Hubbard et al v. Wenner Media LLC
Plaintiff: Marvel Mills and Jasmine Hubbard
Defendant: Wenner Media LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv04648
Filed: September 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Motions terminated: 23 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Wenner Media LLC, 37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Wenner Media LLC, 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (STIPULATED DISMISSAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER) filed by Jasmine Hubbard, Marvel Mills.,. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/8/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 67 Stipulation to Cancel Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 TO RESET DATES OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ARGUMENT ON MOTION filed by Jasmine Hubbard, Marvel Mills Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2013 01:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/22/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 TO RESET DATES OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ARGUMENT ON MOTION filed by Jasmine Hubbard, Marvel Mills and DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2012. Case Manag ement Conference set for 11/2/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/7/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 61 Stipulation (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria Elena James granting 59 Stipulation (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESET DATES OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ARGUMENT ON MOTION filed by Jasmine Hubbard, Marvel Mills, 18 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, To Tra nsfer to the Southern District of New York filed by Wenner Media LLC Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/10/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Reset Dates of Initial Case Management Conference and Argument on Motion filed by Wenner Media LLC Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MOTION/CMC re 27 Stipulation, filed by Jasmine Hubbard, Marvel Mills, 18 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer to the Southern District of New York filed by Wenner Media LLC Case Management S tatement due by 2/10/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/16/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 11 Stipulation filed by Wenner Media LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/9/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbard et al v. Wenner Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvel Mills
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Hubbard
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenner Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?