Streetspace, Inc v. Google, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Streetspace, Inc
Defendant: Google, Inc., Admob, Inc, Apple, Inc., Quattro Wireless, Inc, Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc, Navteq Corporation, Millennial Media, Inc, Jumptap, Inc and Does
Case Number: 3:2011cv04574
Filed: September 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER OF DISMISSAL 174 by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY Status Report due by 12/8/2016 AT NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/26/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY Status Report due by 9/8/2016 AT NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/6/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/6/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/25/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID E. KOROPP PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 164 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY DAVID E. KOROPP by Hon. William Alsup denying 162 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/30/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/31/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY Status Report due by 8/26/2015 at Noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 13, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 REQUEST RE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/30/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Joint status report due April 30 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 28, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 29, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Joint report due September 29, 2014 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 23, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 13, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 4, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 8, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER MAINTAINING STAY re 126 Status Report filed by Nokia Corporation, Jumptap, Inc, Nokia Inc, Quattro Wireless, Inc, Navteq Corporation, Google, Inc., Streetspace, Inc, Millennial Media, Inc, Apple, Inc., Admob, Inc (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE RE MISJOINDER RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 17, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 117 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/26/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING MISJOINDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 6, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streetspace, Inc v. Google, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Streetspace, Inc
Represented By: Trevor Quick Coddington
Represented By: James V Fazio, III
Represented By: Douglas E Olson
Represented By: Lei Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edwin Gray
Represented By: Matthew B. Lowrie
Represented By: Shawn Edward McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admob, Inc
Represented By: Justin Edwin Gray
Represented By: Shawn Edward McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Luann Loraine Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quattro Wireless, Inc
Represented By: Luann Loraine Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Corporation
Represented By: David Heskel Ben-Meir
Represented By: Michael Ira Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Inc
Represented By: David Heskel Ben-Meir
Represented By: Michael Ira Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navteq Corporation
Represented By: David Heskel Ben-Meir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennial Media, Inc
Represented By: Christopher Charles Campbell
Represented By: Nelson Kuan
Represented By: John Shepherd Kyle
Represented By: Frank V. Pietrantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jumptap, Inc
Represented By: Kurt M Kjelland
Represented By: Douglas J. Kline
Represented By: William A. Meunier
Represented By: Timothy J. Rousseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?