Schafler v. Judge Newsome, et al.,
Defendant: Dennis D. Davis, Newsome and Richard J. Spear
Petitioner: Pepi Schafler
Case Number: 3:2011cv03175
Filed: June 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERRAL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CORRECT THE DOCKET (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schafler v. Judge Newsome, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis D. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pepi Schafler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?