Interbond Corporation of America v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Interbond Corporation of America
Defendant: CMO Japan Co., Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., AU Optronics Corporation America, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Sharp Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.;, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation, HannStar Display Corporation, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd, AU Optronics Corporation, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., LG Display Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Tatung Company of America, Inc. and Hitachi Displays, Ltd
Special Master: Martin Quinn
Case Number: 3:2011cv03763
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2015 Filing 334 Conditional REMAND ORDER. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi for the MDL Panel on 3/9/15. (Attachments: #1 Order Suggesting Remand to Transferor Courts )(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS re #324 , 9214 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/23/2015) Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2015 Filing 331 JOINT STATUS REPORT for Track 2 Cases by Interbond Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 2/20/2015) Modified on 2/23/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER RE: REMAINING TRACK 2 AND OREGON CASES. Status statement is due by 2/20/15. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #328 , (9290) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI of Dismissal (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2014 Filing 328 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal (MDL Dkt. No. 9290) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 327 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/17/2014, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number (415) 264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (9267 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2015. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF SEPTEMBER 4, 2014 ORDER 9214 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON FLORIDA DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON #283 , 9053 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/18/2014) Modified on 9/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2014 Filing 324 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Non-Party Co-Conspirators (Master Docket No. 9214) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS #290 , 9061 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DAVID P. STOWELL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702 #291 , 9070 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DIRECT PURCHASER CLAIMS FOR WHICH THE PANEL WAS FIRST SOLD TO A THIRD PARTY MANUFACTURER #287 , 9056 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2014 Filing 320 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of #319 Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9202] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), #7 Exhibit 5 (Part 3), #8 Exhibit 6 (Part 1), #9 Exhibit 6 (Part 2), #10 Exhibit 7)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2014 Filing 319 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. re #291 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9201] (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 318 Declaration of John H. Chung in Support of #317 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9199] filed byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-23 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit 24-27 to Declaration of John H. Chung)(Related document(s) #317 ) (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 317 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #290 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9198] (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 316 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #315 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. No. 9196] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #315 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 315 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #287 Declaration in Support,,, Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9195] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014) Modified on 8/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2014 Filing 314 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Reply In Support of Track Two Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Florida Downstream Pass-On [MDL Doc. No. 9193} (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014) Modified on 8/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2014 Filing 313 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America re #291 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case. [Master Docket No. 9168] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johnny W. Carter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/17/2014) Modified on 7/18/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 312 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #311 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 9164] filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #311 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 311 Joint Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America re #283 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case.[Master Docket No. 9163] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/18/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 Filing 310 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America re #287 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Third Party Manufacturers [Master Docket No. 9162] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 309 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #308 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 9159] filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21-45, #3 Exhibit 46-65, #4 Exhibit 66-82, #5 Exhibit 83-95)(Related document(s) #308 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 308 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America re #290 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [Master Docket No. 9158] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting in part and denying in part (9141) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON UNDISCLOSED CONSPIRATORS OR AFFILIATES #252 , 8921 signed by Judge Illston on 7/3/14 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014) Modified on 7/7/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2014 Filing 305 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #303 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation and Defendants' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation [MDL Docket No. 9145] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING #257 , 8924 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/1/2014) Modified on 7/2/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2014 Filing 303 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation (MDL Dkt. No. 9141) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 302 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #298 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of #252 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Undisclosed Co-Conspirators and Affiliates by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Exhibits BB and EE to Declaration of Lee F. Berger)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS 8915 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS 8916 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 299 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #297 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. #9135] by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #296 , (9093 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #289 , (9059 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2014 Filing 296 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9093] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 295 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #294 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, Redacted-Public Version [MDL Dkt. No. 9092] filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (DUPLICATE OF MAIN DOCUMENTS - Attachments: #1 Exhibit BB, #2 Exhibit CC, #3 Exhibit DD, #4 Exhibit EE, #5 Exhibit FF)(Related document(s) #294 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified on 6/11/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2014 Filing 294 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #252 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Redacted-Public Version Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Undisclosed Co-Conspirators and Affiliates [MDL Dkt. No. 9091] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 293 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.; re #249 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporation's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds, MDL No.9089 (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 292 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. re #251 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, (Defendants' Reply in Support of Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds, MDL Dkt. # 9088) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 Appendix 3)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 291 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. (Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, filed as MDL Dkt. No. 9070) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong with supporting Exs. A-I)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 290 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment As To Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [MDL No. 1827, Docket Nos. 9061 and 9062] (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #4 Exhibit 6-10 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #5 Exhibit 11-15 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #6 Exhibit 16-20 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #7 Exhibit 21-25 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #8 Exhibit 26-32 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #9 Exhibit 33-39 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #10 Exhibit 40-44 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #11 Exhibit 45-48 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #12 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 289 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9059, 9059-1, 9059-2] CORRECTION OF DOCKET #286 wrong e-filing event used (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 288 ***ERRONEOUS EVENT WAS USED - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 285*** Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #287 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Public Version of Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. 9058] CORRECTION OF DOCKET #285 wrong e-filing event used (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2014 Filing 287 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Redacted-Public Versiion of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9056, 9056-1] CORRECTION OF DOCKET #284 wrong efiling event used (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 286 ***ERRONEOUS EVENT WAS USED - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 289 Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9059, 9059-1, 9059-2] filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2014 Filing 285 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #284 MOTION for Summary Judgment Redacted - Public Version of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9056, 9056-1] [MDL Dkt. No. 9058] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) #284 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 284 ***ERRONEOUS EVENT WAS USED - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 287*** MOTION for Summary Judgment Redacted - Public Version of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9056, 9056-1] filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/16/2014. Replies due by 6/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2014 Filing 283 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Notice of Motion and Track 2 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Florida Downstream Pass-On; and Supporting Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger ISO Defendants' Track 2 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Downstream Pass-On, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)[MDL NO. 9053](Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2014 Filing 282 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Response re Motion for Summary Judgment UNREDACTED Response (MDL Dkt. No. 9048) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart H. Singer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal #258 , 8923 in 7-1827. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #256 , (8920 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc. ("Nexgen"), CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #250 , (8917 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., HannStar Display Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2014 Filing 278 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/23/14, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston denying #271 , (8984) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Counsel shall take care to include the correct case numbers in it's filings, there were several incorrect numbers in the caption.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014) Modified on 5/27/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #275 , (9010) Stipulation re: use of expert compensation at trial in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (295) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (262) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (281) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) Modified on 5/13/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 Filing 275 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co. Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Use of Expert Compensation at Trial [MDL No. 9010](Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2014 Filing 274 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #273 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O-1, #16 Exhibit O-2, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z-1, #28 Exhibit Z-2, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH, #37 Exhibit II, #38 Exhibit JJ, #39 Exhibit KK, #40 Exhibit LL, #41 Exhibit MM, #42 Exhibit NN, #43 Exhibit OO, #44 Exhibit PP, #45 Exhibit QQ, #46 Exhibit RR, #47 Exhibit SS, #48 Exhibit TT, #49 Exhibit UU, #50 Exhibit VV)(Related document(s) #273 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 273 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Plaintiffs' Joint Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims Based on Undisclosed Conspirators or Affiliates [Master Docket No. 8991] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 272 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Plaintiffs' Joint Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds [Master Docket No. 8985] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 271 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America to File Under Seal portions of their opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Opposition Brief, #4 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exh A, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exh B, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exh C)[MDL No. 8984](Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 4/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8976) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI as to various cases, see order for details. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 269 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal (MDL Dkt. No. 8976) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 23, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing MOTIONS SET PURSUANT TO ORDER 8872 : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 268 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/23/2014 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 4/23/2014). The Court granted the Administrative Motion to Appoint Liaison Counsel #8957. Carl Blumenstein will continue in his role as defense liaison. SB Liquidation Trust indicated that it is in the process of settling their case (10-5458). By May 7, 2014, counsel will submit a proposed pretrial and trial schedule for Acer America (13-3349), Home Depot (13-6001), and Proview (13-3802), and a trial schedule for the Circuit City Case (10-5625). Every other case not specifically scheduled for a trial date will eventually will be remanded back to the originating districts. (Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER RE: APRIL 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8957 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 266 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) (Filed as Dkt. No. 8962 in MDL 1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 265 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America Stipulation and Proposed Order Allowing Production of Sealed Pleadings in Related Case MDL Dkt 8950 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Illinois Stipulation)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER: DAUBERT Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/7/14. (8947 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 263 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule (MDL Dkt. No. 8947) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 262 CLERKS NOTICE FOR ALL REMAINING CASES: A further case management Conference has been set for 4/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston The Court has determined that the following cases are remain open: 3:09-cv-04997-SI, 3:10-cv-03205-SI, 3:10-cv-04346-SI, 3:10-cv-05458-SI, 3:10-cv-05625-SI, 3:11-cv-00829-SI, 3:11-cv-02225-SI, 3:11-cv-02495-SI, 3:11-cv-03763-SI, 3:11-cv-03856-SI, 3:11-cv-04119-SI, 3:11-cv-05765-SI, 3:11-cv-05781-SI, 3:11-cv-06241-SI, 3:12-cv-00335-SI, 3:12-cv-01426-SI, 3:12-cv-01596-SI, 3:12-cv-02214-SI, 3:12-cv-02495-SI, 3:12-cv-03802-SI, 3:12-cv-05371-SI, 3:12-cv-05460-SI, 3:13-cv-03349-SI, 3:13-cv-06001-SI. Counsel shall inform the clerk immediately if a case has been omitted for this notice. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed on or before April 17, 2014. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 25, 2014 Filing 261 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd.s Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing (MDL No. 8923) filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 Filing 260 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporations Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Plaintiffs' State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds (MDL No. 8917) filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 25, 2014 Filing 259 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Defendants Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds (MDL No 8920). filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 258 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal .(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Redacted Motion Summary Judgmetn Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #4 Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #5 Redacted Exhibits 27-42, #6 Redacted Exhibits 47-48, #7 Unredacted Motion Summary Judgment Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #8 Unredacted Exhs 1-18, #9 Unredacted Exhs 27-35, #10 Unredacted Exhs 36, #11 Unredacted Exhs 37-38, #12 Unredacted Exh 39, #13 Unredacted 40-42, #14 Unredacted 47-48)[MDL No. 8923].(Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 Filing 257 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted). Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 4/1/2014. Replies due by 4/8/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Brownstein ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 19-26, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 27-42, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 43-46, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 47-48) [MDL No. 8924] (Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 Filing 256 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. 8920] (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 28, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 34, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 35, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 37, #24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 Filing 255 Declaration of Weifan Wang in Support of #251 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Certification of Authenticity [MDL Dkt. 8919] filed byCMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. (Related document(s) #251 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 254 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of #251 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds [MDL Dkt. 8918] filed byCMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63)(Related document(s) #251 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 253 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #252 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. 8922] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) #252 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 252 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims Based on Undisclosed Conspirators or Affiliates [MDL Dkt. 8921] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 251 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [MDL Dkt. 8916] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 250 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.;, HannStar Display Corporation Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH A. GILLEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (Request for Seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (Request for Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 (Request for Seal), #8 Exhibit 6 (Request for Seal), #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)[MDL No. 8917](Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 Filing 249 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.;, HannStar Display Corporation DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8915) (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEN TE-HSIANG, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF PO CHIU)(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #247 , (8879) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2014 Filing 247 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues [MDL No. 8879] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified on 2/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER Motion Hearings set for TRACK 2 CASES. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/28/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 245 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Summary Judgment Schedule [MDL Master Dkt. 8870] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER, (8849 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING TRACK 2 DEADLINES filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/14 is continued to 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/14/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2014 Filing 243 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Track 2 Deadlines; MDL Dkt. No. 8849 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8838) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions In Track 2 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 241 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions in Track 2 8838 (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8831) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the Parties, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that: 1. The deadline for the Parties to meet and confer regarding the Proposed List of Summary Judgment Motions and Schedule for same is extended from December 11, 2013 to January 9, 2014. 2. The deadline for the Parties to file with the Court a Joint List of Proposed Summary Judgment Motions and Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment Filings is extendedfrom December 12, 2013 to January 13, 2014. 3. This stipulation does not affect any other Track 2 deadlines as set forth in the Courts September 6, 2013 Order re Track 2 Deadlines. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 239 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America 8831 Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Revised Deadlines in Track 2 Re: Summary Judgment Motion Lists (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 8804 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by the undersigned counsel on behalf of the Stipulating Parties that all case schedules and deadlines in the above-captioned actions shall be held in abeyance as to the Stipulating Defendants only, and shall be revised as specified above in the event that the above-captioned cases are not dismissed as to the Stipulating Defendants. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 237 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 8804 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8789) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Hitachi defendants filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 235 NOTICE by Interbond Corporation of America Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Description of Issues/Subjects of Summary Judgment Motions (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 234 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation with Proposed Order of Dismissal; MDL Dkt. No. 8789 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Derr Schmidt on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Schmidt, Melissa) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 231 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by James Glenn Kreissman on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8655) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED between counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants in the Track 2 cases, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that Defendants opposition expert reports shall be served by October 31, 2013, and the underlying code and data for those reports shall be served by November 6, 2013. No other dates from the Courts Track 2 Scheduling Order shall be altered by this stipulation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8646) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI 1. The actions filed by Plaintiffs Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corporation; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.; Office Depot, Inc.; Interbond Corporation of America; Schultze Agency Services, LLC; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.; The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust; CompuCom Systems, Inc.; and NECO Alliance LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation and Epson Electronics America, Inc.; Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.; NEC Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, and NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.; and Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 226 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [Master Docket No. 8646] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 225 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #224 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #224 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 224 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); DKT No. 8636 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 223 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation re #220 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Opposition to Motion to Compel Sharp 30(b)(6) Deposition (MDL Dkt. 8615) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsay Lutz, #2 Exhibit A - F)(Lutz, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER re: Certain Expert Depositions in Track 2. re #218 , 8498 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) re #217 , 8497 . Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2013 Filing 220 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply With Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); MDL Dkt. No. 8553 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 219 NOTICE by Interbond Corporation of America Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 218 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN EXPERT DEPOSITIONS IN TRACK 2 [MDL DKT NO. 8498] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 217 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES [MDL DKT NO. 8497] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 13, 2013 Filing 216 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #214 , (8350) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records" (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) Modified on 7/30/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2013 Filing 214 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records"; MDL Dkt. No. 8350 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #209 , (8169) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel filed by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation. AS AMENDED (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL IN TRACK 2 CASES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME TO MEET AND CONFER AND/OR TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL re #207 , 8159 in 7-1827 Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/25/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #207 , (8159) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2013 Filing 209 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation [MDL Dkt. 8169] Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmet P Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 207 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8159 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #202 . (8076) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER re #195 . 8060 Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #173 . (7973) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER re #195 . (8060) stipulation and proposed order re Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/10/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2013 Filing 202 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (FILED AS DKT #8076 IN MDL 1827) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/12/2013) Modified on 6/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2013 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Hansen (Hansen, Bradley) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Harper Knox (Knox, Samantha) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra West Neukom (West Neukom, Sandra) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Hockett (Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 7, 2013 Filing 197 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel [MDL No. 8065] (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 6/7/2013) Modified on 6/10/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #186 . (8035) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 195 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8060 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #177 . (7987) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI: Stipulation with proposed order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (AMENDED DOCUMENT of 7984 by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #179 . (8001) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #184 . (7999) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #183 . (8000) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #182 . (7989) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #181 . (7988) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #176 . (7985) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation with Proposed Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Filing 187 NOTICE by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 31, 2013 Filing 186 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8035 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 184 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7999 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 183 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8000 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 182 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7989 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 181 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7988 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #174 . (7983) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed in MDL Master Case by Best Buy Co., Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, Jaco Electronics, Inc., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Rockwell Automation Inc., Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC, Sony Electronics, Inc., Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Viewsonic Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2013 Filing 179 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8001 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 177 Notice of Motion/Stipulation - AMENDED DOCUMENT by Interbond Corporation of America. Amendment to #175 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7987. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 176 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7985 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 175 ***PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #177***Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7984 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 174 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7983 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER re (171 Stipulation Regarding Further Depositions in 3:11-cv-03763-SI) and (7932 Stipulation Regarding Further Depositions in 3:07-md-01827-SI). Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 05/23/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 173 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel (Davis, Allison)[MDL NO. 7973]. (Filed on 5/23/2013) Modified on 5/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2013 Filing 172 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Further Depositions [MDL No. 7932] (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #170 . (7919) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2013 Filing 170 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7919 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #168 . (7866) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: EXTENDING CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO MITSUI & CO. (USA), INC. AND MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. DEPOSITIONS (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2013 Filing 168 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Close of Fact Discovery with Respect to Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc. and Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. Depositions [MDL No. 7866]. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/8/2013) Modified on 5/9/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #166 . (7770) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013) Modified on 4/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2013 Filing 166 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7770 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
March 27, 2013 Filing 165 AMENDED MINUTES FROM 3/15/13 HEARING: ADDING THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE (NO OTHER CHANGES) T-Mobile and Defendants shall submit a stipulation to the 75 day extension, with revised dates. If T-Mobile seeks to reinstate certain indirect purchaser claims pursuant to the Ninth Circuit's AT&T Mobility LLC v. AU Optronics Corp. decision, it must submit a motion. The Court grants T-Mobile leave to submit such motion.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7652) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI REVISED TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER re #162 . (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) Modified on 3/25/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2013 Filing 163 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 3/19/2013). Track I(b) trial has been continued to 7/22/13 and the pretrial is continued to 7/9/13 (7-1827, 10-4572, 10-4945, 10-5452, and 12-4114)By 3/29/13, counsel shall submit a proposed pretrial scheduling order with repect to the Track I(b) cases.As to Track I(b), there will be no ATM FEE evidentiary hearing. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 162 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES [MDL No.7652]. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2013 Filing 161 Joint Case Management Conference Statement by Interbond Corporation of America [MDL Dkt. No. 7640] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/12/2013) Modified on 3/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/13 is continued 3/15/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/1/13., Motions terminated: (102 in 3:11-cv-06241-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 159 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/1/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RE: DEFENDANTS' DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE re #147 . (Nos. 11-5765, 11-2225 and 11-3763) [MDL No. 7593]. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/6/2013) Modified on 2/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing (SEE TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER 7139 ) Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 14, 2013 Filing 157 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America JOINDER OF PLAINTIFFS OFFICE DEPOT, INC. AND INTERBOND CORPORATION OF AMERICA (BRANDSMART) IN TECH DATA'S REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(c) IN RESPECT OF DEFENDANTS DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (MDL Dkt. No. 7500) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
December 17, 2012 Filing 154 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Hitachi Displays, Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd. re #147 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Joint Opposition [MDL 7369] to Tech Data's 12(c) Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings in respect of Defendants' Downstream Pass-on Defenses [MDL 7086] and Joinder by Office Depot, Inc. and Interbond Corp of America [MDL 7108] (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER The August 20, 2013 and September 10, 2013 deadlines for the parties to provide additional and supplemental description[s] of each issue/subject of summary judgment motions are hereby vacated and replaced with the following: August 20, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to serve proposed list of summary judgment motions (copies to be provided to the court). August 21-September 9, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to meet and confer over proposed list of summary judgment motions and schedule for same. September 10, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to file with the Court joint list of proposed summary judgment motions and proposed schedule for summary judgment filings. October 30, 2013: Last day to file supplemental list of proposed summary judgment motions based upon new information or issues raised in the reply expert reports.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 21, 2012 Filing 152 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America Letter from Messrs. Murray and Foran Re Summary Judgment on Track 2 Cases and Proposed Order (MDL 7213) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7140) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (MOTIONS CONTINUED FROM 12/14/12 TO 1/18/13) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 150 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Hitachi Displays, Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd. re #147 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Tech Data's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and Tech Data's Motion to Dismiss LG Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike LG Defendants' Defenses Concerning Duplicative Recovery (MDL Dkt. No. 7140) (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 TRACK 2 SCHEDULING ORDER, Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/8/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 148 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 11/13/2012). The ATS Claims, Dell and Nokia cases ARE CONTINUED TO 11/30/12 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (9-1115, 10-1064, 09--5609)Counsel in the Track 2 cases shall select a mediator and inform the court of the name of the person selected. The Court will file an order approving the stipulated revised schedule for Track 2 cases.The Court will issue a separate order addressing Daubert motions in the cases set for trial in January 2013, streamlining summary judgment practice in the Track 2 cases, as well as the issue of consolidating the Best Buy cases. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2012)
November 6, 2012 Filing 147 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Interbond Corporation of America JOINDER OF PLAINTIFFS OFFICE DEPOT, INC. AND INTERBOND CORPORATION OF AMERICA (BRANDSMART) IN TECH DATAS MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(c) IN RESPECT OF DEFENDANTS DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (M. DKT. NO. 7108) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 146 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 145 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (7007 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 144 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (USA), Inc.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 143 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 142 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS LG DISPLAY AMERICA, INC. AND LG DISPLAY CO., LTD'S COUNTERCLAIMS AND STRIKE THEIR DEFENSES RE DUPLICATIVE RECOVERY 6227 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/22/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 6718 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (139) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI Regarding Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.'s Responses To The First Amended Complaint (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 14, 2012 Filing 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.'s Responses To The First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 5, 2012 Filing 138 CLERKS NOTICE : THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS ARE TAKEN OFF THE September 7, 2012 calendar. The motions are deemed submitted without argument. 7-1827, Dkt. No. 6227 , 11-2225, Dkt. No. 149, 11-2495, Dkt. No. 137, 11-2591, Dkt. No. 139, 11-3763, Dkt. No. 124, 11-4119, Dkt. No. 137, This is a docket text entry only and there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (136 in 3:11-cv-03763-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (27) Amended Complaint, Extension of Time to Answer the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., (6589 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (4073) Amended Complaint, Extension of Time to Answer the First Amended Complaint (BrandsMart) filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited, Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on August 31, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 30, 2012 Filing 136 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #27 Amended Complaint,,,, Extension of Time to Answer the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 30, 2012 Filing 135 REPLY (re #124 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims ) filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 134 Amended ANSWER to Complaint byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 133 Amended ANSWER to Complaint byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 132 Amended ANSWER to Complaint byNEC Corporation of America. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 131 Amended ANSWER to Complaint byNEC Corporation. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 130 Amended ANSWER to Complaint byNEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (6439) Stipulation Re: extension of time to respond to the amended complaint in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 16, 2012 Filing 128 RESPONSE (re #124 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims ) LG Display America, Inc.'s and LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Opposition to Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike Their Defenses Concerning Duplicative Recovery filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(House, Holly) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Susan Illston extending time for defendants Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc. to respond to the first amended complaint #126 . (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 10, 2012 Filing 126 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 9, 2012 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Interbond Corporation of America PROOFS OF SERVICE ON FOREIGN DEFEDANTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
July 19, 2012 Filing 124 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims filed by Interbond Corporation of America. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/2/2012. Replies due by 8/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Rubinstein, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 123 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 6, 2012, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Cutoff Hearing set for 11/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed on 7/6/12 by Judge Illston granting ( 5861 ) Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (89) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05458-SI; granting (109) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (112) Motion in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (135) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (127) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (71) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting (111) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (92) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (27) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04116-SI; granting (122) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting (42) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting (56) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting (45) Motion in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting (15) Motion in case 3:12-cv-00335-SI; granting (14) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI; granting (13) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01599-SI; granting (11) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02214-SI; granting (8) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02495-SI (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 Filing 121 Minute Entry: Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order held on 7/6/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 7/9/2012). The Court will issue the scheduling order. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2012)
July 5, 2012 Filing 120 CLERKS NOTICE: ALL PARTIES ARE ADVISED THAT THE MOTION RE: TWO TRACK SCHEDULING WILL BE HELD STARTING AT 9:30 A.M. INSTEAD OF 9:00 A.M. TOMORROW, FRIDAY, JULY 6, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 119 Request for Judicial Notice re #111 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice re Track Two Plaintiffs' Scheduling Motion filed byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B Part 1 to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit B Part 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit C-D to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #111 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 26, 2012 Filing 118 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Bangasser, Hugh) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 25, 2012 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Freitas , Jason S. Angell, and Jerry Chen on behalf of HannStar Display Corp. (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG CO. OF AMERICA signed on 6/21/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5962 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #113 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (114) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #126 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting ( #58 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting ( #18 ) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2012: #1 Order with Judicial Signature) (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/26/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER ORDER signed on 6/19/12 by Judge Illston granting #112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 5253 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, 5252 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 114 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC. filed by Interbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 19, 2012 Filing 113 RESPONSE (re #111 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) Defendants' Joint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases filed byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases with Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order Re: Pretrial and Trial Schedule)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 19, 2012 Filing 112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Interbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 6, 2012 Filing 111 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting filed by Interbond Corporation of America. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/19/2012. Replies due by 6/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER signed on 5/19/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5708 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (109) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI ORDER Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint (BrandsMart) filed by Mitsui & Co (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 16, 2012 Filing 109 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed on 5/14/12 by Judge Susan Illston STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust. granting ( 5578 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #67 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting ( #106 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #83 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting ( #117 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( #28 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( #35 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 107 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objection to Special Master Quinn's Order Regarding Subpoenas to John Metzler and applEcon LLC by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/11/2012) Modified on 5/14/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 Filing 106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Interbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS 5548 (see order for details). re #103 . Signed by Judge Illston on 4/30/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER signed on 4/30/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting Stipulation re Schedule to Answer or Respond to LG Display's Counterclaims filed by T-Mobile USA Inc(5542) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (242) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; granting (321) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-05840-SI; granting (166) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting (117) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-03517-SI; granting (79) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04346-SI; granting (102) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (138) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00058-SI; granting (165) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00711-SI; granting (126) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (115) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02495-SI; granting (124) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (103) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (114) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI. See order for specific details (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2012 Filing 103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Interbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 26, 2012 Filing 102 Special Masters Order RE LG Display's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas to Applecon LLC and John Metzler (Hrg. 4-6-12). (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston signed on 4/11/12 granting Stipulation to extend deadline to answer counterclaims ( 5434 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #123 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting ( #100 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #111 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Answer or Respond to Defendants LG Display Co. LTD and LG Display America, Inc.s Counterclaims for Declarative Relief filed by Interbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 5, 2012 Filing 99 RESPONSE to re #85 Notice (Other), Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion Regarding Trial Structure and Duplicative Recovery by Interbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 3, 2012 Filing 98 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #91 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Further Support of Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler filed byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #91 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 Filing 97 REPLY (re #91 MOTION to Compel ) Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of the Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler filed byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Illston signed on 4/2/12granting ( 5342 ) Stipulation to Dismiss Samsung in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #94 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012) Modified on 4/3/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2012 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J Iovieno NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MELISSA FELDER (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Interbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 93 REDACTION to #92 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #91 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D, #2 Exhibit E - F, #3 Exhibit G - H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J - K, #6 Exhibit L, #7 Exhibit M, #8 Exhibit N - Q)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Filing 92 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #89 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - Exhibit A to Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #90 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Filing 91 REDACTION to #90 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Filing 90 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #89 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: ( #99 in 3:11-cv-04119-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( 146 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #90 in 3:10-cv-05625-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co. Ltd., ( #111 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( 5304 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #68 in 3:11-cv-03856-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #124 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #88 in 3:11-cv-03763-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd... Signed by Judge Illston on 3/27/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 23, 2012 Filing 88 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 21, 2012 Filing 87 Answer to Amended Complaint #27 Amended Complaint,,,, Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM for Declarative Relief against Interbond Corporation of America byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 21, 2012 Filing 86 Answer to Amended Complaint #27 Amended Complaint,,,, Defendant LG Display America, Inc.'s Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM for Delarative Relief against Interbond Corporation of America byLG Display America, Inc.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 13, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Notice of Pending Motion and Of Issue and Claim Preclusion (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 5, 2012 Filing 84 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by AU Optronics Corporation America. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 83 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint (FIRST) byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 82 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint of Interbond Corporation of America byHitachi Displays, Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 81 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint Defendant LG Display America, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint byLG Display America, Inc.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 80 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 79 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #27 byHannstar Display Corporation. (Emerson, Ramona) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 78 NEC LCD Technologies, LTD's ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint of Interbound Corporation of America byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 77 NEC Electronics America, Inc.'s ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint of Interbound Corporation of America byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 76 NEC Display Solutions of America's ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint of Interbound Corporation of America byNEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 75 NEC Corporation of America's ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint of Interbound Corporation of America byNEC Corporation of America. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 74 Nec Corporation's ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint of Interbound Corporation of America byNEC Corporation. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 73 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint ANSWER AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES OF CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS CORPORATION (N/K/A CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION), CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS USA, INC., AND CMO JAPAN CO., LTD. TO INTERBOND CORPORATION OF AMERICA'S (BRANDSMART'S) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT byCMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 72 Answer to Amended Complaint #27 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.'s Answer to Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 71 Answer to Amended Complaint #27 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s Answer to Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 70 Answer to Amended Complaint #27 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint byToshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 69 Answer to Amended Complaint #27 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba Corporation's Answer to Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint byToshiba Corporation. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 68 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #27 of Interbond (Brandsmart) bySharp Electronics Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 67 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #27 of Interbond (Brandsmart) bySharp Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 66 Answer to Amended Complaint #27 Amended Complaint,,,, of Interbond Corporation of America (BrandsMart) bySanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 65 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint byTatung Company of America, Inc.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 64 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint byCHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.;. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 63 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint byEpson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting (4843) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (61) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI signed by Judge Illston on 2/21/12 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 21, 2012 Filing 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Illston granting (4722) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (83) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (59) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (65) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (ORDER SIGNED ON 2/1/12 BY JUDGE ILLSTON, THIS IS A TEXT DOCKET ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 31, 2012 Filing 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS filed by Interbond Corporation of America. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (INTERBOND) re #55 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/31/2012) Modified on 2/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2012 Filing 57 REPLY (re #55 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7-9 ) filed bySanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 24, 2012 Filing 56 RESPONSE (re #55 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7-9 ) filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7-9 filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS (INTERBOND) re #35 , #37 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/18/2012) Modified on 1/19/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2012 Filing 53 RESPONSE/Opposition to re #52 Request for Judicial Notice, by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 1/18/2012) Modified on 1/19/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2012 Filing 52 Request for Judicial Notice re #35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's First Amended Complaint [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #34] filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #35 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #49 (#4512) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012) Modified on 1/11/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2012 Filing 50 REPLY (re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint ) filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 9, 2012 Filing 49 Ex Parte Application NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 9, 2012 Filing 48 REPLY (re #35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's First Amended Complaint [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #34] ) filed bySanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 30, 2011 Filing 47 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #45 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - BRANDSMARTS OPPOSITION TO #44 NEC DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS BRANDSMARTS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Interbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/30/2011) Modified on 1/3/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2011 Filing 46 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION . DOCUMENT LOCKED. *** RESPONSE (re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint ) BRANDSMARTS OPPOSITION TO NEC DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS BRANDSMARTS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/30/2011) Modified on 12/30/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #42 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011) Modified on 12/28/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2011 Filing 44 RESPONSE (re #35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's First Amended Complaint [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #34]Joint MOTION to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's First Amended Complaint [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #34] ) BRANDSMARTS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS BRANDSMARTS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of PHilip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1-3)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 43 RESPONSE (re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint ) BRANDSMARTS OPPOSITION TO NEC DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS BRANDSMARTS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 42 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Interbond Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 16, 2011 Filing 41 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/9/11, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 40 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 28, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842, Joan_Columbini@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #36 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2011 Filing 38 Request for Judicial Notice re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. (Related document(s) #37 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's (Brandsmart) First Amended Complaint filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/23/2011. Replies due by 1/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of NEC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 36 Ex Parte Application NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's First Amended Complaint [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #34] filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/23/2011. Replies due by 1/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 34 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #35 . *** Joint MOTION to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's First Amended Complaint filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/23/2011. Replies due by 1/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/6/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting extension of time to respond to amended complaint re #31 . (#4207) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011) Modified on 12/2/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Murdock-Park , Paul P. Eyre, Ernest E. Vargo, Tracy L. Cole and Michael E. Mumford (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 29, 2011 Filing 31 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. AND MITSUI & CO. (U.S.A.), INC. TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 30 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #29 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - INTERBOND CORPORATION OF AMERICAS (BRANDSMART) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Interbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/4/2011) Modified on 11/7/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #26 . (#4072) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011) Modified on 11/4/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 1, 2011 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT INTERBOND CORPORATION OF AMERICA (BRANDSMART) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.;, CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.. Filed byInterbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
November 1, 2011 Filing 26 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Interbond Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 25, 2011 Motions terminated: #23 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Interbond Corporation's Complaint filed by NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., #21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's Complaint filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 20, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. / Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Lazerwitz, Michael) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 20, 2011 Filing 24 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER WITHDRAWING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS, NECS MOTION TO DISMISS, SANYO CES MOTION TO DISMISS, AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Interbond Corporation of America. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Interbond Corporation's Complaint filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 10/20/2011. Replies due by 10/27/2011. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 22 Joinder re #21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's Complaint by Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Interbond Corporation of America's Complaint filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 10/20/2011. Replies due by 10/27/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER (11-3763) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. to Respond to the Complaint and [Proposed] Order by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. McCann (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF INTERBOND TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL re #15 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2011 Filing 16 The Court is not available on Friday, October 21, 2011.CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (3610 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3), (3609 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3), (15 in 3:11-cv-03763-SI) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3), (13 in 3:11-cv-04119-SI) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3). Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) filed by Interbond Corporation of America. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/30/2011. Replies due by 10/7/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne M. Nardacci, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Isaacson, William) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT the Court is no longer accepting new motions to be noticed for Friday, November 4, 2011. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting extension of time to respond. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 24, 2011 Filing 12 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, WAIVER OF SERVICE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Interbond Corporation of America. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: extension to time to respond to complaint in 11-3856 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER to #9 PRETRIAL ORDER NO.1 (Attachments: #1 standing order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 1, 2011 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:11-cv-61264. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/7. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 7 MDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 (Chairman of the Panel) MDL Case Number 07-1827 Case Transferred to Northern District of California, Case Assigned to Judge Susan Illston (lbc)
July 22, 2011 Filing 6 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern Division of California, Case Number MDL 07-1827, with enclosed copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (lbc)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/7/2011. (ls)
June 7, 2011 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Interbond Corporation of America (Singer, Stuart)
June 3, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.;, CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, HannStar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC DISPLAY SOLUTIONS OF AMERICA, INC., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC., Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD.. (vjk)
June 3, 2011 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (vjk)
June 3, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.;, CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, HannStar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC DISPLAY SOLUTIONS OF AMERICA, INC., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC., Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD.. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-3807975, filed by Interbond Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) AU Optronics Corporation America, #3 Summon(s) AU Optronics Corporation, #4 Summon(s) Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, #5 Summon(s) Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., #6 Summon(s) Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd., #7 Summon(s) CMO Japan Co., Ltd., #8 Summon(s) Epson Electronics America, Inc., #9 Summon(s) Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, #10 Summon(s) HannStar Display Corporation, #11 Summon(s) Hitachi Display Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., #12 Summon(s) Hitachi Display, Ltd., #13 Summon(s) Hitachi, Ltd., #14 Summon(s) LG Display America, Inc., #15 Summon(s) LG Display Co., Ltd., #16 Summon(s) Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd., #17 Summon(s) Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc., #18 Summon(s) NEC Corporation of America, #19 Summon(s) NEC Corporation, #20 Summon(s) NEC Display Solutions of America, #21 Summon(s) NEC Electronics America, Inc., #22 Summon(s) NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., #23 Summon(s) Samsung Electronics America, Inc., #24 Summon(s) Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., #25 Summon(s) Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., #26 Summon(s) Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., #27 Summon(s) Sharp Corporation, #28 Summon(s) Sharp Electronics Corporation, #29 Summon(s) Tatung Company of America, Inc., #30 Summon(s) Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., #31 Summon(s) Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., #32 Summon(s) Toshiba Corporation, #33 Summon(s) Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology, Ltd.)(Singer, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interbond Corporation of America v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Martin Quinn
Represented By: Martin Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell
Represented By: John D. Cline
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi, Ltd.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Represented By: Lee F Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Represented By: Lindsay A. Lutz
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.;
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: David C. Brownstein
Represented By: Austin Van Schwing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Paul P. Eyre
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HannStar Display Corporation
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Ramona M. Emerson
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Represented By: Hugh Frederick Bangasser
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell
Represented By: John D. Cline
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Paul P. Eyre
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Represented By: Lee F Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays, Ltd
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interbond Corporation of America
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Philip J Iovieno
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Represented By: Melissa B Felder,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?