Berti Produce - San Francisco, Inc. et al v. Sbragia et al
Plaintiff: Berti Produce - San Francisco, Inc., Edwin Chin, Jacobs Malcolm & Burtt, North Bay Produce, Inc., Washington Vegetable Company and What A Tomato Produce Company, Inc.
Defendant: Robert Sbragia, John Sbragia, Steven Sbragia and Patricia Cini
Case Number: 3:2011cv03546
Filed: July 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/6/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - Motions due by 11/15/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/23/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 22 Stipulation to extend deadline for ADR Session, Discovery & Dispositive Motions. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 15 Case Management Statement filed by Berti Produce - San Francisco, Inc. Case Management Conference Continued to 3/1/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Conference Statement due by 2/23/12. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENAJAMES on 1/6/12. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/21/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berti Produce - San Francisco, Inc. et al v. Sbragia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berti Produce - San Francisco, Inc.
Represented By: Marion I Quesenbery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Chin
Represented By: Marion I Quesenbery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacobs Malcolm & Burtt
Represented By: Marion I Quesenbery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Bay Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Marion I Quesenbery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Vegetable Company
Represented By: Marion I Quesenbery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: What A Tomato Produce Company, Inc.
Represented By: Marion I Quesenbery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sbragia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sbragia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sbragia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Cini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?