Velasquez v. Donahue et al
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Velasquez
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service, Maria Culloty and Patrick R. Donahue
Movant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2011cv03444
Filed: July 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR REVIEW OF CLERK'S TAXATION OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/12/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment; AND PROVIDING RAND NOTICE. Responses due by 6/21/2013. Replies due by 6/28/2013. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/6/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 63 MOTION for Telephonic Hearing.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/8/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING 57 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/27/12. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 46 STIPULATION To Extend Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/21/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2012: # 1 Certificate of Service) (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White4 on 1/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/9/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/9/2011.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Donahue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service
Represented By: Neill Tai Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Culloty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahue
Represented By: Neill Tai Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Neill Tai Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?