First Time Videos, LLC v. Does 1-95
Plaintiff: First Time Videos, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-95
Case Number: 3:2011cv03822
Filed: August 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/16/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Status Report due by 12/8/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/1/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James striking 18 Motion to Quash (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 7 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Expedited Discovery (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Time Videos, LLC v. Does 1-95
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Time Videos, LLC
Represented By: Brett Langdon Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-95
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?