WJW Associates, LTD v. Greatwide Dallas Mavis, LLC
Plaintiff: WJW Associates, LTD
Defendant: Greatwide Dallas Mavis, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv03427
Filed: July 13, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 27 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/14/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/1/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/28/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffery S. White on 10/24/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 16 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WJW Associates, LTD v. Greatwide Dallas Mavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WJW Associates, LTD
Represented By: Asa William Markel
Represented By: Dennis A. Cammarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greatwide Dallas Mavis, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Collins Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?