Johnson-Walker v. Grant et al
Plaintiff: Lin Johnson-Walker
Defendant: Jesse Harrison Grant and Peter Jingpyo Hong
Case Number: 3:2011cv04622
Filed: September 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/15/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING re 53 Letter filed by Lin Johnson-Walker for Sally Steinhart to appear by phone at 9:30 AM on 9/14/12 for the OSC. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/14/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/14/2012 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/10/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING re 49 Letter filed by Lin Johnson-Walker for Sally Steinhart to appear by phone on 9/7/12 at 1:30 PM for the case management conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/6/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING re 44 Letter filed by Lin Johnson-Walker for Sally Steinhart to appear by phone at 1:30 PM on 7/20/12. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/16/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING re 34 Letter filed by Peter Jingpyo Hong for Matthew Orebic to appear by phone on 6/15/12 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/11/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING re 28 Letter filed by Peter Jingpyo Hong, Jesse Harrison Grant for Matthew Orebic to appear by phone on 6/1/12 at 1:30 PM for the OSC and further cmc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/30/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT JESSE GRANT ONLY with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/17/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/20/2012 01:30 PM. Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/10/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson-Walker v. Grant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Harrison Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Jingpyo Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lin Johnson-Walker
Represented By: David I Kelvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?