Dolby International AB v. Research in Motion Limited et al Featured Case

Dolby Laboratories sues Blackberry smartphone maker Research in Motion ('RIM') for patent infringement, accusing it of violating its patents for spectral band replication ('SBR') and parametric stereo ('PS') audio compression technologies used in High Efficiency Advanced Audio Coding ('HE ACC') audio compression standards worldwide.

Plaintiff alleges that "unlike virtually all of its competitors, RIM refuses to 'play fair,' and has rejected numerous opportunities to license" Dolby's patented audio technologies.

Plaintiff: Dolby International AB
Defendant: Research in Motion Limited and Research In Motion Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv02931
Filed: June 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2011 Filing 16 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Dolby International AB. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
August 5, 2011 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited (McCormick, Melissa) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 5, 2011 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint byResearch In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited. (McCormick, Melissa) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Research in Motion Limited and Research in Motion Corporation to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited. (McCormick, Melissa) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 12 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 13 . *** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited. (McCormick, Melissa) (Filed on 7/6/2011) Modified on 7/6/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2011 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dolby International AB re 9 ADR Scheduling Order ; Standing Order For All Judges of the Northern District of California - Contents of Joint Case Management Statement; Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge; and Consenting to a Magistrate Judge's Jurisdiction in the Northern District of California to Research in Motion Corporation (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dolby International AB re 9 ADR Scheduling Order ; Standing Order For All Judges of the Northern District of California - Contents of Joint Case Management Statement; Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge; and Consenting to a Magistrate Judge's Jurisdiction in the Northern District of California to Research in Motion Limited (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 9 AMENDED ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dolby International AB re 3 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, 4 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, 2 ADR Scheduling Order, 5 Certificate of Interested Entities, Research in Motion Corp. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dolby International AB re 3 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, 4 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, 2 ADR Scheduling Order, 5 Certificate of Interested Entities, Research In Motion Limited (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patents (cc: form mailed to register). (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dolby International AB identifying Corporate Parent Dolby Laboratories, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate Dolby International Holding BV, Other Affiliate Dolby Laboratories, Inc., a California Corporation, Other Affiliate Via Licensing Corporation for Dolby International AB. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011) Modified on 6/16/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2011 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011) Modified on 6/16/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011) Modified on 6/16/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011) Modified on 6/16/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611061054, summons issued). Filed by Dolby International AB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011) Modified on 6/16/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolby International AB v. Research in Motion Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolby International AB
Represented By: Brendan P. Cullen
Represented By: Scott Christensen Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research in Motion Limited
Represented By: Melissa R McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion Corporation
Represented By: Melissa R McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?