Board of Trustees of the Northern California Sheet Metal Workers' Health Care Plan et al v. Stanton Mechanical, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 162 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Dennis Canevari and Board of Trustees of the Northern California Sheet Metal Workers' Health Care Plan
Defendant: Stanton Mechanical, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv04484
Filed: September 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING re 57 Letter filed by Stanton Mechanical, Inc. for Ronald Brown to appear by phone on 4/19/13 at 9:30 AM on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 4/12/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Motions due by 2/8/2013. Responses/Oppositon due by 2/22/2013. Replies due by 3/1/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/28/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING re 36 Joint Case Management Statement AND REQUEST FOR DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY PHONE, filed by Dennis Canevari, Board of Trustees of the Northern California Sheet Metal Workers' Health Care Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 162 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan. Mr. Brown shall provide to the Clerk by 11/14/12 a direct land line phone number. Signed, as modifed, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/9/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/24/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE OF 10/5/12. Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/1/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFRENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/23/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING re 28 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Stanton Mechanical, Inc. Attorney Nilesh Choudhary terminated.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/22/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 8/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed, AS MODIFIED, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/9/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 7/13/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/2/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING re 20 Request to Continue Case Management Conference, filed by Dennis Canevari, Board of Trustees of the Northern California Sheet Metal Workers' Health Care Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California , Sheet Metal Workers Local 162 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/30/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING re 18 Letter filed by Stanton Mechanical, Inc., for Nilesh Choudhary to appear by phone at the CMC on 4/6/12 at 1:30 PM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/26/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Northern California Sheet Metal Workers' Health Care Plan et al v. Stanton Mechanical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Local 162 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Canevari
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Northern California Sheet Metal Workers' Health Care Plan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanton Mechanical, Inc.
Represented By: Nilesh Choudhary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?