Dykes v. Ayers
Petitioner: Ernest Edward Dykes
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 3:2011cv04454
Filed: September 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER LIFTING STAY 72 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DISCOVERY MOTION granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REGARDING PETITIONER'S REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT 62 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATEMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PETITIONER'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING A DECISION ON CLAIM 7 IN ASHMUS V. CHAPPEL 43 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO LIFT STAY 40 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER 28 29 30 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER vacating case management conference.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/26/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER, Motions terminated: 26 Ex Parte Application MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply / Traverse to Answer filed by Ernest Edward Dykes. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/28/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, Motions terminated: 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending time to file Reply / Traverse filed by Ernest Edward Dykes. Status Conference set for 8/21/14 is continued to 11/6/2014 04:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/16/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, Motions terminated: 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Ernest Edward Dykes. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/14/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2011: # 1 Envelope) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dykes v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ernest Edward Dykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?