Smalley et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Harold Smalley, Gayann Welland, Tracey Antinori, Shirley Avery, Tanya Balch, William Lee Borough, Shawna Christine Breedfield, Dennis Costa, Margaret E. Crane, David Perez Cruz, Mary Cushing, Angela V. Domondon, James B. Evans, Gregory A. Farrar, Jr., Dennis Freundt, Deborah Jackson, Ronald C. Keitz, Diane M. Kirby, Lela D. Laplante, David Leyva, Anthony M. Lucas, Craig Mace, Daniel D. Magna, Bradley J. McAdam, Terri Lee McCauley, Neill Newton, Lino Nshimba, Shannon Parker, Everet Pinkney, Monique Rainey, Surendra Reddy, Lisa Rivas, Hector Sanchez, Lynne K. Sotelo, Jesmendar Sungh, Michael Swinfard, Michael Scott Turner, Tina Louise Vega-Stemiska, Bryan Garcia, Daniel A. Casmaer, Robert M. Malmberg, Jason McHann, Michael Perrin, Alan Aneals, Donald S. Edwards, Edwin Garcia, Michael B. Green, Jr., Eric Amstad, Dawn Y. Brennan, David Carlson, Gail D. Knoll, Lorenzo Nicholson, David Saylor, Darren Scott Williams, Donal James Young, Sean E. Liston, Andrew Clayton Moran, Johnnie D. Norton, Shane Paskett, Matthew S. Robert, Zachary Taylor, Laura Woolston, Washington, Jeffrey H. Anderson, Tracey Lynn Bertch, Scott Allen Brender, Marianne Edecheit, Michael Lynn Schwartz, Kevin Dale Sherwin, Neil Eugene West and John Rudolph Dalbert
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02951
Filed: June 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING re 135 Letter filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., for Juliet Gray and Joel Cohn to appear by phone on 3/14/14 at 2:00 PM. Counsel shall appear on the conference call number & pass code to be arranged by the Squiteri Law Firm. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/4/14. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING re 132 Case Management Statement And Request for Continuance of Conference filed by Darren Scott Williams, Margaret E. Crane, Michael Scott Turner, Shane Paskett, Harold Smalley, Lorenzo Nicholson, Laura Woolston, Jesmendar Sungh, Everet Pinkney, Mary Cushing, Michael Swinfard, Michael Perrin, Craig Mace, Deborah Jackson, Alan Aneals, Bradley J. McAdam, David Leyva Further Case Management Conference re-set for 3/7/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/19/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING re 129 Stipulation of Dismissal of Certain Plaintiffs filed by Jeffrey H. Anderson, Washington. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/23/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING re 110 Letter filed by Darren Scott Williams, Margaret E. Crane, Michael Scott Turner, Shane Paskett, Harold Smalley, Lorenzo Nicholson, Jeffrey H. Anderson, Laura Woolston, Jesmendar Sungh, Everet Pinkney, Mary Cushing, Michael Swinfard, Michael Perrin, Craig Mace, Deborah Jackson, Alan Aneals, Bradley J. McAdam, David Leyva for Lee Squitieri and Caitlin Duffy to appear by phone on 10/4/13 at 1:30 PM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 9/30/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING 103 Stipulation of Dismissal of Certain Plaintiffs filed by Darren Scott Williams, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Margaret E. Crane, Shane Paskett, Harold Smalley, Robert M. Malmberg, Lorenzo Nicholson, Laura Woolston, Jesmendar Sungh, Everet Pinkney, Hector Sanchez, William Lee Borough, Mary Cushing, Michael Swinfard, Sean E. Liston, Michael Perrin, Lisa Rivas, Diane M. Kirby, Craig Mace, Michael Lynn Schwartz, Deborah Jackson, Alan Aneals, Bradley J. McAdam, Davi d Leyva, Donald S. Edwards, Diane M. Kirby, Sean E. Liston, Robert M. Malmberg, Lisa Rivas, Hector Sanchez, Michael Lynn Schwartz, William Lee Borough and Donald S. Edwards terminated.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/16/13. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 76 Motion for Summary Judgment (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING re 83 Letter filed by Darren Scott Williams, Margaret E. Crane, Michael Scott Turner, Shane Paskett, Harold Smalley, Robert M. Malmberg, Lorenzo Nicholson, Jeffrey H. Anderson, Laura Woolston, Jesmendar Sungh, Everet Pinkney, Hector Sanchez, William Lee Borough, Mary Cushing, Michael Swinfard, Sean E. Liston, Michael Perrin, Lisa Rivas, Diane M. Kirby, Craig Mace, Michael Lynn Schwartz, Deborah Jackson, Alan Aneals, Bradley J. McAdam, David Leyva, Donald S. Edwards for Lee Squitieri and Caitlin Duffy to appear by phone on 12/14/12 at 9:30 AM for the further case management conference.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/4/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on December 3, 2012. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 9/7/2012. (knsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING re 71 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Certain Plaintiffs filed by John Rudolph Dalbert, Marianne Edecheit. John Rudolph Dalbert and Marianne Edecheit terminated. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/22/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING re 68 Letter filed by Deborah Jackson to dismiss Plaintiff Bertch's claims with prejudice. Tracey Lynn Bertch terminated. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/2/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS: Shawna Breedlove, Gail Knoll, Lela LePlante, Jason McHann, Lino Nshimba, Lynne K. Sotelo, Gayann Welland in entirety. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 7/12/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING re 60 Letter for Caitlin Duffy and Lee Squitieri to appear by phone on 7/13/12 for the OSC and further CMC at 9:30 AM filed by Darren Scott Williams, Terri Lee McCauley, David Perez Cruz, Lela D. Laplante, Shane Paskett, Robert M. Malmberg, David Saylor, Johnnie D. Norton, Dawn Y. Brennan, Jeffrey H. Anderson, Neil Eugene West, Donal James Young, Tracey Lynn Bertch, Sean E. Liston, Lynne K. Sotelo, Marianne Edecheit, Shannon Parker, Deborah Jackson, David Leyva, Donald S. Edwards, Lino Nshimba, Monique Rainey, Margaret E. Crane, Gail D. Knoll, Michael Scott Turner, Bryan Garcia, Harold Smalley, Gayann Welland, Gregory A. Farrar, Jr., Lorenzo Nicholson, Jason McHann, Laura Woolston, Hector Sanchez, Everet Pinkney, Jesmendar Sungh, William Lee Borough, Mary Cushing, Michael Swinfard, John Rudolph Dalbert, Michael Perrin, Lisa Rivas, Diane M. Kirby, Daniel A. Casmaer, Shawna Christine Breedfield, Surendra Reddy, Craig Mace, Michael Lynn Schwartz, David Carlson, Alan Aneals, Bradley J. McAdam, Dennis Freundt, Washington. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/10/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO JULY 13, 2012. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 7/13/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 06/21/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DISCOVERY ORDER re 49 Letter filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Plaintiff's request for an abeyance as to the following nine Plaintiffs is DENIED and discovery shall proceed on these individuals. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/19/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING re 47 Stipulation of Dismissal of Certain Plaintiffs filed by Tanya Balch, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Daniel D. Magna. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/11/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/16/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/18/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING re 35 Letter filed by Scott Allen Brender, et al., for Caitlin Duffy to appear by phone on 2/17/12 at 1:30 PM for the case management conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/13/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 23 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Scott Allen Brender, Darren Scott Williams, David Perez Cruz, Lela D. Laplante, Shane Paskett, Robert M. Malmberg, Tanya Balch, Johnnie D. Norton, Jeffrey H. Anderson, Donal James Young, Matthew S. Robert, Sean E. Liston, James B. Evans, Edwin Garcia, Marianne Edecheit, Shannon Parker, Deborah Jackson, Eric Amstad, David Leyva, Gail D. Knoll, Michael Scott Turner, Bryan Garcia, Harold Smalley, Gayann Welland, Gregory A. Farrar, Jr., Neill Newton, Jesmendar Sungh, Everet Pinkney, Hector Sanchez, William Lee Borough, Daniel A. Casmaer, Diane M. Kirby, Surendra Reddy, Craig Mace, Shirley Avery, Michael Lynn Schwartz, David Carlson, Angela V. Domondon, Alan Aneals, Tina Louise Vega- Stemiska, Andrew Clayton Moran, Terri Lee McCauley, Anthony M. Lucas, Dennis Costa, David Saylor, Dawn Y. Brennan, Michael B. Green, Jr., Neil Eugene West, Tracey Lynn Bertch, Lynne K. Sotelo, Donald S. Edwards, Lino Nshimba, Monique Rainey, Margaret E. Crane, Lorenzo Nicholson, Daniel D. Magna, Ronald C. Keitz, Jason McHann, Laura Woolston, Tracey Antinori, Kevin Dale Sherwin, Mary Cushing, Michael Swinfard, John Rudolph Dalbert, Michael Perrin, Lisa Rivas, Shawna Christine Breedfield, Zachary Taylor, Bradley J. McAdam, Dennis Freundt, Washington, Attorney Ian James Barlow and Mark John Tamblyn terminated. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/19/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to plaintiffs Neill Newton & Tina Louise Vega-Stemiska in their entirety, and without prejudice as to plaintiffs Michael B. Green, Jr and Anthony M. Lucas. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/5/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING re 14 Stipulation and Consent Motion for Administrative Relief to Lift Stay, Adjourn Status Conference and Schedule Case Management Conference filed by Scott Allen Brender, Darren Scott Williams, David Perez Cruz, Lela D. Laplante, S hane Paskett, Robert M. Malmberg, Tanya Balch, Johnnie D. Norton, Jeffrey H. Anderson, Donal James Young, Matthew S. Robert, Sean E. Liston, James B. Evans, Edwin Garcia, Marianne Edecheit, Shannon Parker, Deborah Jackson, Eric Amstad, David Leyva, G ail D. Knoll, Michael Scott Turner, Bryan Garcia, Harold Smalley, Gayann Welland, Gregory A. Farrar, Jr., Neill Newton, Jesmendar Sungh, Everet Pinkney, Hector Sanchez, William Lee Borough, Daniel A. Casmaer, Diane M. Kirby, Surendra Reddy, Craig Mac e, Shirley Avery, Michael Lynn Schwartz, David Carlson, Angela V. Domondon, Alan Aneals, Tina Louise Vega-Stemiska, Andrew Clayton Moran, Terri Lee McCauley, Anthony M. Lucas, David Saylor, Dawn Y. Brennan, Michael B. Green, Jr., Neil Eugene West, Tr acey Lynn Bertch, Lynne K. Sotelo, Donald S. Edwards, Lino Nshimba, Monique Rainey, Margaret E. Crane, Lorenzo Nicholson, Daniel D. Magna, Ronald C. Keitz, Jason McHann, Laura Woolston, Tracey Antinori, Kevin Dale Sherwin, Mary Cushing, Michael Swinf ard, John Rudolph Dalbert, Michael Perrin, Lisa Rivas, Shawna Christine Breedfield, Zachary Taylor, Bradley J. McAdam, Dennis Freundt, Washington. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2012. Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/14/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smalley et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Smalley
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayann Welland
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Antinori
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Avery
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Balch
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee Borough
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Christine Breedfield
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Costa
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret E. Crane
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Perez Cruz
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Cushing
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela V. Domondon
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B. Evans
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory A. Farrar, Jr.
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Freundt
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Jackson
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald C. Keitz
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane M. Kirby
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lela D. Laplante
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Leyva
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony M. Lucas
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Mace
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel D. Magna
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley J. McAdam
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lee McCauley
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neill Newton
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lino Nshimba
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Parker
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everet Pinkney
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Rainey
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surendra Reddy
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Rivas
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Sanchez
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne K. Sotelo
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesmendar Sungh
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Swinfard
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scott Turner
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Louise Vega-Stemiska
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Garcia
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel A. Casmaer
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Malmberg
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason McHann
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Perrin
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Aneals
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald S. Edwards
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Garcia
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Amstad
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Y. Brennan
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Carlson
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail D. Knoll
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Nicholson
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Saylor
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Scott Williams
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donal James Young
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean E. Liston
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Clayton Moran
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie D. Norton
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Paskett
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew S. Robert
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Taylor
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Woolston
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey H. Anderson
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Lynn Bertch
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Allen Brender
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Edecheit
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lynn Schwartz
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Dale Sherwin
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Eugene West
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rudolph Dalbert
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?