Eng v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Martin Eng
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association, Sotheby's International Realty, Mary Lou Castellanos and Quality Loan Service Corp
Case Number: 3:2011cv03173
Filed: June 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The motions to dismiss are, in each instance, granted. The SAC is dismissed without further leave to amend. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Eng's Second Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed no later than June 29, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 6, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO OPPOSE MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Eng has shown good cause for an extension of time to oppose defendants' motions to dismiss. Defendants' replies to Eng's opposition, if a ny, shall be filed no later than May 25, 2012, on which date the matters will stand submitted. The case management conference, currently scheduled for June 1, 2012, is continued to August 17, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 17, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VACATING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of the motions, the Court deems the matters approprirate for decision thereon, and vacates the hearings scheduled respectively for May 11, 2012 and May 18, 2012. The Quality Loan Defendants' request to appear telephonically is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 9, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/28/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eng v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Eng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sotheby's International Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lou Castellanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?