BMW of North America, LLC et al v. Dinodirect Corp et al
Plaintiff: Rollys-Royce Motor Cars Limited, Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, BMW of North America, LLC and Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC
Defendant: Dinodirect China, Ltd, B2CForce Int'l Corp, Jianfeng Feng and Dinodirect Corp
Case Number: 3:2011cv04598
Filed: September 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 107 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup [granting 85 Motion to Vacate]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO VACATE HEARING re 98 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Rolls-Royce Motor Cars Limited, Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, BMW of North America, LLC, Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, 97 Notice (Other), filed by B2CForce Int'l Corp, Dinodirect China, Ltd, Jianfeng Feng, Dinodirect, Ltd, Dinodirect Corp (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiffs and against defendants. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/27/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE AND ORDER TO DEFENDANTS RE: IMPROPER EMAILS. Plaintiffs shall immediately serve this order upon defendants. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/19/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER WITHDRAWING MEDIATION REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 1, 2012.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [Re 49 MOTION Plaintiffs' Combined Case Management Conference Statement and Administrative Motion to Postpone the April 19, 2012 Case Management Conference to June 21, 2012 filed by Rolls-Royce Motor Cars Limited, Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA. LLC, BMW of North America, LLC, Bayerische Motoren Werke AG]. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/13/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SERVE VIA SECRETARY OF STATE re 34 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Serve B2CForce Int'l Corp. via the California Secretary of State filed by Rolls-Royce Motor Cars Limited, Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, BMW of North America, LLC, Bayerische Motoren Werke AG. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 19, 2012.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 18 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMW of North America, LLC et al v. Dinodirect Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinodirect China, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B2CForce Int'l Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jianfeng Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinodirect Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rollys-Royce Motor Cars Limited
Represented By: Jane Louise Froyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Represented By: Jane Louise Froyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Jane Louise Froyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC
Represented By: Jane Louise Froyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?