PhoneDog, LLC v. Kravitz Featured Case

Plaintiff: PhoneDog, LLC
Defendant: Noah Kravitz
Case Number: 3:2011cv03474
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/8/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 7, 2013 Filing 51 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT filed by PhoneDog, LLC. (Kirke, John) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
December 17, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re 50 Clerks Notice Status Conference set for 1/24/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 50 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES and VACATING ALL PENDING DEADLINES. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
May 31, 2012 Filing 49 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session 2/23/2012, case not settled and further facilitated discussions are expecting/ongoing, mediation continuing. Signed by David T. Alexander, dated 5/29/2012. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 46 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 47 Statement of Non-Opposition re 46 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed byPhoneDog, LLC. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Kirke, John) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
April 30, 2012 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by Noah Kravitz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Keane, Margaret) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 42 Motion to Withdraw Sebastian L. Miller as Counsel of Record and Request for Removal from Service Lists filed by Noah Kravitz, Attorney Sebastian Lamar Miller terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/27/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 26, 2012 Filing 44 Proposed Order re 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Sebastian L. Miller as Counsel of Record and Request for Removal from Service Lists by Noah Kravitz. (Miller, Sebastian) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 Filing 43 Declaration of Sebastian L. Miller in Support of 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Sebastian L. Miller as Counsel of Record and Request for Removal from Service Lists filed byNoah Kravitz. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Miller, Sebastian) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 Filing 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Sebastian L. Miller as Counsel of Record and Request for Removal from Service Lists filed by Noah Kravitz. Responses due by 5/10/2012. Replies due by 5/17/2012. (Miller, Sebastian) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
March 6, 2012 Filing 41 ANSWER to Counterclaim byPhoneDog, LLC. (Kirke, John) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
February 14, 2012 Filing 40 Noah Kravitz's ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Misappropriation of Trade Secrets, Interference with Prospective Economic Advantage and Conversion, COUNTERCLAIM against PhoneDog, LLC byNoah Kravitz. (Miller, Sebastian) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 10, 2012 Filing 39 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Noah Kravitz to Respond to the Complaint filed by Noah Kravitz. (Miller, Sebastian) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 2, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Sebastian Lamar Miller and Margaret A. Keane (Miller, Sebastian) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 30 Motion to Dismiss (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Noah Kravitz. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/2/4/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 30-day Extension to Conduct Mediation. re 34 Letter filed by Noah Kravitz. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 1/18/12. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 18, 2012 Filing 34 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Requesting 30-Day Extension to Conduct Mediation. (Nguyen, Trung) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 9, 2012 Filing 33 Request for Judicial Notice re 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byNoah Kravitz. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Nguyen, Trung) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 32 REPLY (re 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byNoah Kravitz. (Nguyen, Trung) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 31 RESPONSE (re 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byPhoneDog, LLC. (Kirke, John) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
December 16, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Noah Kravitz. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 12/30/2011. Replies due by 1/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [proposed] Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service POS)(Nguyen, Trung) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
November 29, 2011 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Noah Kravitz. Filed byPhoneDog, LLC. (Kirke, John) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Amended complaint due by November 29, 2011. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 27, 2011 Filing 27 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing David T. Alexander as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 24, 2011 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 10/25/11 has been taken off calendar. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to mediation. Discovery due by 7/24/2012. Jury Trial set for 1/28/2013. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2012. Motions due by 8/23/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 12/27/2012. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/21/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 20, 2011 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT filed by PhoneDog, LLC. (Kirke, John) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 13, 2011 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 10/25/11 at 3:00 p.m. Pacific time. The court will provide instructions for connecting to the call in a separate notice to the parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 13, 2011 Filing 24 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/13/2011 before Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES (Date Filed: 10/13/2011) re 4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Noah Kravitz. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/13/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Kirke, John) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RESETTING HEARING: Motion Hearing reset for 10/13/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Signed by Judge James on 10/5/2011. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 1, 2011 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Noah Kravitz. (Nguyen, Trung) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 19 OBJECTIONS to re 14 Declaration in Opposition by Noah Kravitz. (Nguyen, Trung) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 18 Declaration in Support of 4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Supplement Declaration of Noah Kravitz In Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byNoah Kravitz. (Related document(s) 4 ) (Nguyen, Trung) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 17 REPLY (re 4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim ) Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed byNoah Kravitz. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Noah Kravitz In Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Defendant's Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Tom Klein)(Nguyen, Trung) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 16 Proposed Order re 13 Opposition/Response to Motion TO DISMISS by PhoneDog, LLC. (Kirke, John) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 15 OBJECTIONS to re 6 Declaration in Support, 5 Declaration in Support by PhoneDog, LLC. (Kirke, John) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 14 DECLARATION of TOM KLEIN in Opposition to 4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed byPhoneDog, LLC. (Related document(s) 4 ) (Kirke, John) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 13 RESPONSE (re 4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim ) filed byPhoneDog, LLC. (Kirke, John) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 12 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PhoneDog, LLC.. (Kirke, John) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 9, 2011 Filing 11 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Noah Kravitz.. (Kletter, Cary) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/8/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service Motion to Dismiss by Noah Kravitz. (Kletter, Cary) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 8 Proposed Order regarding Motion to Dismiss by Noah Kravitz. (Kletter, Cary) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 7 Request for Judicial Notice filed byNoah Kravitz. (Kletter, Cary) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 6 Declaration of Noah Kravitz in Support of Motion filed byNoah Kravitz. (Kletter, Cary) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 5 Declaration of Cary Kletter in Support of Motion filed byNoah Kravitz. (Kletter, Cary) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Noah Kravitz. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 8/18/2011. Replies due by 8/25/2011. (Kletter, Cary) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed by PhoneDog, LLC re 2 ADR Scheduling Order, 1 Complaint (Kirke, John). Noah Kravitz served 7/17/2011. (Filed on 8/4/2011) Modified on 8/5/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/15/11. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against Noah Kravitz ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611007294.). Filed byPhoneDog, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PhoneDog, LLC v. Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PhoneDog, LLC
Represented By: John Christophe Kirke
Represented By: Sophia E.C. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Kravitz
Represented By: Cary S. Kletter
Represented By: Sally Trung Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?