J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Chico et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Hilario Chico Chico and Juan Chico Chico
Case Number: 3:2011cv03722
Filed: July 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 10/12/2012 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/10/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ENTERING TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS ORDER OF COURT re 29 Order., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/30/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/29/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2012. Case Management Conference reset for 2/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/29/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Chico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilario Chico Chico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Chico Chico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?