El Comite Para El Bienestar De Earlimart et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: El Comite Para El Bienestar De Earlimart and Association of Irritated Residents
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency, Lisa Jackson and Jared Blumenfeld
Case Number: 3:2011cv03779
Filed: August 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7413
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [granting 35 Stipulation].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 28 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 1, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 15 Stipulation filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency]. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER CONTINUANCES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/13/2001. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Clerks Notice, (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Comite Para El Bienestar De Earlimart et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Comite Para El Bienestar De Earlimart
Represented By: Sofia Lorena Parino
Represented By: Brent Joseph Newell
Represented By: Alegria Guadalupe De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Represented By: Alegria Guadalupe De La Cruz
Represented By: Brent Joseph Newell
Represented By: Sofia Lorena Parino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Jackson
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Blumenfeld
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?