Fregia v. McDonald
Petitioner: Mark Anthony Fregia
Respondent: Mike McDonald
Case Number: 3:2011cv03595
Filed: July 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DENYING CERTIFICATE OFAPPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/06/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REHEARING; VACATING JUDGMENT AND REOPENING ACTION; DENYING OTHER MOTION AS MOOT. 29 MOTION for Hearing GRANTED; 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File DENIED as moot. Judgment entered on February 7, 2014 is VACATED. The Clerk shall reopen this matter. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/27/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING PETITION OR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/07/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE 20 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES 17 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REOPENING ACTION, LIFTING STAY AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE 14 15 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE CASE 11 12 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/19/2012)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fregia v. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Anthony Fregia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?