White v. City of Oakland
Plaintiff: Donna White
Defendant: City of Oakland
Case Number: 3:2011cv03846
Filed: August 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/25/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER CONTINUING Case Management Conference to 8/13/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco re 81 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/25/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO VACATE LITIGATION DATES 77 . Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/2/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 71 . Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/18/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RESOLVING DISCOVERY DISPUTE 52 ; VACATING HEARING; AND EXTENDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINE to 2/24/2014. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/3/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION (RE FILING OF AMENDED ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT). Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/26/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna White
Represented By: Catherine M. Cabalo
Represented By: Celia Louise McGuinness
Represented By: Paul Leslie Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?