PNY Technologies, Inc. v. Sandisk Corporation
Plaintiff: PNY Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Sandisk Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv04689
Filed: September 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/18/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER Re: Joint Discovery Letter (Dkt. No. 269). Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on July 28, 2014. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 267 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/10/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER GRANTING 237 MOTION TO DISMISS FIFTH AND SIXTH CAUSES OF ACTION IN THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick. SanDisk's motion to dismiss the Fifth and Sixth Causes of Action of the Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED and the c auses of action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SanDisk shall file its answer within 10 days. (NOTE: This order has been redacted of privacy information; the unredacted order will be filed separately and restricted to case participants.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014) Modified on 7/2/2014 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying as moot 256 Discovery Letter Brief; denying as moot 257 Discovery Letter Brief (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER re 256 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Sandisk Corporation, 257 Discovery Letter Brief filed by PNY Technologies, Inc. Discovery Hearing set for 7/2/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/26/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 247 Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER GRANTING 195 MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick. PNY will have one opportunity to amend its complaint to further support its claims of exclusive dealing and attempted monopolization in the market for SD ca rds. Any amended complaint shall be filed within ten days from the date of this Order. PNY shall highlight all amendments to the complaint. Any brief in support and opposition to a motion to dismiss the third amended complaint shall be limited to 15 pages. Any reply shall be limited to 10 pages. This document has been redacted of confidential information. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER re 203 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Pretrial Schedule. The Court will hold a Case Management Conference after the hearing on SanDisks Motion to Dismiss PNYs Second Amended Complaint to modify the case management schedule. Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/19/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 191 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. SanDisk may submit a renewed motion to seal within seven days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND SUPPLEMENT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 185 Motion to Amend/Correct. PNY is ORDERED to file its amended complaint within three days from the date of this Order. SanDisk shall file an answer within 21 days of the filing of the amended complaint unless it files a motion under Rule 12 within that time period. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 173 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 AMENDED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Dkt. Nos. 135 & 136). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/19/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Dkt. Nos. 135 & 136). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/15/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER (Dkt. No. 132). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/19/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 8/26/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/5/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2013. Non-Expert Discovery due by 12/6/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2013. Dispositive Motions heard by 6/3/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. 15 Day Jury Trial set for 10/27/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 9/19/2014 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (AS MODIFIED IN PARAGRAPHS 6.3 AND 7.4). Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/13/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REQUIRING SHORT UPDATE TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT by no later than 12:00 p.m. on Friday, March 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/12/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 3/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/20/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
October 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order by Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 66 Motion to Dismiss and Vacating October 16, 2012 Hearing. Defendant to file answer by no later than November 5, 2012. (ygrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2012)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 20 29 MOTION to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/20/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER continuing motion (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Providing SanDisk Until November 9, 2011, to Answer or Otherwise Plead to PNY's Complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting pro hac (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNY Technologies, Inc. v. Sandisk Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandisk Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNY Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H. Anania
Represented By: Scott Christie
Represented By: John L. Cooper
Represented By: Allyson M Franco
Represented By: Ira M Gottlieb
Represented By: Richard Hernandez
Represented By: Jonathan Short
Represented By: Roderick Manley Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?