Byrd v. Donahoe
Plaintiff: Yolanda G. Byrd
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Case Number: 3:2011cv04230
Filed: August 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 29 TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY CUT OFF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/30/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/23/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/21/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/24/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2012: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service) (cl, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda G. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?