Astiana v. Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc.
Plaintiff: Skye Astiana
Defendant: Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02910
Filed: June 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE filed by Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/23/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 further continuing class certification briefing schedule and July 11, 2013 hearing and continuing July 11, 2013 case management conference filed by Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc. Case Management Statement d ue by 9/5/2013. Motions due by 4/22/2013. Replies due by 7/12/2013. Responses due by 6/3/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 Continuing Class Cert. Motion Briefing & Hearing Schedule and Dismissing Named Plaintiff Jay Woolwine filed by Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/27/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 resetting Deadlines for Submission of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Motion due 3/1/13. Responses due by 4/12/2013. Replies due by 5/23/2013. Hearing 6/6/13 at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/12/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 58 Defendant's Motion for Certificate of Appealability (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on October 1, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 43 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSE TO SAME. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/23/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re (22 in 3:11-cv-03164-EMC, 22 in 3:11-cv-03164-EMC) Stipulation and Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re (29 in 3:11-cv-02910-EMC) Stipulation filed by Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2012. Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/13/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 21 Motion to Consolidate Cases (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTIG CMC re 20 Stipulation filed by Skye Astiana Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Astiana v. Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skye Astiana
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: Michael D. Braun
Represented By: Joseph N. Kravec, Jr.
Represented By: Wyatt A. Lison
Represented By: Janet Lindner Spielberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, Inc.
Represented By: Dale Joseph Giali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?