opposition/Response to Motion In Support of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants Motions in Limine filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rogers Dep. Vol. 1, #2 Exhibit B - Rogers Dep. Vol. 2, #3 Exhibit C - Admitted UoF Table, #4 Exhibit D(1) - Autopsy Photos, #5 Exhibit D(2) - Autopsy Photos, #6 Exhibit E - Taser Training, #7 Exhibit F - Taser Warnings, #8 Exhibit G - Mooney Expert Reports, #9 Exhibit H - Mooney Dep., #10 Exhibit I - Gilbert Dep., #11 Exhibit J - Cert. of No Records, #12 Exhibit K - Wild Dep., #13 Exhibit L - Joseph Harrison Dep. Vol. 1, #14 Exhibit M - Joseph Harrison Dep. Vol. 2, #15 Exhibit N - Martin Harrison Dep. Vol. 2, #16 Exhibit O - DiMaio Dep., #17 Exhibit P - Schoenfeld Dep., #18 Exhibit Q - Gilbert PMK Dep., #19 Exhibit R - Klatsky Dep.)(Related document(s) #317 ) (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 317 RESPONSE to (re #309 MOTION in Limine by Defendants in Omnibus Format) filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 316 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING JURY TRIAL DATE. The Jury Trial previously scheduled to begin on 1/20/2015 is continued to 2/2/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. The pretrial conference remains set for 1/5/2015 at 9:30 AM. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 315 Declaration of Walker in Support of #314 Opposition/Response to Motion to File Under Seal filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Related document(s) #314 ) (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 28, 2014 Filing 314 RESPONSE to (re #313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal OR TO UNSEAL CORIZON FINANCIAL INFORMATION) filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Nancy Hudgins, #(2) Objections to Evidence, #(3) Proposed Order)(Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 11/28/2014)
November 23, 2014 Filing 313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal OR TO UNSEAL CORIZON FINANCIAL INFORMATION filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Julia Sherwin, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A, Corizon Financial Information, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit A, Corizon Financial Information, #4 Proposed Order)(Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 11/23/2014)
November 21, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #309 MOTION in Limine by Defendants in Omnibus Format. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 312 Declaration of Martha M. Stringer in Support of #309 MOTION in Limine by Defendants in Omnibus Format filed byCounty of Alameda. (Related document(s) #309 ) (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 311 Declaration of Matthew M. Grigg in Support of #309 MOTION in Limine by Defendants in Omnibus Format filed byCounty of Alameda. (Related document(s) #309 ) (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 310 Declaration in Support of #309 MOTION in Limine by Defendants in Omnibus Format by Nancy E. Hudgins filed byCounty of Alameda. (Related document(s) #309 ) (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 309 MOTION in Limine by Defendants in Omnibus Format filed by County of Alameda. Responses due by 12/5/2014. Replies due by 12/12/2014. (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 308 Declaration of Breana Montgomery in Support of #305 MOTION in Limine in Omnibus Form Per Court Order filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Chart of Corizon Revenue, #2 Exhibit B-1, Corizon contracts and revenue, #3 Exhibit B-2, Corizon contracts and revenue, #4 Exhibit B-3, Corizon contracts and revenue, #5 Exhibit B-4, Corizon contracts and revenue, #6 Exhibit B-5, Corizon contracts and revenue, #7 Exhibit B-6, Corizon contracts and revenue, #8 Exhibit B-7, Corizon contracts and revenue, #9 Exhibit C-1, Corizon website, #10 Exhibit C-2, Corizon website, #11 Exhibit C-3, Corizon website, #12 Exhibit C-4, Corizon website, #13 Exhibit C-5, Corizon website, #14 Exhibit C-6, Corizon website, #15 Exhibit C-7, Corizon website, #16 Exhibit C-8, Corizon website, #17 Exhibit C-9, Corizon website, #18 Exhibit C-10, Corizon website, #19 Exhibit C-11, Corizon website, #20 Exhibit C-12, Corizon website)(Related document(s) #305 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 307 Declaration of Julia Sherwin in Support of #305 MOTION in Limine in Omnibus Form Per Court Order filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Designated Confidential, to file under seal, #2 Exhibit B, Corizon Press Release, #3 Exhibit C, Sholey Declaration, #4 Exhibit D, Emails re: Joint Letter, #5 Exhibit E, Corizon Health and Inc Press Releases, #6 Exhibit F, Corizon 2012 to 2014 Corporate Reports, #7 Exhibit G, Corizon Trademark Logo, #8 Exhibit H, Corizon Executive Summary, #9 Exhibit I, Corizon 010312 Letter, #10 Exhibit J, Corizon 030712 Letter, #11 Exhibit K, Emails re: Trial in Oakland, #12 Exhibit L, Terri Granlund, RN, Dep, #13 Exhibit M, Sgt. Cynthia Sass Dep, #14 Exhibit N, Thomas Rogers, M.D. Dep, #15 Exhibit O, Krystle Harrison Dep Excerpts, #16 Exhibit P, Rosemarie Wingate Dep Excerpts, #17 Exhibit Q, PHS 2009 Financial Information)(Related document(s) #305 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 306 Declaration of Lois Heaney in Support of #305 MOTION in Limine in Omnibus Form Per Court Order IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY-CONDUCTED VOIR DIRE filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Related document(s) #305 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 305 MOTION in Limine in Omnibus Form Per Court Order filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2015 09:30 AM before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/10/2014. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 304 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Catherine Elizabeth Koss in place of Valerie Ly (Koss, Catherine) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
September 4, 2014 Filing 303 NOTICE by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL, AMENDED (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 4, 2014 Filing 302 NOTICE by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 7, 2014 Filing 301 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Sherwin AND ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL BY RICHARD H. FRIEDMAN (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 300 Proposed Voir Dire filed by Zelda Sancho; DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED ADDITIONAL QUESTIONS TO JOINT JURY QUESTIONNAIRE. (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 299 Proposed Voir Dire filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.; PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL JURY QUESTIONNAIRE. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 298 Proposed Voir Dire filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.; JOINT PROPOSED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 14, 2014 Filing 297 Terminating as moot #295 Motion for Reconsideration; terminating as moot #295 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Limited to Summary Judgment of Bane Act (Civil Code Section 52.1) Claim Against Defendant Megan Hast. (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 296 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part #121 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #133 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #134 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 295 MOTION for Reconsideration re #293 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment; [Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Limited to Summary Judgment of Bane Act (Civil Code Section 52.1) Claim against Defendant Megan Hast] filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER RE: TRIAL SCHEDULE, BIFURCATION, MOTIONS IN LIMINE, JURY QUESTIONNAIRE, AND JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 1/20/2015 - 3/5/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 9, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part #121 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #133 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #134 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 1, 2014 Filing 292 Transcript of Official Electronic Record of Proceedings held on 1/23/14, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Transcriber Carrie E. McKee-Parks, Telephone number 510-637-9897 email: McKee-Parks65@att.net. Tape Number: 2:53-3:50. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2014. (Related documents(s) #170 ) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER RE: LETTER BRIEF CONCERNING CORIZON DEFENDANTS' PRODUCTION OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION re #289 Letter Brief filed by Martin Harrison, Jr., Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Joseph Harrison. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 290 JOINT LETTER BRIEF RE: TRIAL DATE, TIME LIMITS, AND CORIZON DEFENDANTS' DESIRE TO CALL PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL AS TRIAL WITNESSES filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stringer vacation receipt)(Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 289 Letter Brief CONCERNING CORIZON DEFENDANTS' PRODUCTION OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 288 Amended Witness List filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. (AMENDED). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Deputy Brooks Report produced 2/26/14)(Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 6, 2014 Filing 287 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Zelda Sancho. (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 286 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 285 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 3/4/2014). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 284 TRIAL BRIEF filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Helm, Thomas) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER by Judge Tigar granting #281 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting #282 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 282 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8414662.) filed by County of Alameda. (Drury, William) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 281 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8414535.) filed by County of Alameda. (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 280 OBJECTIONS to re #225 Joinder, re #223 Joinder, re #224 Joinder; -PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS COUNTY'S AND SANCHO'S IMPROPER JOINDER IN OTHER DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE- filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Helm, Thomas) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 279 RESPONSE (re #181 Sixth MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF THE CORIZON AND COUNTY DEFENDANTS' EXPERT ARTHUR KLATSKY, M.D. ) Opposition filed byCorizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grigg, Exh. A-B)(Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 278 RESPONSE (re #180 Fifth MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT CORIZON'S EXPERT ROBERT D. JONES, M.D. ) Opposition filed byCorizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hudgins, Exhibits A-D, #2 Exhibit E-F)(Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 277 RESPONSE (re #184 Ninth MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, COMMENT, OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING ALLEGED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE BY DECEDENT MARTIN C. HARRISON AGAINST NON-PARTIES, AND OTHER PRIOR "BAD ACTS" ) Opposition filed byCorizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 276 Declaration of Julia Sherwin in Support of #275 Opposition/Response to Motion, OPPOSING COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 RE: KATHRYN BURNS, MD filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, 2011 Custody Staff Fact Sheet, #2 Exhibit B, Harold Orr, MD Deposition, #3 Exhibit C, NCCHC Standards, #4 Exhibit D, Defendant Deputies' Training Logs, #5 Exhibit E, ACSO Policy J-G-08, #6 Exhibit F, ACSO Policy 13.01, #7 Exhibit G, Terri Granlund, RN Deposition, #8 Exhibit H, ACSO Sergeant Cynthia Sass Deposition, #9 Exhibit I, Gales v Winco, #10 Exhibit J, Munoz v Giumarra Vineyards, #11 Exhibit K, Dynetix v Synopsis, #12 Exhibit L, County Defendants' Document Response Set Two, #13 Exhibit M, POST Learning Domain 12, #14 Exhibit N, Defendant Megan Hast Deposition, #15 Exhibit O, Kathryn Burns, MD, MPH Deposition, #16 Exhibit P, James Rael, MD Deposition)(Related document(s) #275 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 275 RESPONSE (re #201 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Argument by Counsel and Testimony by Expert Kathryn Burns, M.D. Regarding Medical Training to Deputies and Training to CJMH Staff ) filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 274 Declaration of Genevieve K. Guertin in Support of #262 Opposition/Response to Motion, #237 Opposition/Response to Motion, #252 Opposition/Response to Motion, #234 Opposition/Response to Motion, #260 Opposition/Response to Motion, #257 Opposition/Response to Motion, #229 Opposition/Response to Motion, #244 Opposition/Response to Motion, #226 Opposition/Response to Motion, #238 Opposition/Response to Motion, #249 Opposition/Response to Motion, #240 Opposition/Response to Motion, #254 Opposition/Response to Motion, #239 Opposition/Response to Motion, #227 Opposition/Response to Motion, #236 Opposition/Response to Motion, #267 Opposition/Response to Motion, #232 Opposition/Response to Motion, #265 Opposition/Response to Motion, #255 Opposition/Response to Motion, #241 Opposition/Response to Motion, #259 Opposition/Response to Motion, #231 Opposition/Response to Motion, #242 Opposition/Response to Motion, #228 Opposition/Response to Motion, #235 Opposition/Response to Motion, #263 Opposition/Response to Motion, #266 Opposition/Response to Motion, #245 Opposition/Response to Motion, #253 Opposition/Response to Motion, #250 Opposition/Response to Motion, #269 Opposition/Response to Motion, #230 Opposition/Response to Motion, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND DEFENDANT CORIZON'S MOTION FOR BIFURCATION filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47)(Related document(s) #262 , #237 , #252 , #234 , #260 , #257 , #229 , #244 , #226 , #238 , #249 , #240 , #254 , #239 , #227 , #236 , #267 , #232 , #265 , #255 , #241 , #259 , #231 , #242 , #228 , #235 , #263 , #266 , #245 , #253 , #250 , #269 , #230 ) (Helm, Thomas) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 273 Declaration of Michael M. Baden, M.D. in Support of #262 Opposition/Response to Motion, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #10 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #262 ) (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 272 EXHIBITS to re #251 Opposition/Response to Motion, #258 Opposition/Response to Motion, #264 Opposition/Response to Motion,, #261 Opposition/Response to Motion,, #256 Opposition/Response to Motion, #248 Opposition/Response to Motion, #270 Opposition/Response to Motion, #271 Declaration in Support,, #268 Opposition/Response to Motion,, (Exhibits A-C filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H-J, #4 Exhibit K-L)(Related document(s) #251 , #258 , #264 , #261 , #256 , #248 , #270 , #271 , #268 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 271 Declaration of Valerie Ly in Support of #251 Opposition/Response to Motion, #258 Opposition/Response to Motion, #264 Opposition/Response to Motion,, #261 Opposition/Response to Motion,, #256 Opposition/Response to Motion, #268 Opposition/Response to Motion,, #248 Opposition/Response to Motion, #270 Opposition/Response to Motion, Oppositions to Motions in Limine filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Related document(s) #251 , #258 , #264 , #261 , #256 , #268 , #248 , #270 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 270 RESPONSE (re #185 Tenth MOTION in Limine FOR LEAVE FOR ATTORNEY-CONDUCTED VOIR DIRE AND PERMISSION TO USE JURY QUESTIONNAIRE ) to Plaintiffs' Tenth Motion in Limine Regarding Trial Time and Peremptory Challenges filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 269 RESPONSE (re #205 MOTION in Limine No. 16 to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Schoenfeld Regarding the Cause of Death ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #16 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 268 RESPONSE (re #184 Ninth MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, COMMENT, OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING ALLEGED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE BY DECEDENT MARTIN C. HARRISON AGAINST NON-PARTIES, AND OTHER PRIOR "BAD ACTS" ) to Plaintiffs' Ninth Motion in Limine Regarding Allegations of Decedent's Domestic Abuse or Prior Criminal Behavior filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 267 RESPONSE (re #204 MOTION in Limine No. 15 to Exclude Questions Regarding Mere Possibilty of Experts ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #15 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 266 RESPONSE (re #203 MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Exclude Questioning County Defendants' Expert James Rael, M.D. Regarding Medical Care ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #14 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 265 RESPONSE (re #202 MOTION in Limine No, 13 to Limit Testimony Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Larissa J. Mooney, M.D. ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #13 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 264 RESPONSE (re #183 Eighth MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, OR COMMENT FROM DEFENDANTS OR THEIR EXPERTS CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT MICHAEL BADEN'S DEMOTION AND SUBSEQUENT REINSTATEMENT LITIGATION WHILE HE WAS EMPLOYED BY THE NEW YORK CITY M ) to Plaintiffs' Eighth Motion in Limine Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Baden's Qualifications filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 263 RESPONSE (re #200 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Limit Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert John "Jack" Ryan ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #11 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 262 RESPONSE (re #199 Tenth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion by Dr. Baden Regarding Taser as Cause of Death ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #10 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 261 RESPONSE (re #182 Seventh MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, OR COMMENT FROM DEFENDANTS OR THEIR EXPERTS CONCERNING ALLEGED MISCONDUCT BY PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT JACK RYAN WHILE HE WAS EMPLOYED BY THE PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT ) to Plaintiffs' Seventh Motion in Limine Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Ryan's Qualifications filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 260 RESPONSE (re #198 Ninth MOTION in Limine Excluding Cross-Examination of Dr. Wetli Regarding Dade County Autopsies ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #9 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 259 RESPONSE (re #197 Eighth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Dr. Baden's Prior Cases ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #8 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 258 RESPONSE (re #179 Fourth MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT CHARLES V. WETLI, M.D. ) to Plaintiff's Fourth Motion in Limine to Limit Testimony of Charles V. Wetli, M.D. filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 257 RESPONSE (re #196 Seventh MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Expert's Prior Cases ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #7 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 256 RESPONSE (re #178 Third MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT VINCENT J.M. DIMAIO, M.D. ) to Plaintiffs' Third Motion in Limine to Limit Testimony of Vincent J. J. Di Maio, M.D. filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Andrada, J.) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 255 RESPONSE (re #195 Sixth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Speculation by Sergeant Dudek ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #6 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 254 RESPONSE (re #194 Fifth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Reference to Deputy Unubun's Performance at Academy, Grievances, and Investigation ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #5 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 253 RESPONSE (re #193 Fourth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Deputy Martinez' Taser Certification ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #4 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 252 RESPONSE (re #192 Third MOTION in Limine to Exclude Autopsy Photographs ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #3 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 251 RESPONSE (re #177 Second MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT ROBERT FONZI ) to Plaintiffs' Second Motion in Limine to Limit Testimony of Robert Fonzi filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 250 RESPONSE (re #191 Second MOTION in Limine to Exclude Inflammatory Language Regarding Use of Force ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #2 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 249 RESPONSE (re #190 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Reference to Code of Silence ) TO COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #1 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 248 RESPONSE (re #176 First MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT RON MARTINELLI ) to Plaintifffs' First Motion in Limine to Limit Testimony of Ron Martinelli, Ph.D. filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 247 RESPONSE (re #205 MOTION in Limine No. 16 to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Schoenfeld Regarding the Cause of Death ) filed byZelda Sancho. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martha M. Stringer, #2 Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Martha M. Stringer)(Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 246 RESPONSE (re #211 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions ) to Defendant Corizon and Orr's Motion in Limine #2 (Excluding One of the County's Forensic Pathologists from Testifying) filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 245 RESPONSE (re #210 MOTION to Bifurcate ) TO CORIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR BIFURCATION filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 244 RESPONSE (re #211 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions); RESPONSE TO CORIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #9 filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Helm, Thomas) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 243 RESPONSE (re #187 MOTION in Limine #'s 1-9 ) TO DEFENDANT SANCHO'S MOTION IN LIMINE #9 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 242 RESPONSE (re #187 MOTION in Limine #'s 1-9 ) TO DEFENDANT SANCHO'S MOTION IN LIMINE #8 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 241 RESPONSE (re #187 MOTION in Limine #'s 1-9 ) TO DEFENDANT SANCHO'S MOTION IN LIMINE #7 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 240 RESPONSE (re #211 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions); RESPONSE TO CORIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #8 filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Helm, Thomas) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 239 RESPONSE (re #187 MOTION in Limine #'s 1-9 ) TO DEFENDANT SANCHO'S MOTION IN LIMINE #6 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 238 RESPONSE (re #187 MOTION in Limine #'s 1-9 ) TO DEFENDANT SANCHO'S MOTION IN LIMINE #5 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 237 RESPONSE (re #211 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions ) RESPONSE TO CORIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #7 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Helm, Thomas) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 236 RESPONSE (re #187 MOTION in Limine #'s 1-9 ) TO DEFENDANT SANCHO'S MOTION IN LIMINE #4 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 235 RESPONSE (re #211 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions); RESPONSE TO CORIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #6 filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Helm, Thomas) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 234 RESPONSE (re #187 MOTION in Limine #'s 1-9 ) TO DEFENDANT SANCHO'S MOTION IN LIMINE #3 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 233 RESPONSE (re #180 Fifth MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT CORIZON'S EXPERT ROBERT D. JONES, M.D., #176 First MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT RON MARTINELLI, #181 Sixth MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF THE CORIZON AND COUNTY DEFENDANTS' EXPERT ARTHUR KLATSKY, M.D. ) filed byZelda Sancho. (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 232 RESPONSE (re #187 MOTION in Limine #'s 1-9 ) TO DEFENDANT SANCHO'S MOTION IN LIMINE #2 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 231 RESPONSE (re #187 MOTION in Limine #'s 1-9 ) TO DEFENDANT SANCHO'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 230 RESPONSE (re #211 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions ) IN OPPOSITION TO CORIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #5 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Helm, Thomas) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 229 RESPONSE (re #211 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions ) IN OPPOSITION TO CORIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #4 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Helm, Thomas) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 228 RESPONSE (re #211 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions ) IN OPPOSITION TO CORIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #3 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Helm, Thomas) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 227 RESPONSE (re #211 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions ) IN OPPOSITION TO CORIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #2 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Helm, Thomas) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 226 RESPONSE (re #211 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions ) IN OPPOSITION TO CORIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #1 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Helm, Thomas) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 225 Joinder in re #197 Eighth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Dr. Baden's Prior Cases, re #204 MOTION in Limine No. 15 to Exclude Questions Regarding Mere Possibilty of Experts, re #192 Third MOTION in Limine to Exclude Autopsy Photographs, re #196 Seventh MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Expert's Prior Cases, re #202 MOTION in Limine No, 13 to Limit Testimony Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Larissa J. Mooney, M.D. filed by Zelda Sancho. (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 224 Joinder in re #211 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions #2, #3, #4, and #8 filed by Zelda Sancho. (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 223 Notice of Joinder & Joinder in re #187 MOTION in Limine #'s 1-9, re #212 Declaration in Support, re #213 MOTION in Limine #3 (disregard Docket No. 211-3), re #211 MOTION in Limine; Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 222 Proposed Special Verdict Form filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr , et al.. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 221 TRIAL BRIEF filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 220 Proposed Jury Instructions & Further Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Instructions filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr , et al.. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 219 Proposed Jury Questionnaire filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 218 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr , Zelda Sancho, County of Alameda, Gregory J. Ahern, Matthew Ahlf, Alejandro Valverde, Joshua Swetnam, Roberto Martinez, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Michael Bareno, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Solomon Unubun, and Megan Hast, A.S.W.. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 217 Proposed Joint Jury Questionnaire filed by Zelda Sancho (JOINT). (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 216 Proposed Voir Dire filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. . (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 215 Proposed Verdict Form filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. . (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 214 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. . (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 213 MOTION in Limine #3 (disregard Docket No. 211-3) filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. Replies due by 3/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hudgins re MIL#3, #2 Declaration of Grigg re MIL#3, #3 Exhibit A (1 of 3), #4 Exhibit A (2 of 3), #5 Exhibit A (3 of 3), #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C)(Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 212 Declaration of Nancy E. Hudgins in Support of re #211 MOTION in Limine Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions MIL #7 and Exhibit A to MIL #7 filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Related document(s) #211 ) (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 22, 2014 Filing 211 MOTION in Limine; Notice of Motions in Limine and Motions filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/7/2014. Replies due by 3/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 MIL #1, #2 MIL #2, #3 MIL #3, #4 MIL #4, #5 MIL #5, #6 MIL #6, #7 MIL #7, #8 MIL #8, #9 MIL #9)(Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Bifurcation of Trial filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/1/2014. Replies due by 3/10/2014. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 209 Witness List re #188 Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde . (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 208 County Defendants' Exhibit List re #188 Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde.. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 207 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List re #188 Joint Pretrial Statement- filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 206 Declaration of Valerie Ly in Support of #205 MOTION in Limine No. 16 to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Schoenfeld Regarding the Cause of Death, #204 MOTION in Limine No. 15 to Exclude Questions Regarding Mere Possibilty of Experts, #194 Fifth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Reference to Deputy Unubun's Performance at Academy, Grievances, and Investigation, #195 Sixth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Speculation by Sergeant Dudek, #198 Ninth MOTION in Limine Excluding Cross-Examination of Dr. Wetli Regarding Dade County Autopsies, #203 MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Exclude Questioning County Defendants' Expert James Rael, M.D. Regarding Medical Care, #202 MOTION in Limine No, 13 to Limit Testimony Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Larissa J. Mooney, M.D., #200 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Limit Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert John "Jack" Ryan, #197 Eighth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Dr. Baden's Prior Cases, #190 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Reference to Code of Silence, #199 Tenth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion by Dr. Baden Regarding Taser as Cause of Death, #191 Second MOTION in Limine to Exclude Inflammatory Language Regarding Use of Force, #201 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Argument by Counsel and Testimony by Expert Kathryn Burns, M.D. Regarding Medical Training to Deputies and Training to CJMH Staff, #192 Third MOTION in Limine to Exclude Autopsy Photographs, #196 Seventh MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Expert's Prior Cases filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-F, #3 Exhibit G-L, #4 Exhibit M, #5 Exhibit N-R, #6 Exhibit S-U, #7 Exhibit V-W, #8 Exhibit X, #9 Exhibit Y)(Related document(s) #205 , #204 , #194 , #195 , #198 , #203 , #202 , #200 , #197 , #190 , #199 , #191 , #201 , #192 , #196 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 205 MOTION in Limine No. 16 to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Schoenfeld Regarding the Cause of Death filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 204 MOTION in Limine No. 15 to Exclude Questions Regarding Mere Possibilty of Experts filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 203 MOTION in Limine No. 14 to Exclude Questioning County Defendants' Expert James Rael, M.D. Regarding Medical Care filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 202 MOTION in Limine No, 13 to Limit Testimony Regarding Plaintiffs' Expert Larissa J. Mooney, M.D. filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 201 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Argument by Counsel and Testimony by Expert Kathryn Burns, M.D. Regarding Medical Training to Deputies and Training to CJMH Staff filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 200 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Limit Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert John "Jack" Ryan filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 199 Tenth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion by Dr. Baden Regarding Taser as Cause of Death filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 198 Ninth MOTION in Limine Excluding Cross-Examination of Dr. Wetli Regarding Dade County Autopsies filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 197 Eighth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Dr. Baden's Prior Cases filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 196 Seventh MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Expert's Prior Cases filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 195 Sixth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Speculation by Sergeant Dudek filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 194 Fifth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Reference to Deputy Unubun's Performance at Academy, Grievances, and Investigation filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 193 Fourth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Deputy Martinez' Taser Certification filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 192 Third MOTION in Limine to Exclude Autopsy Photographs filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 191 Second MOTION in Limine to Exclude Inflammatory Language Regarding Use of Force filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 190 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Reference to Code of Silence filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 189 Declaration of T. Kennedy Helm in Support of #179 Fourth MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT CHARLES V. WETLI, M.D., #180 Fifth MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT CORIZON'S EXPERT ROBERT D. JONES, M.D., #178 Third MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT VINCENT J.M. DIMAIO, M.D., #183 Eighth MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, OR COMMENT FROM DEFENDANTS OR THEIR EXPERTS CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT MICHAEL BADEN'S DEMOTION AND SUBSEQUENT REINSTATEMENT LITIGATION WHILE HE WAS EMPLOYED BY THE NEW YORK CITY M, #182 Seventh MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, OR COMMENT FROM DEFENDANTS OR THEIR EXPERTS CONCERNING ALLEGED MISCONDUCT BY PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT JACK RYAN WHILE HE WAS EMPLOYED BY THE PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT, #184 Ninth MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, COMMENT, OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING ALLEGED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE BY DECEDENT MARTIN C. HARRISON AGAINST NON-PARTIES, AND OTHER PRIOR "BAD ACTS", #185 Tenth MOTION in Limine FOR LEAVE FOR ATTORNEY-CONDUCTED VOIR DIRE AND PERMISSION TO USE JURY QUESTIONNAIRE, #176 First MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT RON MARTINELLI, #177 Second MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT ROBERT FONZI, #181 Sixth MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF THE CORIZON AND COUNTY DEFENDANTS' EXPERT ARTHUR KLATSKY, M.D. filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B(1), #3 Exhibit B(2), #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H(1), #10 Exhibit H(2), #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V)(Related document(s) #179 , #180 , #178 , #183 , #182 , #184 , #185 , #176 , #177 , #181 ) (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 188 Pretrial Conference Statement by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. JOINT. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, #2 Appendix 2 Plaintiffs' Objections to Defs' Exhibits, #3 Appendix 3 Plaintiffs' Witness List, #4 Appendix 4 Corizon Defs' Exhibit List, #5 Appendix 5 Corizon Defs' Objections to Exhibits, #6 Appendix 6 Corizon Defs' Witness List, #7 Appendix 7 Def Sancho's Exhibit List, #8 Appendix 8 Def Sancho's Objections to Exhibits, #9 Appendix 9 Def Sancho's Witness List)(Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 187 MOTION in Limine #'s 1-9 filed by Zelda Sancho. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Attachments: #1 Motions in Limine #'s 1-9)(Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 186 Joint MOTION in Limine regarding Jury Questionnaire filed by Zelda Sancho. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 185 Tenth MOTION in Limine FOR LEAVE FOR ATTORNEY-CONDUCTED VOIR DIRE AND PERMISSION TO USE JURY QUESTIONNAIRE filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 184 Ninth MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, COMMENT, OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING ALLEGED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE BY DECEDENT MARTIN C. HARRISON AGAINST NON-PARTIES, AND OTHER PRIOR "BAD ACTS" filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 183 Eighth MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, OR COMMENT FROM DEFENDANTS OR THEIR EXPERTS CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT MICHAEL BADEN'S DEMOTION AND SUBSEQUENT REINSTATEMENT LITIGATION WHILE HE WAS EMPLOYED BY THE NEW YORK CITY MEDICAL EXAMINER'S OFFICE filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 182 Seventh MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, OR COMMENT FROM DEFENDANTS OR THEIR EXPERTS CONCERNING ALLEGED MISCONDUCT BY PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT JACK RYAN WHILE HE WAS EMPLOYED BY THE PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 181 Sixth MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF THE CORIZON AND COUNTY DEFENDANTS' EXPERT ARTHUR KLATSKY, M.D. filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 180 Fifth MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT CORIZON'S EXPERT ROBERT D. JONES, M.D. filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 179 Fourth MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT CHARLES V. WETLI, M.D. filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 178 Third MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT VINCENT J.M. DIMAIO, M.D. filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 177 Second MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT ROBERT FONZI filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 176 First MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT COUNTY'S EXPERT RON MARTINELLI filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 175 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 14, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Sherwin AND SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #171 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amending Case Management Order to Extend Expert Discovery Cutoff filed by Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Alejandro Valverde, M. Alhf, Megan Hast, County of Alameda, Ryan Madigan, Michael Bareno, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Shawn Sobrero, Gregory J. Ahern. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
January 31, 2014 Filing 171 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Amending Case Management Order to Extend Expert Discovery Cutoff filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 170 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Andrada, J.) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 169 ** FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD ** TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Andrada, J.) (Filed on 1/28/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2014 Filing 168 Minute Entry: Motion Hearings held on 1/23/2014 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 1/23/2014) re #134 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment filed by Harold Orr, Corizon Health Inc, #133 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Zelda Sancho, #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS filed by Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Alejandro Valverde, M. Alhf, Megan Hast, County of Alameda, Ryan Madigan, Michael Bareno, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Shawn Sobrero, Gregory J. Ahern. (FTR recording: 2:53-3:50 p.m.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/23/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 167 DECLARATION of Genevieve K. Guertin in Opposition to #161 Reply to Opposition/Response; Declaration of Genevieve K. Guertin Regarding Authentication of Evidence filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Ex.A(1), #(2) Exhibit Ex.A(2), #(3) Exhibit Ex.A(3), #(4) Exhibit Ex. B, #(5) Exhibit Ex. C, #(6) Exhibit Ex. D)(Related document(s) #161 ) (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 166 Declaration in Support of #165 Objection to Defendant Sancho's Request for Judicial Notice filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B)(Related document(s) #165 ) (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 165 OBJECTIONS to re #161 Reply to Opposition/Response, Defendant Sancho's Request for Judicial Notice by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 14, 2014 Filing 164 OBJECTIONS to re #161 Reply to Opposition/Response, re #159 Reply to Opposition/Response re #163 Reply to Opposition/Response; Objections to All Defendants' Replies to All Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 163 REPLY (re #134 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byCorizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Attachments: #1 Dr. Orr and Corizon's Objections to Evidence)(Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting #160 Stipulation for extra pages. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 1/10/2014) Modified on 1/13/2014 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2014 Filing 161 REPLY (re #133 First MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Zelda Sancho. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence, #2 Declaration of Stringer, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 160 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Re Extra Pages for Reply Brief filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 159 REPLY (re #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS ) to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of Claims; and Objection to Evidence filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Valerie Ly, #2 Exhibit Q-R to Declaration of Valerie Ly, #3 Exhibit S-T to Declaration of Valerie Ly, #4 Exhibit U-V to Declaration of Valerie Ly, #5 Exhibit W-X to Declaration of Valerie Ly, #6 Exhibit Y-Z to Declaration of Valerie Ly)(Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 8, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Correcting docketing error from 12/19/2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
December 20, 2013 Filing 158 Declaration of Genevieve K. Guertin in Support of #146 Opposition/Response to Motion, #157 Declaration in Support,,,, #147 Opposition/Response to Motion, #150 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 64)(Related document(s) #146 , #157 , #147 , #150 ) (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 157 Declaration of Julia Sherwin in Support of #147 Opposition/Response to Motion, #146 Opposition/Response to Motion, #150 Opposition/Response to Motion, Vol. 2, with Exhibits 51-88 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51, #2 Exhibit 52, #3 Exhibit 53, #4 Exhibit 54, #5 Exhibit 55, #6 Exhibit 56, #7 Exhibit 57, #8 Exhibit 58, #9 Exhibit 59, #10 Exhibit 60, #11 Exhibit 61, #12 Exhibit 62, #13 Exhibit 63, #14 Exhibit 64, #15 Exhibit 65, #16 Exhibit 66, #17 Exhibit 67, #18 Exhibit 68, #19 Exhibit 69, #20 Exhibit 70, #21 Exhibit 71, #22 Exhibit 72, #23 Exhibit 73, #24 Exhibit 74, #25 Exhibit 75, #26 Exhibit 76, #27 Exhibit 77, #28 Exhibit 78, #29 Exhibit 79, #30 Exhibit 80, #31 Exhibit 81, #32 Exhibit 82, #33 Exhibit 83, #34 Exhibit 84, #35 Exhibit 85, #36 Exhibit 86, #37 Exhibit 87, #38 Exhibit 88)(Related document(s) #147 , #146 , #150 ) (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 156 Declaration of John J. Ryan in Support of #146 Opposition/Response to Motion, #147 Opposition/Response to Motion, #150 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Related document(s) #146 , #147 , #150 ) (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 155 Declaration of M. Patricia Fisher in Support of #146 Opposition/Response to Motion, #147 Opposition/Response to Motion, #150 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #146 , #147 , #150 ) (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 154 Declaration of Kathryn Burns, M.D. in Support of #146 Opposition/Response to Motion, #147 Opposition/Response to Motion, #150 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #146 , #147 , #150 ) (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 153 Declaration of Julia Sherwin in Support of #147 Opposition/Response to Motion, #146 Opposition/Response to Motion, #150 Opposition/Response to Motion, CORRECTED, Vol. 1 with Exhibits 1-50 (PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET NO. 149) filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50)(Related document(s) #147 , #146 , #150 ) (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 152 Declaration of Michael Baden, M.D. in Support of #146 Opposition/Response to Motion, #147 Opposition/Response to Motion, #150 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #146 , #147 , #150 ) (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 151 Declaration of Gina Altomare in Support of #146 Opposition/Response to Motion, #147 Opposition/Response to Motion, #150 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #146 , #147 , #150 ) (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 150 RESPONSE (re #134 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment ) WITH CORRECTED CAPTION, PLEASE DISREGARD DOC. 148 filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 149 Declaration of Julia Sherwin in Support of #147 Opposition/Response to Motion, #148 Opposition/Response to Motion, #146 Opposition/Response to Motion In Support of Plaintiffs' Responses in Opposition to All Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment/Adjudication filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Related document(s) #147 , #148 , #146 ) (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 148 RESPONSE (re #134 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 147 RESPONSE (re #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS ) filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 146 RESPONSE (re #133 First MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting #144 Stipulation.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 144 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PAGE LIMIT FOR PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MSJ FILED BY DEFENDANTS CORIZON AND ORR filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference Statement due by 2/21/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part #142 Stipulation.The Court GRANTS the parties' request to confirm the trial date and move the pretrial conference. However, the Court is unable to accommodate the parties' requested date for the pretrial conference. Consequently, the Court amends the case schedule as follows:Pretrial Conference Statement Due: February 21, 2014Pretrial Conference: March 3, 2014, at 9:00 a.m.Trial: March 10, 2014, at 8:30 a.m.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 142 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Clarifying Case Schedule filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Tigar striking #138 Ex Parte Application ; striking #139 Discovery Letter Brief as improperly filed.The parties are directed to consult the Court's Standing Order For All Civil Cases, available at cand.uscourts.gov/jstorders. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 140 Declaration of Michael J. Haddad in Support of #139 First Discovery Letter Brief In Opposition to Defendant Sancho's "Ex Parte Application" filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Emails Between Counsel, #2 Exhibit B, Notice of Deposition)(Related document(s) #139 ) (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 139 First Discovery Letter Brief In Opposition to Defendant Sancho's "Ex Parte Application" filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 138 First Ex Parte Application to Postpone Deposition of Schoenfeld filed by Zelda Sancho. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Stringer)(Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED AMENDED PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDERThe Court is in receipt of attorney Michael J. Haddad's e-mail message dated December 11, 2013 and now orders as follows: (1) The parties will meet and confer regarding a suitable amended pretrial and trial scheduling order; (2) Defendants will provide a written draft amended order to Plaintiffs by 5:00 p.m., December 13, 2013; (3) Plaintiffs will either agree to Defendants' proposal, or provide a written counter-proposal by 5:00 p.m., December 16, 2013; and (4) by 5:00 p.m., December 17, 2013, either Defendants will submit a stipulated request for entry of an amended order to the Court, or the parties will submit their competing proposed orders. Either party may also, but is not required to, submit a letter brief in support of its proposed order. Such briefs must be not longer than two, single-spaced pages and must be filed by 5:00 p.m. on December 17. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar)(Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting #135 Stipulation.Upon stipulation of the parties, the Court hereby continues the expert discovery cutoff from January 20, 2014 to February 10, 2014. This Order does not alter the remaining deadlines in the case, including pretrial and trial deadlines, which remain in effect.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 135 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TO CONTINUE EXPERT DISCOVERY CUTOFF filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 2, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to re #134 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Motion noticed for incorrect date. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 29, 2013 Filing 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/13/2013. Replies due by 12/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harold Orr, M.D., #2 Declaration of Sylvia Schwartz, #3 Declaration of Lenore Gilbert, #4 Declaration of Matthew M. Grigg, #5 Declaration of Criselda Imperio, R.N., #6 Declaration of Anna Blyakherova, L.V.N., #7 Declaration of Robert Jones, M.D.)(Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 11/29/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 133 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Zelda Sancho. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/20/2013. Replies due by 1/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sancho, #2 Declaration of Schoenfeld, #3 Declaration of Wild, #4 Declaration of Stringer, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Judgment)(Stringer, Martha) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 132 [Proposed] Order Granting re #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 131 EXHIBITS re #125 Declaration in Support, filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O, #2 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) #125 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 130 EXHIBITS re #125 Declaration in Support, filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) #125 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 129 EXHIBITS re #125 Declaration in Support, filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) #125 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 128 EXHIBITS re #125 Declaration in Support, filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #125 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 127 EXHIBITS re #125 Declaration in Support, filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #125 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 126 EXHIBITS re #125 Declaration in Support, filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #125 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 125 Declaration of Valerie Ly in Support of #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #121 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 26, 2013 Filing 124 EXHIBITS to re #123 Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, for Summary Adjudication of Claims; EXHIBIT B TO DECLARATION OF CHARLES WETLI, M.D. filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Related document(s) #123 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Filing 123 Declaration of Charles Wetli in Support of #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Charles Wetli, M.D.)(Related document(s) #121 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Filing 122 Declaration of Vincent Di Maio, M.D. in Support of #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Vincent Di Maio, M.D., #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Vincent Di Maio, M.D.)(Related document(s) #121 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Summary Judgment OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CLAIMS; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/10/2013. Replies due by 12/17/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deputy Matthew Ahlf, #2 Declaration of Megan Hast, #3 Declaration of James Rael, M.D., #4 Exhibit A-B to Declaration of James Rael, M.D.)(Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 20, 2013 Filing 120 NOTICE by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. of Unavailability of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 15, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion due by 11/29/2013. Responses due by 12/20/2013. Replies due by 1/10/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting #118 Stipulation.The County Defendants may file a single motion for summary judgment not to exceed fifty pages. Plaintiffs' opposition may not exceed fifty pages. The briefing schedule is as follows:Motion filing deadline: Nov. 29, 2013Opposition deadline: Dec. 20, 2013Reply deadline: Jan. 10, 2014Motion Hearing: Jan. 23, 2014(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 13, 2013 Filing 118 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ALL DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
November 7, 2013 Filing 117 STIPULATION Dismissing Plaintiffs' Claims Against Sheriff Ahern, Individually filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting #114 Stipulation re: 30(b)(6) Deposition. This Order does not affect any other case deadlines.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 10, 2013 Filing 115 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel and [PROPOSED] Order filed by Kathleen Jane Williams (Williams, Kathleen) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 114 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: DEPOSITION OF CORIZON F.R.CIV.P. 30(B)(6) WITNESS AND DISCOVERY CONCERNING CORIZON FINANCIAL CONDITION filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting #110 Stipulation re: deposition scheduling.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 8, 2013 Filing 112 EXHIBIT A OF AMENDED PETITION APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND APPROVING MINORS COMPROMISE - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALED filed by M.H.. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 8, 2013 Filing 111 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #109 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem,, Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed by M.H.. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 8, 2013 Filing 110 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITIONS OF FORMER CORIZON EMPLOYEES filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM, APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE, AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying in part #103 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #105 Motion to Appoint ad litem ad Litem. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR FURTHER DEPOSITION DISCOVERY by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part #106 Discovery Letter Brief. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar terminating #107 Discovery Letter Brief.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 107 First Discovery Letter Brief filed by County of Alameda, Harold Orr, Zelda Sancho. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 106 First Discovery Letter Brief with Exhibits A through E, re: Depositions Currently Noticed for October 2 and 7-9, 2013 filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 18, 2013 Filing 105 Amended MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem and Approving Minor's Compromise and (Proposed) Order filed by M.H.. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 104 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem and Approving Minor's Compromise and (Proposed) Order filed by M.H.. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 103 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A of the Petition Appointing Guardian Ad Litem and Approving Minor's Compromise filed by M.H.. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar terminating #90 Discovery Letter Brief.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND DISPUTED DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Fact Discovery due by 10/11/2013. Expert Disclosure due by 11/15/2013. Expert Rebuttal due by 12/13/2013. Expert Discovery due by 1/20/2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE filed by M.H.; MINOR PLAINTIFF M.H.S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 99 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/30/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 8/30/2013). (Court Reporter: Not reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 98 Letter Brief filed byCorizon Health Inc, Harold Orr, Zelda Sancho. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 97 Letter Brief re #92 Exhibits, re #91 Exhibits, re #95 Exhibits, re #94 Exhibits, re #93 Exhibits, re #90 First Discovery Letter Brief RE: FORENSIC DOCUMENT EXAMINATION filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Related document(s) #92 , #91 , #95 , #94 , #93 , #90 ) (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 96 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/28/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 8/28/2013). (Court Reporter: Not reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/28/2013)
August 28, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 95 EXHIBITS to re #90 First Discovery Letter Brief RE: FORENSIC DOCUMENT EXAMINATION, (Exhibit E, Pertinent Emails) filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Related document(s) #90 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 94 EXHIBITS to re #90 First Discovery Letter Brief RE: FORENSIC DOCUMENT EXAMINATION, (Exhibit D, 8/16/13 Second Notice of Inspection) filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Related document(s) #90 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 93 EXHIBITS to re #90 First Discovery Letter Brief RE: FORENSIC DOCUMENT EXAMINATION, (Exhibit C, 9/24/12 Alameda County's Response to Notice of Inspection) filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Related document(s) #90 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 92 EXHIBITS to re #90 First Discovery Letter Brief RE: FORENSIC DOCUMENT EXAMINATION, (Exhibit B, 8/24/12 Notice of Inspection) filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Related document(s) #90 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 91 EXHIBITS to re #90 First Discovery Letter Brief RE: FORENSIC DOCUMENT EXAMINATION, (Exhibit A, Medical Chart Note) filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Related document(s) #90 ) (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 90 First Discovery Letter Brief RE: FORENSIC DOCUMENT EXAMINATION filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 89 Minute Entry: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 8/27/2013 before Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 8/27/2013). (Court Reporter: Not reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/27/2013)
August 16, 2013 Filing 88 UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, UPDATE filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CORRECTED ORDER re #85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER.The Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference ECF. 85, is GRANTED. The Conference currently scheduled for August 14, 2013 is continued to August 28, 2013. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Case Management Statement by August 16, 2013.The parties' attention is directed to the difference between the conference and statement filing dates in their stipulation and Court's Order. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 1, 2013. This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 27, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 26, 2013 Filing 86 This entry removed by order of the court. See docket #87. Modified on 7/1/2013 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2013 Filing 85 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 19, 2013 Filing 84 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held, case did not settle. (Date Filed: 6/19/2013). (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 83 Corrected Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/15/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 5/15/2013). Corrected case caption. (Court Reporter: Not reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SCHEDULING ORDER. Fact Discovery due by 9/6/2013. Expert Disclosures due by 10/11/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2013. Pretrial Conference Statement due by 2/18/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 3/10/2014 - 3/24/2014 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 15, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 81 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #83 *** Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/15/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 5/15/2013). (Court Reporter: Not reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/15/2013 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2013 Filing 80 UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting re #78 Stipulation to continue Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 8, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #79 Order on Stipulation Settlement Conference set for 6/19/2013 10:00 AM. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 3, 2013 Filing 78 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 77 STIPULATION RE: PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITIONS OF CORIZON DEFENDANTS, EMPLOYEES, AGENTS, AND PERSONS MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying re #50 Motion to Dismiss; denying re #63 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 11, 2013 Filing 75 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/11/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 4/11/2013) re #63 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Zelda Sancho, Harold Orr, Corizon Health Inc. (Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/11/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 74 OBJECTIONS to re #68 Reply to Opposition/Response Containing New Evidence and Argument; Surreply in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Harold Orr, M.D., Corizon Health, Inc., and Zelda Sancho, L.V.N. by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting re #72 Stipulation to reset case management conference to May 15, 2013, at 2:00 p.m.. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 20, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. of Unavailability of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 18, 2013 Filing 70 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 69 Request for Judicial Notice re #68 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byCorizon Health Inc, Harold Orr, Zelda Sancho. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 68 REPLY (re #63 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCorizon Health Inc, Harold Orr, Zelda Sancho. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 7, 2013 Filing 67 RESPONSE (re #63 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #64 Stipulation to continue settlement conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 28, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #66 Order on Stipulation Settlement Conference set for 5/20/2013 02:00 PM, in chambers. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 27, 2013 Filing 65 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 26, 2013 Filing 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 21, 2013 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr, Zelda Sancho. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/7/2013. Replies due by 3/14/2013. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 2/11/2013. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 61 Plaintiff M.H.'s Joinder in Plaintiff's Joseph Harrison's, et al. Opposition to Defendant Dr. Orr and Corizon Health Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by M.H.. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/31/2013) Modified on 2/1/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2013 Filing 60 RESPONSE (re #50 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 30, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve Kathryn Guertin (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #57 Stipulation Requesting Setting of Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 24, 2013 Filing 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Setting of Case Management Conference filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr., M.H., County of Alameda, et al . (Guertin, Genevieve) (Filed on 1/24/2013) Modified on 1/25/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2013 Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM. See #58 Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 56 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 22, 2011, before Judge Wilken. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, Telephone number (530)941-2621; sgoekler.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2013. (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL (Andrada, J.) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 3, 2013 Filing 54 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/11/2013 02:00 PM. in Chambers. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 28, 2012 Reset Deadlines/Hearing as to #50 MOTION to Dismiss : Responses due by 1/31/2013. Replies due by 2/14/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. See Docket No. 53. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order granting #51 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 20, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. of Unavailability of Counsel (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 20, 2012 Filing 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continuing Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule re #50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr., M.H., Harold Orr, Corizon Health Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Haddad in support)(Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 12/20/2012) Modified on 12/21/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2012 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Corizon Health Inc, Harold Orr. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 1/2/2013. Replies due by 1/9/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF MATTHEW M. GRIGG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS)(Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 5, 2012 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. ON DEFENDANTS HAST, CORIZON, ORR, AND SANCHO (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Corizon Health, Inc., #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Harold Orr, M.D., #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Zelda Sancho, L.V.N.)(Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
December 4, 2012 Filing 48 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Megan Hast, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Andrada, J.) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 28, 2012 Filing 47 Summons Issued as to Corizon Health Inc, Megan Hast, Harold Orr, Zelda Sancho. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 19, 2012 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants. Filed byKrystle Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr., Tiffany Harrison, Joseph Harrison. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS #38 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #43 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr., M.H., County of Alameda, et al. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 11/14/2012) Modified on 11/15/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re #44 Order on Stipulation Settlement Conference set for 2/27/2013 10:00 AM. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
October 22, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take the #38 motion for leave to file a second amended complaint under submission on the papers. The hearing previously scheduled for Thursday, October 25, 2012, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 3, 2012 Filing 42 REPLY (re #38 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Gina Altomare in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to the Supplemental Declaration of Gina Altomare in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Second Amended Complaint)(Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 26, 2012 Filing 41 RESPONSE (re #38 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) filed byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Valerie Ly in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A-C to Declaration of Valerie Ly in Support of Opposition)(Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 13, 2012 Filing 40 Renotice motion hearing re #38 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Related document(s) #38 ) (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 13, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the #38 motion to amend/correct complaint to a Thursday that the Court is available. Hearing date of Thursday, October 18, 2012 is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 12, 2012 Filing 39 Declaration of Gina Altomare in Support of #38 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byJoseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Deposition of Megan Hast, #3 Exhibit C. Deposition of Maria Magat)(Related document(s) #38 ) (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 9/12/2012) Modified on 9/13/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2012 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 9/26/2012. Replies due by 10/3/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Second Amended Complaint)(Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 9/12/2012) Modified on 9/13/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL (Sherwin, Julia) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #35 Stipulation TO AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/5/2012 (kc, ).
August 30, 2012 Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 1, 2012 Filing 34 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 11/20/2012 10:00 AM., IN CHAMBERS. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order denying #32 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. The requested dates are not available on Judge James's calendar. Any future such requests must be submitted to Judge James. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 17, 2012 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, Michael Bareno, County of Alameda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde, Joseph Harrison, et al. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 7/17/2012) Modified on 7/18/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2012 Filing 31 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 8/24/2012 10:00 AM., in chambers. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
April 5, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 7/10/2012 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge James. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Settlement Conference set for 7/10/2012 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/29/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #28 Stipulation TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/22/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 20, 2012 Filing 28 Proposed Order [BY STIPULATION, TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE] by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order granting #26 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 8, 2012 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr., County of Alameda, et al. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 3/8/2012) Modified on 3/9/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2012 Filing 25 THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. CLERK'S NOTICE: Settlement Conference set for 3/2/2012 has been Rescheduled to 4/3/2012 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) Filed on 1/10/2012)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Settlement Conference set for 3/2/2012 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/1/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr. of Unavailability of Counsel (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 22, 2011 Filing 22 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/22/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 11/22/2011). CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2013 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 2/4/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial (10 day)set for 2/4/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Sarah Goeckler.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/22/2011)
November 18, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by GDB on 11/17/11. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint; Jury Demand byMichael Bareno. (Pang, Aileen) (Filed on 11/15/2011) Modified on 11/16/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2011 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Joseph Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 11/11/2011)
November 3, 2011 ADR Clerk Setting an ADR Phone Conference on 11/17/11 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific time. The court will provide instructions for connecting to the call in a separate notice to the parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 2, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint; Jury Demand byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, County of Alameda, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Roberto Martinez, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Joshua Swetnam, Solomon Unubun, Alejandro Valverde. (Pang, Aileen) (Filed on 10/7/2011) Modified on 10/11/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina N Altomare , Michael J Haddad and Julia Sherwin (Altomare, Gina) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; JURY DEMAND against Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, County of Alameda, Alejandro Valverde, Joshua Swetnam, Roberto Martinez, Zachary Litvinchuk, Ryan Madigan, Michael Bareno, Fernando Rojas-Castaneda, Shawn Sobrero, Solomon Unubun. Filed byM.H., Joseph Harrison, Tiffany Harrison, Krystle Harrison, Martin Harrison, Jr.. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/20/2011) Modified on 9/21/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Aileen Pang (Pang, Aileen) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FRCivP 15(a) AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/15/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 13, 2011 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FRCivP 15(a) AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND (PROPOSED) ORDER by M.H., Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, County of Alameda. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/13/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE by Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, County of Alameda of Appearance of J. Randall Andrada as Co-Counsel for Defendants (Andrada, J.) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, County of Alameda. (Ly, Valerie) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M.H.. M. Alhf served on 7/22/2011, answer due 8/12/2011. (Burris, John) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M.H.. Gregory J. Ahern served on 7/22/2011, answer due 8/12/2011. (Burris, John) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M.H.. County of Alameda served on 7/22/2011, answer due 8/12/2011. (Burris, John) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf, County of Alameda. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/17/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/16/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 3 Declination to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge & Request for Reassignment to a United States District Court Judge filed by Plaintiff M.H.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 9/13/2011 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 9/20/2011 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages & Jury Trial Demanded - [No Summons Issued] against Gregory J. Ahern, M. Alhf & County of Alameda, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 44611007138] Filed by M.H.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.H. v. County of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Inc
Represented By: Pamela Chung
Represented By: Matthew M. Grigg
Represented By: Nancy Eaton Hudgins
Represented By: Carol B. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Madigan
Represented By: Aileen Pang
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon Unubun
Represented By: Aileen Pang
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Valverde
Represented By: Aileen Pang
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zelda Sancho
Represented By: Martha M. Stringer
Represented By: Matthew M. Grigg
Represented By: Kathleen Jane Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Represented By: Aileen Pang
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Jeffrey Stephen Hunter
Represented By: William W Drury
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Ahern
Represented By: Aileen Pang
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Orr
Represented By: Matthew M. Grigg
Represented By: Nancy Eaton Hudgins
Represented By: Carol B. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Martinez
Represented By: Aileen Pang
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Litvinchuk
Represented By: Aileen Pang
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Alhf
Represented By: Aileen Pang
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bareno
Represented By: Aileen Pang
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Swetnam
Represented By: Aileen Pang
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Hast
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Rojas-Castaneda
Represented By: Aileen Pang
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Sobrero
Represented By: Aileen Pang
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Koss
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Represented By: Valerie Lu Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Gina N. Altomare
Represented By: Richard Henry Friedman
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: T. Kennedy Helm, IV
Represented By: Genevieve K. Guertin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Henshaw
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Harrison
Represented By: Gina N. Altomare
Represented By: Richard Henry Friedman
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: T. Kennedy Helm, IV
Represented By: Genevieve K. Guertin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.H.
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Harrison
Represented By: Gina N. Altomare
Represented By: Richard Henry Friedman
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: T. Kennedy Helm, IV
Represented By: Genevieve K. Guertin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystle Harrison
Represented By: Gina N. Altomare
Represented By: Richard Henry Friedman
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: T. Kennedy Helm, IV
Represented By: Genevieve K. Guertin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Kristy Kite
Represented By: Javier Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?