Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers et al v. Kickin Corporation et al
Plaintiff: F.G. Crosthwaite, Russell E. Burns and Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers
Defendant: Kickin Corporation, Superior DVBE, Inc. and Steve Lawrence Schaller
Case Number: 3:2011cv03685
Filed: July 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1451
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 WRIT of Execution issued as to Kickin Enterprises in the amount of $32,999.85. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/28/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER VACATING NOVEMBER 30, 2012 HEARING. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 16, 2012. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers et al v. Kickin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.G. Crosthwaite
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Represented By: Richard C. Johnson
Represented By: Julie Alice Ostil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Represented By: Richard C. Johnson
Represented By: Julie Alice Ostil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers
Represented By: Julie Alice Ostil
Represented By: Richard C. Johnson
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kickin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior DVBE, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Lawrence Schaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?