Glasforms, Inc. v. Landmark American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Glasforms, Inc.
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company and Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2011cv03407
Filed: July 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 3/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/8/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 28 Extending Discovery and Expert Deposition Deadlines filed by Landmark American Insurance Company, Glasforms, Inc. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2013 09:00 AM. Compliance Hearing set for 7/12/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Y vonne Gonzalez Rogers. Non-Expert discovery Cutoff 1/18/13. Disclosure of Experts (Retained/Non-Retained) Opening 2/1/13; Rebuttal 2/15/13. Expert Discovery Cutoff 4/5/13.. Signed by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS on 10/16/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2012 is CONTINUED to 2/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/12/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/7/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF NEED TO CHANGE TRIAL DATE; OFFER TO REFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/29/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glasforms, Inc. v. Landmark American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glasforms, Inc.
Represented By: Danna Paje
Represented By: Randall C. Creech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Represented By: William Luther Marchant
Represented By: Denis Francis Shanagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?