Procknow v. Wabash Metal Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Garrett Procknow
Defendant: Wabash Metal Products, Inc. and ACS Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv03589
Filed: July 21, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [denying 27 Motion to Remand]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES re 14 Stipulation filed by Wabash Metal Products, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 29, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Clerks Notice, (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Procknow v. Wabash Metal Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Procknow
Represented By: Kerrie Webb
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wabash Metal Products, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Leroy Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACS Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?