Beard et al v. Pacific Bell Telephone Company
Plaintiff: Andre Beard and Gloribel Guerrero
Defendant: Pacific Bell Telephone Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv03780
Filed: August 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice Gloribel Guerrero's Individual and class claims. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/24/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 97 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Reset Deadlines as to 96 MOTION to Amend/Correct 26 Amended Complaint FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PLEADINGS AND MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by AT&T Services, Inc., Pacifi c Bell Telephone Company. Responses due by 5/3/2013. Replies due by 5/10/2013. Motion Hearing reset for 5/24/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/23/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Clerks Notice filed by AT&T Services, Inc., Pacific Bell Telephone Company. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2012. Case Management Conference reset for 9/28/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/1/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/10/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 43 Motion to Stay. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Briefing Schedule for Motion to Stay. Reset Deadlines as to 43 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff Guerrero's Individual and Class Claims. Responses due by 5/9/2012. Replies due by 5/23/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/27/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 27 Stipulation to extend time to respond to amended complaint filed by Pacific Bell Telephone Company.Respond extended to 1/26/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/6/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re 7 Stipulation filed by Pacific Bell Telephone Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/31/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beard et al v. Pacific Bell Telephone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Jennifer Sloane Abramowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Beard
Represented By: Matthew Carlson
Represented By: Ilona Brusil
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: Arthur C. Chambers
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Represented By: Joong Y. Im
Represented By: Charles Carroll Kelly, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloribel Guerrero
Represented By: Ilona Brusil
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Carlson
Represented By: Arthur C. Chambers
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Represented By: Joong Y. Im
Represented By: Charles Carroll Kelly, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?