Ruiz v. Sawaya et al
Plaintiff: Ruben J. Ruiz
Defendant: M. Sawaya, N. Daharsh, J. Shaw and J. Barneburg
Case Number: 3:2011cv03126
Filed: June 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER NOTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND RETAINING JURISDICTION re 138 Stipulation filed by Ruben J. Ruiz. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 136 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Vacate Trial Date and Continue April 1, 2016 Case Management Conference filed by Ruben J. Ruiz. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 31, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER RE: TRIAL SCHEDULE re 122 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 24, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 125 Statement filed by N. Daharsh, J. Shaw, M. Sawaya. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 5, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2016 - 5/2/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 25, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 119 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Ruben J. Ruiz. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 9, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 117 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Allowing Inmate Depositions filed by N. Daharsh, J. Shaw, M. Sawaya. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 26, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 112 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Administrative Motion For Entry Of The Parties' Stipulated Protective Order filed by N. Daharsh, J. Shaw, M. Sawaya. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reinstate Common Law Claims filed by Ruben J. Ruiz. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 23, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case not settled. Signed by Judge Vadas on 4/23/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Re Plaintiff's Telephonic Appearance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/04/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Re Settlement Conference. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/8/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/4/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference; Order Vacating Status Conference; Order Vacating Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/4/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 1/27/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/13/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Sawaya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben J. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sawaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Daharsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Barneburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?