Cable Wholesale.com, Inc. v. SF Cable, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cable Wholesale.com, Inc.
Defendant: SF Cable, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02966
Filed: June 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 80 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Entry of [Proposed] Permanent Injunction filed by Cable Wholesale.com, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 6, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 78 Notice filed by Cable Wholesale.com, Inc. Dismissal or Statement due by 3/24/2014. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 7, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MEDIATION DEADLINE AND HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO CONTINUE CMC AND COMPLETION OF DISOCVYER, DISCLOSURE OF EXPERTS, REBUTTAL EXPERTS re 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Cable Wholesale.com, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2013. Further Case Man agement Conference set for 10/2/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Discovery due by 10/15/2013. Expert Designation due by 11/15/2013. Expert Rebuttal due by 11/26/2013. Expert Discovery due by 12/15/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 31, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC FROM 11/30/12 to 3/28/13 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/27/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 8/31/12 TO 11/30/12 AND EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC FROM 5/25/12 TO 8/31/12 re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Continuance of CMC and Extension to Complete Mediation filed by Cable Wholesale.com, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/22/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Continuance of CMC and Extension to Complete Mediation filed by Cable Wholesale.com, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/23/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE HANDLING CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS re 36 Stipulation filed by SF Cable, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/28/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 32 Stipulation filed by Cable Wholesale.com, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RESETTING CMC re 25 Letter filed by Cable Wholesale.com, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/8/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cable Wholesale.com, Inc. v. SF Cable, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SF Cable, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew McMahon
Represented By: Bruce Charles Piontkowski
Represented By: Curtis R. Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cable Wholesale.com, Inc.
Represented By: James Gerald Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?