Symantec Corporation v. Johns Creek Software, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Symantec Corporation
Defendant: Johns Creek Software, Inc. and Stephen Cheatham
Case Number: 3:2011cv03146
Filed: June 24, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER FOR CLARIFICATION re 146 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Entry of Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 24, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (11/5/2012) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (10/29/2012 at 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/13/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/30/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 AMENDED ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING [re 132 Letter filed by Symantec Corporation, 131 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings]. Responses due by noon on 8/8/2012. Meet-and-confer in the Court's jury room, starting from 12:30 p.m. and continuing through to 4:00 p.m. on Thursday, 8/9/2012. Discovery Hearing set for 8/9/2012 04:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/7/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR SPOILATION AND MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 18, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER RE JULY 18 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 16, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER RE JULY 18 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING [re 107 Letter filed by Symantec Corporation]. Meet-and-confer set for 6/29/2012 FROM 10:00 A.M. AND CONTINUING TO 2:00 P.M. Discovery Hearing set for 6/29/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by NOON ON 6/28/2012. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/25/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 CORRECTED ORDER CONSOLIDATING HEARINGS re 102 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 14, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 94 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 1, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY HEARING re 84 Notice (Other) filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 80 Letter filed by Symantec Corporation]. Responses due by noon on 4/2/2012. Meet-and-confer for 4/4/2012 starting from 10:00 a.m. and continuing through 2:00 p.m. (with one-half hour for lunch at 12:30 p.m.) in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 4/4/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/29/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY HEARING re 76 Notice (Other) filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 23, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re 73 Letter filed by Symantec Corporation, 72 Order. Meet-and-confer set for 2/16/2012 starting from 9:30 a.m. and ending at 1:00 p.m. (with a lunch break between 12:00 to 12:30 p.m.) in the Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 2/16/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/8/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 68 Letter filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 2, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup denying 60 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS re 57 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss filed by Johns Creek Software, Inc., Stephen Cheatham. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 18, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED EXTENSION OF RESPONSE DEADLINE re 43 Stipulation filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 12, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR IMPROPER VENUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE AND VACATING HEARING, Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY re 22 Letter filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 Clerks Notice, (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symantec Corporation v. Johns Creek Software, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symantec Corporation
Represented By: Perry Joseph Viscounty
Represented By: Jennifer L. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johns Creek Software, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Rodenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Cheatham
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Rodenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?