Guindani v. Couder et al
Plaintiff: Toby Aguilar, Jermaine Coney and Matteo Guindani
Defendant: Edward Collins, Greg Dougherty, Lori Holland, Lori A Smith, Oclaro, Inc., Bernard Couillaud, Giovanni Barbarossa, Alain Couder, Jerry Turin and James Haynes
Case Number: 3:2011cv03176
Filed: June 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 83 Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval and Awarding Fees & Expenses. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Re Supplemental Evidence Re Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/4/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 71 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Final approval hearing set for 7/31/14 at 1:30 p.m. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing Re Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/27/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 STIPULATION Rescheduling Case Management Conference filed by Oclaro, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2013. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/5/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/28/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SCHEDULING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT, RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND PROVIDING FOR THE SHARING OF CERTAIN DISCOVER Y filed by Oclaro, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Case Management Conference filed by Matteo Guindani, Oclaro, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 10 Aguilar's Motion to Consolidate; Granting 9 J&W's Motion for Appointment as Lead Counsel; and Denying L&K's Motion for Appointment as Lead Counsel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS, ETC. re 5 Stipulation filed by Matteo Guindani. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/20/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guindani v. Couder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oclaro, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Perry Corley
Represented By: Gidon M. Caine
Represented By: Elizabeth Patz Skola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Couillaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanni Barbarossa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alain Couder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Turin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Aguilar
Represented By: David Edlridge Bower
Represented By: Mark Punzalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Coney
Represented By: Mark Andrew Golovach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matteo Guindani
Represented By: Keith M Cochran
Represented By: Frank James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?