The Board of Trustees et al v. Brown & Fesler, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees, Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California and Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Brown & Fesler, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv03671
Filed: July 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/7/2012. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONTINUING Case Management Conference to 2/1/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco re 15 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/1/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Stipulation 8 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/21/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Trustees et al v. Brown & Fesler, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Patricia A. Davis
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Fesler, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?