Loskot v. Valucci Restaurants, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marshall Loskot
Defendant: Valucci Restaurants, Inc. and Mary D. Cogburn
Case Number: 3:2011cv03174
Filed: June 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to docket no. 9 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/16/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 7 Stipulation filed by Marshall Loskot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/28/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re 3 Stipulation filed by Valucci Restaurants, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/11/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loskot v. Valucci Restaurants, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Loskot
Represented By: Jason K. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valucci Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary D. Cogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?