Christopher Craig et al v. City of King City et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Craig, Abraham Aguayo and Jaime Andrade
Defendant: City of King City, Nick Baldiviez, Michael Powers, Mark Baker, Jerry Hunter and Myrna Glick
Case Number: 3:2011cv04219
Filed: August 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/16/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST to bring audio-visual equipment into the Court building 194 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/14/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/27/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline to file/Exchange Pretrial Documents re 133 : Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/21/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 124 Motion to Excuse Defendants From Attending Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 126 Stipulation To Permit Myrna Glick to be Excused from the Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 8/22/2012. (knsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 64 Motion to Dismiss (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING WITH LEAVE TO AMEND DEFENDANT GLICK'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 30 filed by Myrna Glick. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 17, 2012. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 12/29/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 Stipulation to continue the CMC, filed by Christopher Craig. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/16/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Craig et al v. City of King City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Craig
Represented By: Russell Marc Perry
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Aguayo
Represented By: Russell Marc Perry
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Andrade
Represented By: Russell Marc Perry
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of King City
Represented By: Vincent P. Hurley
Represented By: Amanda Michelle Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Baldiviez
Represented By: Amanda Michelle Cohen
Represented By: Vincent P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Powers
Represented By: Vincent P. Hurley
Represented By: Amanda Michelle Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Baker
Represented By: Amanda Michelle Cohen
Represented By: Vincent P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Hunter
Represented By: Amanda Michelle Cohen
Represented By: Vincent P. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrna Glick
Represented By: Judith Melinda Tishkoff
Represented By: Judith Melinda Tishkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?